John Medina v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: John Medina
Defendant: Commissioner SSA Andrew M. Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv08150
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Percy Anderson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Medina, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 10/9/2019, answer due 2/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G. Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ely Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service U.S. Attorney for the Central District of California, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service Attorney General of the United States, #3 Exhibit Commissioner of Social Security Administration)(Sanders, Olivia)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ch)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (lh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff John Medina. (Sanders, Olivia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John Medina, identifying Andrew M. Saul,Commissioner Social Security; Office of General Counsel, Chief Counsel, Region IX; John Medina. (Sanders, Olivia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff John Medina. (Sanders, Olivia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24471429 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff John Medina. (Attorney Olivia Sanders added to party John Medina(pty:pla))(Sanders, Olivia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Medina v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner SSA Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Medina
Represented By: Olivia Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?