Mario Andrade et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Carol Andrade and Mario Andrade
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Peyton Cramer Ford d/b/a AutoNation Ford Torrance, Peyton Cramer Ford, Autonation Ford Torrance, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Peyton Cramer Ford doing business as Autonation Ford Torrance
Case Number: 2:2019cv08771
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiffs Carol Andrade, Mario Andrade. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Carol Andrade, Mario Andrade. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel filed by Plaintiffs Carol Andrade, Mario Andrade. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 19STCV31966, acknowledged on 12/6/2019. (iv)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REMANDING FROM UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT TO SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES by Judge George H. Wu remanding case to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 19STCV31966. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Carol Andrade, Mario Andrade.(Nguyen, Anh)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anh X Nguyen counsel for Plaintiffs Carol Andrade, Mario Andrade. Adding Anh X. Nguyen as counsel of record for Mario Andrade for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Anh X. Nguyen. (Attorney Anh X Nguyen added to party Carol Andrade(pty:pla), Attorney Anh X Nguyen added to party Mario Andrade(pty:pla))(Nguyen, Anh)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/25/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
October 11, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Autonation Ford Torrance, Does, Ford Motor Company, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Mario Andrade, Carol Andrade. (filed in state court 9/9/2019, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 4) (esa)
October 11, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Ford Motor Company. (filed in state court 10/11/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 39)(esa)
October 11, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiffs Mario Andrade, Carol Andrade, upon Defendant Ford Motor Company served on 9/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 2) (esa)
October 11, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Peyton Cramer Ford. (filed in state court 10/11/2019, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 50)(esa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, identifying State Street Corporation; Evercore Trust Company, N.A.; Black Rock, Inc.; and The Vanguard Group. (May, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of RICHARD J. MAY re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, Peyton Cramer Ford d/b/a AutoNation Ford Torrance. (May, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company, Peyton Cramer Ford d/b/a AutoNation Ford Torrance. (May, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV31966 Receipt No: 0973-24598587 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Peyton Cramer Ford d/b/a AutoNation Ford Torrance, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts) (Attorney Richard J May added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft), Attorney Richard J May added to party Peyton Cramer Ford d/b/a AutoNation Ford Torrance(pty:dft))(May, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mario Andrade et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Andrade
Represented By: Anh X Nguyen
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Andrade
Represented By: Anh X Nguyen
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Richard J May
Represented By: Stephen H Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton Cramer Ford d/b/a AutoNation Ford Torrance
Represented By: Richard J May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton Cramer Ford
Represented By: Richard J May
Represented By: Stephen H Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autonation Ford Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton Cramer Ford doing business as Autonation Ford Torrance
Represented By: Richard J May
Represented By: Stephen H Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?