AVOZAR LLC v. Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: AVOZAR LLC
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., an Illinois corporation, Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv08103
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court has received and reviewed the response to the Order to Show Cause. The Court discharges the Order to Show Cause. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Morrow, David)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order to Show Cause re Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Defendant is ordered to file an amended notice of removal, with a redlined version sent to the chambers e-mail inbox, no later than 11/4/2019 correcting the jurisdictional allegations. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., an Illinois corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on September 19, 2019. (Morrow, David)
September 18, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 09/18/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
September 18, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff AVOZAR LLC against Defendants Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/23/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., an Illinois corporation, identifying Altoha, Inc., a Delaware Holding Company; Hiscox Ltd., a Bermuda Company. (Morrow, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., an Illinois corporation. (Morrow, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV26055 Receipt No: 0973-24462551 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., an Illinois corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer to Complaint) (Attorney David M Morrow added to party Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., an Illinois corporation(pty:dft))(Morrow, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AVOZAR LLC v. Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., an Illinois corporation
Represented By: David M Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: David M Morrow
Represented By: Paul S White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVOZAR LLC
Represented By: Daniel E Park
Represented By: Christopher Campbell Cianci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?