Ebi Nikjoo, D.D.S. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ebi Nikjoo
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. and Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv08567
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on January 9, 2020. (gga)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd..(Downs, Andrew)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-08567 CJC(JEMx). (rn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. answer now due 11/12/2019; Hartford Casualty Insurance Company answer now due 11/12/2019, filed by Defendants Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.; Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Downs, Andrew)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-08567 ODW(JEMx). (rn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT [filed in the State Court] served on October 4, 2019. (Downs, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on October 4, 2019. (Downs, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
October 4, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Ebi Nikjoo. (filed in state court 12/11/18, submitted as document1, attachment 1) (esa)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., identifying Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Downs, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Downs, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18SMCV00324 Receipt No: 0973-24553325 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service Materials Hartford Casualty, #3 Exhibit C - Service Materials Sentinel, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Reassignment, #5 Exhibit E - Minutes 06.11.19, #6 Exhibit F - Minutes 09.12.19) (Attorney Andrew B Downs added to party Hartford Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew B Downs added to party Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Downs, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebi Nikjoo, D.D.S. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew B Downs
Represented By: Matthew A Trejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew B Downs
Represented By: Matthew A Trejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebi Nikjoo
Represented By: Ron A Rosen Janfaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?