Raul James Barboza et al v. Flowers Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Marquez, Larry Lundvall, Edward Smith, Gary Hayes, Michael Martinson, Gabriel Fierro, Matthew Blehm, Francis Reaport and Raul James Barboza
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc. and Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv08094
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT 26(F) REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Raul James Barboza, Matthew Blehm, Gabriel Fierro, Gary Hayes, Larry Lundvall, Manuel Marquez, Michael Martinson, Francis Reaport, Edward Smith. (Rukin, Peter)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Tri by Judge George H. Wu, (lc)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu:The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for November 14, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded oftheir obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than October 31, 2019. See Local Rule 26-1.Plaintiff(s) is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (lc)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08094 GW (Ex). (esa)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc., of Judge Snyder's Notice to Counsel; Judge Snyder's Requirements (downloaded from Court's website on 9/24/19) and Judge Eick's Requirements (downloaded from the Court's website on 9/24/19) served on 09/24/2019. (Palmer, Jared)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc., of NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA BY DEFENDANTS served on 09/23/2019. (Palmer, Jared)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc., re Notice (Other), #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 served on 09/20/2019. (Palmer, Jared)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc.. (Chemers, Alexander)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jp)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jp)
September 18, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 09/17/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 2 OF EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
September 18, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED COMPLAINT against Defendants Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC, Flowers Baking Co of Modesto LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc. Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Edward Smith, Francis Reaport, Gary Hayes, Gabriel Fierro, Manuel Marquez, Michael Martinson, Raul James Barboza, Matthew Blehm, Larry Lundvall. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 08/06/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1 OF EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc. identifying Flower Foods Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Chemers, Alexander)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc., (Chemers, Alexander)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Removal filed by Defendants Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Removal)(Chemers, Alexander)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV27570 Receipt No: 0973-24461584 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Alexander M. Chemers In Support of Removal, #4 Exhibit A to Alexander Chemers' Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Alexander Chemers' Decl., #6 Exhibit C to Alexander Chemers' Decl., #7 Exhibit D to Alexander Chemers' Decl., #8 Exhibit E to Alexander Chemers' Decl., #9 Exhibit F to Alexander Chemers' Decl., #10 Exhibit G to Alexander Chemers' Decl., #11 Declaration of Stephanie Tillman In Support of Removal, #12 Declaration of Dennis Hughes In Support of Removal, #13 Exhibit A to Dennis Hughes' Decl., #14 Exhibit B to Dennis Hughes' Decl., #15 Declaration of Andre Daigle In Support of Removal, #16 Exhibit A to Andre Daigle Decl., #17 Exhibit B to Andre Daigle Decl., #18 Exhibit C to Andre Daigle Decl., #19 Exhibit D to Andre Daigle Decl., #20 Exhibit E to Andre Daigle Decl., #21 Exhibit F to Andre Daigle Decl., #22 Exhibit G to Andre Daigle Decl., #23 Exhibit H to Andre Daigle Decl., #24 Exhibit I to Andre Daigle Decl., #25 Exhibit J to Andre Daigle Decl., #26 Exhibit K to Andre Daigle Decl., #27 Exhibit L to Andre Daigle Decl., #28 Exhibit M to Andre Daigle Decl., #29 Exhibit N to Andre Daigle Decl.) (Attorney Alexander Miller Chemers added to party Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Miller Chemers added to party Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Miller Chemers added to party Flowers Foods, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chemers, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raul James Barboza et al v. Flowers Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Marquez
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Peter S Rukin
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Aaron D Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lundvall
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Peter S Rukin
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Aaron D Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Peter S Rukin
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Aaron D Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Hayes
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Peter S Rukin
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Aaron D Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Martinson
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Peter S Rukin
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Aaron D Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Fierro
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Peter S Rukin
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Aaron D Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Blehm
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Peter S Rukin
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Aaron D Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Reaport
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Peter S Rukin
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Aaron D Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul James Barboza
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Peter S Rukin
Represented By: Valerie Jean Brender
Represented By: Aaron D Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Modesto LLC
Represented By: Alexander Miller Chemers
Represented By: Jared Lee Palmer
Represented By: John Patrick Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Miller Chemers
Represented By: Jared Lee Palmer
Represented By: John Patrick Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Henderson LLC
Represented By: Alexander Miller Chemers
Represented By: Jared Lee Palmer
Represented By: John Patrick Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?