Razmik Zakarian v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Razmik Zakarian
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv08970
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-8970 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Shapiro, Brian)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Razmik Zakarian, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 11/1/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shapiro, Brian)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (jtil)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Razmik Zakarian, (Shapiro, Brian)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Razmik Zakarian. (Shapiro, Brian)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Razmik Zakarian. (Shapiro, Brian)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24625395 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Razmik Zakarian. (Attorney Brian C Shapiro added to party Razmik Zakarian(pty:pla))(Shapiro, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razmik Zakarian v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Razmik Zakarian
Represented By: Brian C Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?