Andrew Prokos v. Siliconangle Media, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ANDREW PROKOS
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 and SILICONANGLE MEDIA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv08479
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-08479 CBM(SSx). (rn)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Andrew Prokos. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (sbou)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrew Prokos, upon Defendant Siliconangle Media, Inc. served on 10/12/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John D. Furrier - Registered Agent for Service of Process in c/o "Jane Doe" in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Siliconangle Media, Inc. (lh)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ANDREW PROKOS. (Doniger, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by ANDREW PROKOS. (Doniger, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ANDREW PROKOS, (Doniger, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANDREW PROKOS. (Doniger, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24535634 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ANDREW PROKOS. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party ANDREW PROKOS(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Prokos v. Siliconangle Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILICONANGLE MEDIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW PROKOS
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Frank Gregory Casella
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?