Thomas W. McNamara v. Francis Lee et al
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Defendant: Jacqueline Rodriguez and Francis Lee
Case Number: 2:2019cv08904
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 Writ of Execution issued against Jacqueline Rodriguez re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution #8 . (bm)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Plaintiff Thomas W. McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Writ of Execution)(Blanda, Jon)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Caption of proposed writ does not indicate plaintiff(s). (bm)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Plaintiff Thomas W. McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Writ of Execution)(Blanda, Jon)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting #3 REQUEST (bm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because subsequent filings have changed the nature of the case. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Virginia A. Phillips is assigned to this new case number 2:19-cv-08904-VAP. All future documents must be filed under this new case number. The previous case number, 2:19-mc-00176-UA, is hereby terminated. (car)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Order for For Service of Process by Registered Process Server filed by attorney for plaintiff Thomas W. McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For service of process by registered process server) (Blanda, Jon)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MISC - Registration of Judgment from Another District (AO-451) #1 (Blanda, Jon)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 REGISTRATION OF JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: 0973-24485228 - Fee: $47, filed by attorney for plaintiff Thomas W. McNamara. (Attorney Jon O Blanda added to party Thomas W. McNamara(pty:pla))(Blanda, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas W. McNamara v. Francis Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. McNamara
Represented By: Angela A Velen
Represented By: Jon O Blanda
Represented By: Jeffery Kaoru Mukai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?