Brian Whitaker v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv08240
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker.. (Price, Dennis)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ashley D Stein on behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Attorney Ashley D Stein added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Stein, Ashley)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert W Conti on behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Attorney Robert W Conti added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Conti, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Cannizzaro, Charles)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Attorney Charles Michael Cannizzaro added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Cannizzaro, Charles)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY (Becky De George) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(4). (See document for full details) (mrgo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of service)(Handy, Russell)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 10/8/2019.) (mrgo)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (lh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kss)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24487995 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Ashley D Stein
Represented By: Robert W Conti
Represented By: Charles Michael Cannizzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?