Andrew Prokos v. Armada Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ANDREW PROKOS
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 and ARMADA COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv08473
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Armada Communications, Inc., (Schewe, Edward)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Armada Communications, Inc. (Schewe, Edward)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Armada Communications, Inc..(Schewe, Edward)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Armada Communications, Inc. answer now due 11/27/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Armada Communications, Inc..(Attorney Edward C Schewe added to party Armada Communications, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schewe, Edward)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrew Prokos, upon Defendant Armada Communications, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert Faulkner - Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (lc)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Armada Communications, Inc. (ghap)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ANDREW PROKOS. (Doniger, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by ANDREW PROKOS. (Doniger, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ANDREW PROKOS, (Doniger, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANDREW PROKOS. (Doniger, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24535052 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ANDREW PROKOS. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party ANDREW PROKOS(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Prokos v. Armada Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMADA COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Edward C Schewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW PROKOS
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Frank Gregory Casella
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?