International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12 v. Security Paving Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12
Defendant: Security Paving Company Inc and Security Paving Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv08283
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Court hereby issues this supplemental Case Management Order to establish a schedule governing Plaintiffs anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment seeking to compel arbitration. Where the Scheduling Order and this Order conflict, this Order shall govern. Plaintiff may file its motion for summary judgment on or before April 16, 2020. Defendants Response shall be due twenty-one (21) days after Plaintiffs motion is filed, or on or before May 7, 2020. Plaintiff may file a Reply within 14 days of the date Defendant files its Response, or on or before May 21,2020. The hearing on Plaintiffs anticipated motion for summary judgment shall be noticed no later than June 22, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. (lc)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. Bench trial: 10/2/20 9:00 AM; File final trial exhibit stipulation: 10/1/20; hearing on motions in limine: 9/28/20 1:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference: 9/14/20 1:30 PM; file motions in limine: 9/14/20; lodge Pretrial conference order and pretrial exhibit stipulation, file contentions of fact and law, exhibit and witness lists, status report regarding settlement: 9/4/20; last date to conduct settlement conference: 5/29/20; last day for hearing motions: 6/22/20; expert discovery cutoff: 5/15/20 ; percipient/fact discovery cutoff: 4/16/20; last date to amend pleadings or add parties: 5/25/20 (lc)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for Settlement Conference. (lc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 21, 2020 Filing 15 Joint Scheduling Conference Report filed by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12 re: Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #14 (Urban, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for March 2, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. This case has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Otis D. Wright II. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the court as well. (See order for further details) (yl)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Security Paving Company, Inc., (Shaffer, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Security Paving Company, Inc..(Attorney Robert H Shaffer, Jr added to party Security Paving Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Shaffer, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Security Paving Company, Inc. filed by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Urban, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12, upon Defendant Security Paving Company, Inc. served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Urban, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08283 ODW (GJSx). (esa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Security Paving Company, Inc. (ghap)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12, (Urban, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12. (Urban, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12. (Urban, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24495660 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12. (Attorney Michael A Urban added to party International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12(pty:pla))(Urban, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12 v. Security Paving Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 12
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Hugo Antonio Tzec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Paving Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Paving Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert H Shaffer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?