Xavier Nailing v. Donna Navarro et al
Plaintiff: Xavier Nailing
Defendant: Donna Navarro and Carlos Van Natter
Case Number: 2:2019cv08897
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) RE REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PENDING MOTIONS; AND (2) SUBMITTING AND VACATING HEARINGS ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SET BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE) AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (INCORRECTLY SET BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. As to Plaintiff's Motion, Plaintiff shall file any reply to Defendants' Opposition by not later than December 24, 2019. As to Defendants' Motion, Plaintiff shall file any response/opposition by not later than January 24, 2020. The Court finds Plaintiff's Motion and Defendants' Motion appropriate for decision without oral argument and vacates the January 7, 2020 hearing on Plaintiffs Motion set before the Magistrate Judge and the February 14, 2019 hearing on Defendants' Motion incorrectly set before the District Judge. Such matters are taken off calendar. (See document for details.) (sbou)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPPOSITION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Donna Navarro #14 filed by Defendants Donna Navarro, Carlos Van Natter. (Stark, Joseph)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Donna Navarro(Section 8 Advisor, in official capacity), Carlos Van Natter(Assistant Director Shelter Plus Care Program, in individual capacity). Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Request for Judicial Notice Vol. 1, #2 Appendix Request for Judicial Notice Vol. 2) (Attorney Joseph L Stark added to party Donna Navarro(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph L Stark added to party Carlos Van Natter(pty:dft)) (Stark, Joseph)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Xavier Nailing. (sbou)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Xavier Nailing. (sbou)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiff Xavier Nailing. (sbou)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Donna Navarro and Carlos Vanatter filed by Plaintiff Xavier Nailing. Motion set for hearing on 1/7/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (sbou) Modified on 12/3/2019 (sbou).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER RE: PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for pretrial proceedings. Except as otherwise specified in paragraph 1 below, all future documents submitted in this case shall be addressed to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, CA 90012-1565. (See document for details.) (sbou)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xavier Nailing, upon Defendant Carlos Van Natter(Assistant Director Shelter Plus Care Program) served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019;. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Van Natter in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (sbou)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xavier Nailing, upon Defendant Donna Navarro(Section 8 Advisor) served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019; Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Donna Navarro in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (sbou)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred),, #1 as to All Defendants. (sbou)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #7 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Xavier Nailing. (esa)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Xavier Nailing. (esa)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of William Revas in support of Complaint #1 filed by Plaintiff Xavier Nailing. (esa)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECLARATION of Brian Nailing in support of Complaint #1 filed by Plaintiff Xavier Nailing. (esa)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION of Grant Nailing in support of Complaint #1 filed by Plaintiff Xavier Nailing. (esa)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Xavier Nailing in support of Complaint #1 filed by Plaintiff Xavier Nailing. (esa)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against defendants Donna Navarro(Section 8 Advisor, in official capacity), Donna Navarro(Section 8 Advisor, in individual capacity), Carlos Van Natter(Assistant Director Shelter Plus Care Program, in individual capacity), Carlos Van Natter(Assistant Director Shelter Plus Care Program, in official capacity) Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, filed by plaintiff Xavier Nailing. (Attachments: #1 CV-71, #2 summons not issued) (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #3 Lodged Proposed Order) (esa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xavier Nailing v. Donna Navarro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Nailing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Navarro
Represented By: Joseph L Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Van Natter
Represented By: Joseph L Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?