Verinder Singh v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Verinder Singh
Respondent: U.S. Department of Justice, Carla L Provost, David M Radel, Donna Campagnolo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Timothy S Robbins, L. Francis Cissna, U.S. Customs and Immigration Enforcement, Lory C. Torres, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, William P. Barr, Terry Nelson, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Irene Martin and James Janecka
Case Number: 2:2019cv08665
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Verinder Singh. Dismissal is without. (Ghazialam, Bashir)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) CLOSING CASE by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY AND HOLD IN ABEYANCE #6 . Case should have been closed on entry dated October 23, 2019. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY AND HOLD IN ABEYANCE #5 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The Court, having considered the parties' stipulation, ORDERS as follows: 1) U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services ("USCIS") will exercise its discretionary authority to sua sponte conduct in good faith a de novo review of the credible fear finding of the Petitioner to determine if reconsideration of the negative determination is warranted (see document for further details). (hr)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by respondents William P. Barr, Donna Campagnolo, L. Francis Cissna, James Janecka, Irene Martin, Kevin K. McAleenan, Terry Nelson, Carla L Provost, David M Radel, Timothy S Robbins, Lory C. Torres, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Customs and Immigration Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Stay and Hold in Abeyance)(Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party William P. Barr(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party Donna Campagnolo (pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party L. Francis Cissna(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party James Janecka(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party Irene Martin(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party Terry Nelson(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party Carla L Provost(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party David M Radel(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party Timothy S Robbins(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party Lory C. Torres(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party U.S. Customs and Immigration Enforcement (pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:res), Attorney Mariam Kaloustian added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:res))(Kaloustian, Mariam)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. That Respondent William P. Barr; Donna Campagnolo; L. Francis Cissna; James Janecka; Irene Martin; Kevin K. McAleenan; Terry Nelson; Carla L Provost; David M Radel; Timothy S Robbins; Lory C. Torres; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; U.S. Customs and Border Protection; U.S. Customs and Immigration Enforcement; U.S. Department of Homeland Security; and U.S. Department of Justice file Answer to the Petition not later than 11/25/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (mba)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately an in the correct event category located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings - Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71). No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. 0973-24575429 for $5 filing fee, filed by PETITIONER VERINDER SINGH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL CASE COVER, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF BASHIR GHAZIALAM, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY STAY AND DIRECTING SERVICE) (Attorney Bashir Ghazialam added to party VERINDER SINGH(pty:pet))(Ghazialam, Bashir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verinder Singh v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carla L Provost
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David M Radel
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donna Campagnolo
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy S Robbins
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Customs and Immigration Enforcement
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lory C. Torres
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Nelson
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Irene Martin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Janecka
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Mariam Kaloustian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Verinder Singh
Represented By: Bashir Ghazialam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?