Mina Kherad v. William P. Barr, et al
Plaintiff: Mina Kherad
Defendant: Does 1-5, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Field Office Directo Lory C Torres, US Citizenship & Immigration Services, US Attorney General WILLIAM P. BARR, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, William P. Barr and Lory C Torres
Case Number: 2:2019cv08797
Filed: October 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lory C Torres answer now due 1/14/2020; Kenneth T. Cuccinelli answer now due 1/14/2020; William P. Barr answer now due 1/14/2020; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services answer now due 1/14/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Lory C Torres; Kenneth T. Cuccinelli; William P. Barr; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Attorney Aaron C G Carpenter added to party William P. Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron C G Carpenter added to party Kenneth T. Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron C G Carpenter added to party Lory C Torres(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron C G Carpenter added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Aaron)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mina Kherad, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Flabia DeLaRosa on behalf of US Attorneys Office for Central District of California. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Delivered via Certified Mail. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Delivered via Certified Mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. USPS certified mail delivery confirmation of Proof of Service of Summons, complaint and other, attached (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail and Delivery Confirmation)(Ezzati, H.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Lory C Torres, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019: #1 addendum) (esa).
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
October 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mina Kherad. (Attachments: #1 Addendum to Summons Request)(Ezzati, H.)
October 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mina Kherad, (Ezzati, H.)
October 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mina Kherad. (Ezzati, H.)
October 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24600292 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mina Kherad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D) (Attorney H. Henry Ezzati added to party Mina Kherad(pty:pla))(Ezzati, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mina Kherad v. William P. Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Aaron C G Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo Lory C Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Aaron C G Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Aaron C G Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lory C Torres
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Aaron C G Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mina Kherad
Represented By: H. Henry Ezzati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?