Celsa Barrera v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Celsa Barrera
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv08869
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-8869 MAA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rosales, Steven)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Celsa Barrera, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 10/31/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Docket Entry No. 1 was filed as a Complaint, but the PDF document attached to that docket entry is a Summons, which is incorrect. The Complaint was correctly filed in Docket Entry No. 5 and the Summons was correctly filed in Docket Entry No. 2. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Docket Entry No. 1 be STRICKEN from the record and shall not be considered by the Court. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (csi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (csi)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #5 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (lh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 10/15/2019, receipt number 0973-24610114), filed by Plaintiff Celsa Barrera.(Rosales, Steven)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Celsa Barrera, (Rosales, Steven)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Celsa Barrera. (Rosales, Steven)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Celsa Barrera. (Rosales, Steven)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 10/17/2019, SEE DOCKET NO. 9] COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24610114 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Celsa Barrera. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Celsa Barrera(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven) Modified on 10/17/2019 (csi).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celsa Barrera v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celsa Barrera
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?