Mirna Eilizabeth Martinez Barrera v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mirna Eilizabeth Barrera and Mirna Eilizabeth Martinez Barrera
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Does 1 to 25, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv08146
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 9/23/2019, the Court set a Scheduling Conference #9 . As required by the Court's 9/23/2019 Order, Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), and Local Rule 26-1, counsel are required to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report, attaching a worksheet (Exhibit A). To date, the worksheet has not been filed. The Scheduling Conference is continued to 12/6/2019 at 09:30 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. The parties shall file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report, attaching the worksheet attached to the Court's 9/23/2019 Order, by no later than 11/22/2019. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5, filed by Plaintiff Mirna Eilizabeth Martinez Barrera.. (Tabone, Derek)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Angelo, Lisa)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
September 19, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does 1 to 25, Inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Mirna Eilizabeth Martinez Barrera. Filed in State Court on 8/7/19 Submitted with attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Pary and Notice to State Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Angelo, Lisa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, identifying None. (Angelo, Lisa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Angelo, Lisa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV27762 Receipt No: 0973-24470768 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - CT Corp. Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Statement of Damages, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Misc. Documents Filed With Complaint, #5 Declaration Declaration of Lisa D. Angelo) (Attorney Lisa D Angelo added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:bkmov))(Angelo, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirna Eilizabeth Martinez Barrera v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirna Eilizabeth Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirna Eilizabeth Martinez Barrera
Represented By: Derek L Tabone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Lisa D Angelo
Represented By: Jonathan E Tarkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?