Seth Shapiro v. AT&T Mobility, LLC
Plaintiff: Seth Shapiro
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC and Prime Communications, L.P.
Petitioner: CoWorx Staffing Services, LLC
Counter Defendant: Sequential Technology International, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv08972
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
2 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
3 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF COURT ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. On the Court's own motion, the scheduling conference, currently scheduled for September 12, 2023, is hereby ordered continued to October 3, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8D. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear in person. The Court further orders counsel to file a new joint Rule 26f report and this report should include specific dates such as fact discovery deadlines, expert discovery, hearing on motions, last date for settlement conference, proposed pretrial conference hearing date, and proposed jury trial date with an estimate days of trial, by no later than September 26, 2023. (lom)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the Plaintiff's request to appear telephonically #183 is hereby granted. Counsel for plaintiff, James A. Ulwick, will be allowed to appear by phone on September 12, 2023. See minute order for details. (lom)
September 5, 2023 Filing 184 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: REQUEST for Leave of James A. Ulwick to Appear for Case Management Conference Telephonically on September 12 2023, #183 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
September 5, 2023 Filing 183 REQUEST for Leave of James A. Ulwick to Appear for Case Management Conference Telephonically on September 12 2023, filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Ulwick, James)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 182 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER TEXT ONLY ENTRY [IN CHAMBERS] by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. On the Court's own motion the Scheduling Conference set for 9/05/2023 is hereby ordered continued to 09/12/2023 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties are to appear in person. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ys) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ORDER In Chambers-Off the Record by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Counsel are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference is placed back on the calendar for SEPTEMBER 5, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties shall appear in person in Courtroom 8D. (lom)
August 4, 2023 Filing 180 IN CHAMBERS - OFF THE RECORD by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Scheduling Conference, currently set for August 8, 2023, is hereby taken off calendar. The Court will set deadlines at a later date. A written order will issue.No one is to appear on August 8, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
August 1, 2023 Filing 179 STATUS REPORT (Joint 26(f) Status Report) filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Keller, Amy)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 178 IN CHAMBERS- ORDER RE: DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, #176 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's fourth and fifth causes of action for negligence and negligent supervision and entrustment dismissed with prejudice. Having granted the Motion, the July 11, 2023 hearing on the Motion is hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
June 22, 2023 Filing 177 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Counts IV and V of Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint #176 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Keller, Amy)
June 13, 2023 Filing 176 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Counts IV and V of Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ochsenbein, Jeremy)
June 13, 2023 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeremy Scott Ochsenbein on behalf of Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC (Attorney Jeremy Scott Ochsenbein added to party AT&T Mobility, LLC(pty:dft))(Ochsenbein, Jeremy)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT PRIME COMMUNICATIONS, L.P.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT #160 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court GRANTS Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.s Motion to Dismiss, and dismisses the Fifth Amended Complaint solely as to Defendant Prime Communications without prejudice to re-filing in a court with personal jurisdiction over Prime Communications, L.P. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
April 12, 2023 Filing 172 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. The Court finds that defendant's motion to dismiss 5th amended complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction #160 , and currently set for hearing on April 18, 2023, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. No appearances are necessary on April 18, 2023. A written order will issue. Taking under advisement #160 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (twdb)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 171 IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the Initial Standing Order issued on March 28, 2023 DKT NO. 169 was issued in error and is hereby stricken. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: GRANTING #168 Non-Resident Attorney James A. Ulwick APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Seth Shapiro, designating Moze Cowper as local counsel. (shb)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 169 [4/3/2023 - DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DKT, #171 - INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (kmh) Modified on 4/3/2023 (shb).
March 24, 2023 Filing 168 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Arthur Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35016444) filed by plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cowper, Christopher)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 IN CHAMBERS - NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF COURT ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: On the Court's own motion, the Defendant's motion to dismiss #160 , currently scheduled for March 28, 2023, is hereby ordered continued to APRIL 18, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear in person. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
March 10, 2023 Filing 166 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #160 Reply Memorandum In Support of Defendant Prime Communication L.P.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (Lichtman, Joshua)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting #163 REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher Moze Cowper for Seth Shapiro as attorney of record instead of Attorney Jennie Lee Anderson. (lom)
February 27, 2023 Filing 164 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #160 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Keller, Amy)
February 22, 2023 Filing 163 REQUEST of Jennie Lee Anderson to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Jennie)
February 17, 2023 Filing 162 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #154 filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC.(Aragon, Angeli)
February 13, 2023 Filing 161 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #154 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC.(Johnson, Ashley)
February 13, 2023 Filing 160 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lichtman, Joshua)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT SEQUENTIAL TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL LLCS EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT #158 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC to file its response to Plaintiff Seth Shapiros Fifth Amended Complaint, consistent with the parties Stipulation, is February 17, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
February 3, 2023 Filing 158 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #154 filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Aragon, Angeli)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT, #156 , by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Upon consideration of the stipulation filed by the parties, it is ORDERED that the 20 deadline for Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to file a response to Plaintiff Seth 21 Shapiro's Fifth Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is February 13, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
January 31, 2023 Filing 156 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, re Stipulation to Reschedule #150 : TheCourt hereby sets forth the following schedule regarding such filing, and anyrelated motion practice or other related pleadings: Plaintiff shall file his Fifth Amended Complaint, in compliance with this Courts December 20, 2022 order, no later than January 20, 2023. Thereafter, Defendant Prime Communications, L.P. (Prime) must file any response to the Fifth Amended Complaint, whether it be an Answer or motion, by February 13, 2023. If a motion is filed, the following briefing schedule will ensue: a. Plaintiff must file any response to that motion by February 27, 2023. b. Prime must file a reply, if any, by March 10, 2023. Should Prime file a motion to dismiss, or other dispositive motion, the Court will set a hearing schedule at that time. (shb)
January 20, 2023 Filing 154 Fifth AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Plaintiffs amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 , Amended Complaint/Petition, #55 , Amended Complaint/Petition, #74 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Amended Complaint/Petition, #33 , filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Keller, Amy)
January 11, 2023 Filing 153 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other) #152 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Other Filings Stipulations - select -Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
January 11, 2023 Filing 152 Notice Parties' Notice of Stipulation to Set Deadline and Briefing Schedule filed by Seth Shapiro Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed Order)(Keller, Amy)
January 10, 2023 Filing 151 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Reschedule #150 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
January 10, 2023 Filing 150 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Filing and Briefing Schedule filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro.(Keller, Amy)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS- ORDER RE: DEFENDANT PRIME COMMUNICATION, L.P.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #134 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Defendant Primes Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with leave to amend to allege facts demonstrating personal jurisdiction over Prime. Plaintiffs request for jurisdictional discovery is denied as premature. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
November 29, 2022 Filing 148 MINUTES OF HEARING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINTFOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #134 held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The case is called and counsel state their appearance. The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the case. Following discussions with the parties, the Court advises counsel that the motion is taken under submission and a written order will issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Judy Moore. (shb)
November 28, 2022 Filing 147 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alayna Monroe counsel for Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. Adding Alayna Monroe as counsel of record for AT&T Mobility LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attorney Alayna Monroe added to party AT&T Mobility, LLC(pty:dft))(Monroe, Alayna)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF COURT ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: On the Courts own motion, the Defendants motion to dismiss #134 , currently scheduled for November 22, 2022, is hereby ordered continued to NOVEMBER 29, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear in person. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER RE: PARTIES' STIPULATION TO VACATE THE CURRENT CASE SCHEDULE #144 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The current case schedule entered on April 7, 2022, ECF #116, is vacated, and the case is stayed pending the resolution of Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.'s pending Motion to Dismiss. The Court will enter a new case schedule, setting new case deadlines, following a Rule 16 conference between the parties, after the resolution of Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.'s pending Motion to Dismiss. (shb)
November 5, 2022 Filing 144 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date, Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Scheduling Order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Terminate Hearings,,, #116 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Keller, Amy)
October 18, 2022 Filing 143 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #134 filed by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (Lichtman, Joshua)
October 12, 2022 Filing 142 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christian M.G. Chung counsel for ThirdParty Defendant CoWorx Staffing Services, LLC. Christian M. Chung is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant COWORX STAFFING SERVICES, LLC. (Chung, Christian)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT PRIME COMMUNICATION, L.P. TO FILE ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE #140 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: 1. Primes deadline to file Reply papers in support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint based on asserted lack of personal jurisdiction (the Motion) is hereby extended by seven days, from October 11, 2022 to October 18, 2022; and 2. The hearing date for the Motion is hereby continued to November 22,2022 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
October 6, 2022 Filing 140 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #134 filed by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lichtman, Joshua)
October 4, 2022 Filing 139 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #134 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James A. Ulwick in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant Prime Communications, LP's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro)(Keller, Amy)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: GRANTING #133 Non-Resident Attorney Tomas E. Alarcon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Prime Communications, L.P., designating Joshua D. Lichtman as local counsel. (shb)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: GRANTING #132 Non-Resident Attorney Philip A. Tarpley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Prime Communications, L.P., designating Joshua D. Lichtman as local counsel. (shb)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: GRANTING #131 Non-Resident Attorney Jason K. Fagelman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Prime Communications, L.P., designating Joshua D. Lichtman as local counsel. (shb)
September 20, 2022 Filing 135 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert S. Kahn counsel for ThirdParty Defendant CoWorx Staffing Services, LLC. Adding Robert S. Kahn as counsel of record for Coworx Staffing Services LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Third Party Defendant Coworx Staffing Services, LLC. (Attorney Robert S. Kahn added to party CoWorx Staffing Services, LLC(pty:3pd))(Kahn, Robert)
September 19, 2022 Filing 134 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lichtman, Joshua)
September 19, 2022 Filing 133 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tomas E. Alarcon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Prime Communications, L.P. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34005144) filed by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lichtman, Joshua)
September 19, 2022 Filing 132 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Philip A. Tarpley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Prime Communications, L.P. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34005063) filed by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lichtman, Joshua)
September 19, 2022 Filing 131 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jason K. Fagelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Prime Communications, L.P. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34005006) filed by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lichtman, Joshua)
September 19, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Prime Communications, L.P., identifying ACE American Insurance Company. (Lichtman, Joshua)
September 19, 2022 Filing 129 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua D Lichtman counsel for Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. Adding Joshua D. Lichtman as counsel of record for Defendant PRIME COMMUNICATIONS, L.P. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant PRIME COMMUNICATIONS, L.P.. (Attorney Joshua D Lichtman added to party Prime Communications, L.P.(pty:dft))(Lichtman, Joshua)
July 25, 2022 Filing 128 ANSWER to Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, #127 filed by THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT Sequential Technology International, LLC.(Aragon, Angeli)
June 21, 2022 Filing 127 THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT COWORX STAFFING SERVICES, LLCS ANSWER to Third Party Complaint, #101 SEQUENTIAL TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, LLCS, COUNTERCLAIM against Sequential Technology International, LLC filed by Third-Party Defendant CoWorx Staffing Services, LLC.(Attorney Robert H Stellwagen, Jr added to party CoWorx Staffing Services, LLC(pty:3pd))(Stellwagen, Robert)
May 24, 2022 Filing 126 21 DAY Summons Issued re Fourth Amended Complaint, #74 as to Defendant Prime Communications, L.P. (shb)
May 23, 2022 Filing 125 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #74 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro Seth Shapiro. (Keller, Amy)
May 23, 2022 Filing 124 REFUND OF $500.00 made payable on 05/23/2022 to Jennie Anderson for payment made on 03/23/2022 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Arthur Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/23/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996489)[110 #123 . (rdj)
May 9, 2022 Filing 123 APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Arthur Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/23/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996489) #110 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Arthur Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996489) #104 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Anderson, Jennie)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: DENYING #110 Non-Resident Attorney James A. Ulwick APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. Terming Attorney James A. Ulwick. Pursuant to L.R. 83-21-2.1.3.4; Local Counsel does not maintain office (shb)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-08972-CBM (RAOx). (et)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (shb)
April 28, 2022 Filing 119 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:19-cv-08972 CBM(PDx). (rn)
April 19, 2022 Filing 118 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for ADR Procedure No. 3 - (ADR-1) #117 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): The Proposed Order (ADR-12) was not submitted with the Request. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
April 18, 2022 Filing 117 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC(Aragon, Angeli)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER In Chambers-Off the Record by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. The Scheduling Conference, currently set for April 12, 2022, is hereby taken off calendar. The Court will set the following deadlines: Initial disclosures shall be completed by April 19, 2022. ADR-1 Form shall be filed on or before April 19, 2022. Fact discovery shall be completed on or before December 6, 2022. Initial Expert disclosure due no later than January 6, 2023. Rebuttal expert disclosure completion due no later than February 6, 2023. Expert discovery shall be completed on or before February 20, 2023. Settlement conference shall be held on or before March 15, 2023. Motions shall be set for oral argument on or before April 25, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Pre Trial Conference is set on June 27, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. Jury Trial is set on July 11, 2023 at 10:00 a.m.(est. 5 days). (lom)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DATE #112 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. It is ORDERED that the scheduling conference currently scheduled for April 12, 2022 shall be vacated and reset for a date when all Defendants or Third-Party Defendants have answered the relevant Complaint or Third-Party Complaint. (lom)
April 6, 2022 Filing 114 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Arthur Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/23/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996489) #110 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
April 5, 2022 Filing 113 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Sequential Technology International, LLC (Aragon, Angeli)
April 5, 2022 Filing 112 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from 04/12/2022 to TBD filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
April 5, 2022 Filing 111 RULE 26 REPORT of Discovery Plan filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Johnson, Ashley)
April 5, 2022 Filing 110 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Arthur Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/23/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996489) filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Jennie)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: GRANTING #102 Non-Resident Attorney Amy E. Keller APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro, designating Jennie L. Anderson as local counsel. (shb)
March 24, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Arthur Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996489) #104 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section I of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
March 24, 2022 Filing 107 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint, #101 as to Third Party Defendant CoWorx Staffing Services, LLC. (shb)
March 23, 2022 Filing 106 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #101 filed by DEFENDANT AND THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF Sequential Technology International, LLC. (Aragon, Angeli)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF COURT ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: On the Courts own motion, the scheduling conference, currently scheduled for April 4, 2022, is hereby ordered continued to APRIL 12, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The Rule 26 report will be due April 5, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
March 23, 2022 Filing 104 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Arthur Ulwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32996489) filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Jennie)
March 22, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Third Party Complaint, #101 . The following error(s) was/were found: Request for Summons on Third Party Complaint was not submitted In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
March 22, 2022 Filing 102 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy Elisabeth Keller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (PHV fee of $500 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Amy E Keller added to party Seth Shapiro(pty:pla)) (Keller, Amy)
March 22, 2022 PHV FEE PAID for Non-Resident Attorney Amy Elisabeth Keller Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt No. ACACDC-32988320 for $500 pro hac vice fee. (Keller, Amy)
March 22, 2022 (Keller, Amy)
March 21, 2022 Filing 101 First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third Party Defendant CoWorx Staffing Services, LLC ; Jury Demand, filed by DEFENDANT AND THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFSEQUENTIAL TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL LLC Sequential Technology International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement CoWorx provided Field Associates to provide the following services to Synchronoss)(Aragon, Angeli)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #94 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting #94 Request to Substitute Attorney Jennie Lee Anderson for Seth Shapiro as attorney of record instead of Attorneys Christopher Grivakes and Damion D D Robinson. (lom)
March 7, 2022 Filing 99 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #74 filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC.(Aragon, Angeli)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT SEQUENTIAL TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL LLCS EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT, #96 , by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: It is ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC to file its response to Plaintiff Seth Shapiros Fourth Amended Complaint, consistent with the parties Stipulation, is March 7, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (ys)
February 14, 2022 Filing 96 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Aragon, Angeli)
February 14, 2022 Filing 95 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #74 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC.(Johnson, Ashley)
February 8, 2022 Filing 94 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Jennie Lee Anderson in place of attorney Chris Grivakes, Damion Robinson filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jennie Lee Anderson added to party Seth Shapiro(pty:pla)) (Anderson, Jennie)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO FILE FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT #88 , by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion to File Fifth Amended Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
November 30, 2021 Filing 92 MINUTES OF HEARING RE MOTION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT #88 held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the case. Following discussions with the parties, the Court advises counsel that the motion is taken under submission and a written order will issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (shb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 91 REPLY support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Complaint #88 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Grivakes, Christopher)
November 9, 2021 Filing 90 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Complaint #88 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Johnson, Ashley)
November 9, 2021 Filing 89 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Complaint #88 filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC. (Aragon, Angeli)
October 28, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Complaint filed by plaintiff Seth Shapiro. Motion set for hearing on 11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grivakes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Grivakes, Christopher)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REGARDING AT&T'S AND SEQUENTIAL'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF;S FOURTH AND FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINTS, #86 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Seth Shapiro shall file his motion for leave to amend the Fourth Amended Complaint on or before October 29, 2021. The current deadlines for Defendants AT&T and Sequential Technology International, LLC to respond to Mr. Shapiro's 4th AC are no longer in effect. The Court GRANTS Mr. Shapiro's motion for leave to amend, each Defendant shall be required to respond to Mr. Shapiro's 5th Amended Complaint on or before 21 days from the filing of the 5th AC, and each defendant will further have the right to respond and to challenge the sufficiency of the allegations in the 5th AC. The deadline to answer Mr. Shapiro's 5th AC will be 21 days after the Court ruling on all Defendants' motions to dismiss part or all of the 5th AC. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more details. (shb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 86 STIPULATION for Order Regarding Responses to Fourth and Fifth Amended Complaints filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS 6 AND 7 OF PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT #78 #79 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, the Court GRANTS AT and T's Motion. Plaintiff's sixth causeof action for concealment is dismissed with prejudice, and Plaintiff's seventh cause of action for intentional misrepresentation is dismissed without prejudice. (See Order for further details). (jp)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court finds that the motions to dismiss #78 [and #79 , currently set for hearing on September 28, 2021, is appropriate for decision without oral argument.Accordingly, these motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. No appearances are necessary on September 28, 2021. A written order will issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
September 14, 2021 Filing 83 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Counts 6 and 7; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) (with Proposed Order) #79 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Johnson, Ashley)
September 8, 2021 Filing 82 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Counts 6 and 7; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) (with Proposed Order) #79 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Grivakes, Christopher)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT SEQUENTIAL TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL LLCS EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT, #80 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC to file its response to Plaintiff Seth Shapiros Fourth Amended Complaint, consistent with the parties Stipulation, is October 12, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 80 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #74 filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Aragon, Angeli)
August 27, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Counts 6 and 7; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) (with Proposed Order) filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Ashley)
August 27, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Counts 6 and 7; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Johnson, Ashley)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS FILING OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT, #73 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Upon consideration of the stipulation filed by the parties, it is ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC (AT&T) to answer Plaintiff Seth Shapiros Third Amended Complaint is vacated. AT&T must respond to Shapiros Fourth Amended Complaint (FAC) on or before 21 days after the filing of the FAC. To the extent AT&T moves to dismiss any portion of the FAC, AT&Ts answer to Shapiros FAC shall be due 14 calendar days after the Courts ruling on AT&Ts motion to dismiss. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT SEQUENTIAL TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL LLCS EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT #75 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC to file its response to Plaintiff Seth Shapiros Fourth Amended Complaint, consistent with the parties Stipulation, is September 7, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
August 9, 2021 Filing 75 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition, #74 filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT)(Aragon, Angeli)
August 6, 2021 Filing 74 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Seth Shapiro amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #55 , filed by plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Grivakes, Christopher)
August 6, 2021 Filing 73 STIPULATION for Order Regarding Responses to Third and Fourth Amended Complaints filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT #64 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court GRANTS AT&Ts Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs sixth cause of action in the TAC for concealment with leave to amend. To the extent Plaintiff files an amended complaint to allege additional facts correcting the deficiencies identified in this Order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than August 6, 2021. A failure to file an amended complaint by that date shall result in dismissal of Plaintiffs concealment claim with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. The Court finds that Defendants' Motion to dismiss #64 , currently scheduled for hearing on July 20, 2021, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. No appearances are necessary on July 20, 2021. A written order will issue. (lom) Modified on 7/14/2021 (lom).
July 6, 2021 Filing 70 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Count 6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #64 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Johnson, Ashley)
June 22, 2021 Filing 69 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #21 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Grivakes, Christopher)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT SEQUENTIAL TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIONAL LLCS EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, #67 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC to file its response to Plaintiff Seth Shapiro's Third Amended Complaint, consistent with the parties' Stipulation, is August 16, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
June 9, 2021 Filing 67 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 16, 2021 re Amended Complaint/Petition, #55 filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Aragon, Angeli)
June 9, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC, identifying APC Holdings and Synchronoss Technologies. (Aragon, Angeli)
June 9, 2021 Filing 65 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response, STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sequential Technology International, LLC answer now due 6/15/2021, filed by Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC.(Attorney Angeli C Aragon added to party Sequential Technology International, LLC(pty:dft))(Aragon, Angeli)
June 2, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Count 6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Ashley)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT #62 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Upon consideration of the stipulation filed by the parties, it is ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to file a response to Plaintiff Seth Shapiros Third Amended Complaint (the TAC) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 consistent with the parties stipulation is June 2, 2021. The deadline for Plaintiffs response to Defendants motion shall be June 22, 2021. The deadline for Defendants reply in support of its motion shall be July 6, 2021. Defendant is not required to answer any portion of the TAC until 14 days after the Courts ruling on AT&Ts Motion to Dismiss the TAC.IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
May 10, 2021 Filing 62 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AT&T Mobility, LLC answer now due 6/2/2021, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #55 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS FILING OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT #60 , by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS FILING OF A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT: Upon consideration of the stipulation filed by the parties, it is ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to file a response to Plaintiff Seth Shapiros Third Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 consistent with the parties stipulation is May 12, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 60 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AT&T Mobility, LLC answer now due 5/12/2021, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #55 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
April 6, 2021 Filing 59 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Amended Complaint, #55 as to Defendant Sequential Technology International, LLC. (shb)
April 6, 2021 Filing 58 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #55 as to Defendant Prime Communications, L.P.. (shb)
April 5, 2021 Filing 57 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #55 filed by plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Grivakes, Christopher)
April 5, 2021 Filing 56 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #55 filed by plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Grivakes, Christopher)
April 5, 2021 Filing 55 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 , filed by plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Grivakes, Christopher)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #53 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Seth Shapiros deadline to file a Third Amended Complaint consistent with the parties stipulation is March 29, 2021. Defendant AT&T Mobility LLCs deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is April 28, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
March 17, 2021 Filing 53 STIPULATION for Order Setting Schedule for Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #51 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Upon consideration of the stipulation filed by the parties, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Seth Shapiro's deadline to file a Third Amended Complaint consistent with the parties' stipulation is February 23, 2021. Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is March 19, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
February 4, 2021 Filing 51 STIPULATION for Order Setting Schedule for Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
January 20, 2021 Filing 50 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #33 , filed by plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Grivakes, Christopher)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #48 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Upon consideration of the stipulation filed by the parties, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff Seth Shapiros deadline to file a Second Amended Complaint consistent with the parties stipulation is January 20, 2021. Defendant AT&T Mobility LLCs deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is February 10, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
January 12, 2021 Filing 48 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AT&T Mobility, LLC answer now due 2/10/2021, filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #46 , by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant AT & T Mobility LLC's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(a)(4) is extended until January 13, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
December 30, 2020 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AT&T Mobility, LLC answer now due 1/13/2021, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #33 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #37 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court rules on Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint as follows: (1) Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs third cause of action for violation of his privacy rights under the California Constitution is DENIED; and (2) Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs sixth cause of action for violations of Californias Consumer Legal Remedies Act is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs CLRA claim is dismissed without leave to amend. See order for further details. (shb)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting #43 Request to Substitute Attorney Christopher Grivakes as attorney of record instead of Attorneys Andrew Emilio Calderon and John Mark Pierce for Seth Shapiro. (lom)
August 10, 2020 Filing 43 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Christopher Grivakes in place of attorney John M. Pierce filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney Christopher Grivakes added to party Seth Shapiro(pty:pla)) (Grivakes, Christopher)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court finds that defendant's motion to dismiss #37 , and currently set for hearing on July 28, 2020, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. No appearances are necessary on July 28, 2020. A written order will issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
July 14, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Counts III and VI); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #37 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Johnson, Ashley)
July 7, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Counts III and VI); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #37 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Pierce, John)
July 7, 2020 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant AT&T's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Pierce, John)
June 26, 2020 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Ashley E. Johnson in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Counts III and VI); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #37 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McRae, Marcellus)
June 26, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Counts III and VI); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McRae, Marcellus)
June 22, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Clarify Deadline for Answer to FAC in Light of Partial MTD, Re: Amended Complaint/Petition, #33 , filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC.(Johnson, Ashley)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall GRANTING Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, #34 . IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for AT & T to respond to Mr. Shapiro's Complaint is June 26, 2020. (shb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Ashley)
May 29, 2020 Filing 33 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Pierce, John)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT #21 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Accordingly, the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART. To the extent Plaintiff seeks to amend the Complaint to plead additional facts addressing the deficiencies set forth in this Order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint no later than May 29, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See Order for further details) (yl)
April 23, 2020 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas D Warren counsel for Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. Thomas D. Warren is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Warren, Thomas)
April 20, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Mark Pierce counsel for Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. Adding John M. Pierce as counsel of record for Plaintiff Seth Shapiro for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attorney John Mark Pierce added to party Seth Shapiro(pty:pla))(Pierce, John)
April 3, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas D Warren counsel for Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. Dwayne D. Sam is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Warren, Thomas)
February 18, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTES OF HEARING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #21 held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The case is called and counsel state their appearance. The Court and counsel confer. Following discussions with the parties, the Court will take the motion under submission and a written order will issue. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (shb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #21 filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (McRae, Marcellus)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: GRANTING #25 Non-Resident Attorney Ashley E. Johnson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, AT&T Mobility, LLC, designating Marcellus A. McRae as local counsel. (shb)
January 14, 2020 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ashley E. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25123887) filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McRae, Marcellus)
January 8, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #21 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Warren, Thomas)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS-ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the Joint Stipulation to set #22 plaintiff's time to file an opposition to defendant's motion and set defendant's time to reply to plaintiff's opposition is GRANTED. (shb)
December 14, 2019 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION to Reset filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC.(McRae, Marcellus)
December 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McRae, Marcellus)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC, identifying AT&T Inc.. (McRae, Marcellus)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: GRANTING #14 Non-Resident Attorney Dwayne D. Sam APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro, designating Thomas D. Warren as local counsel. (shb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AT&T Mobility LLC answer now due 12/6/2019, filed by Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC.(Attorney Marcellus A McRae added to party AT&T Mobility LLC(pty:dft))(McRae, Marcellus)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Warren, Thomas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro, upon Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Warren, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dwayne D. Sam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24669496) filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Warren, Thomas)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC. (shb)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-08972 CBM(FFMx). (rn)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Warren, Thomas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dwayne D. Sam. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jtil)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew Emilio Calderon on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Shapiro (Attorney Andrew Emilio Calderon added to party Seth Shapiro(pty:pla))(Calderon, Andrew)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Warren, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Seth Shapiro Seth Shapiro, identifying Plaintiff. (Warren, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Warren, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24625613 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Seth Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Shapiro CLRA Affidavit) (Attorney Thomas D Warren added to party Seth Shapiro(pty:pla))(Warren, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seth Shapiro v. AT&T Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Shapiro
Represented By: Andrew Emilio Calderon
Represented By: Thomas D Warren
Represented By: Dwayne D Sam
Represented By: John Mark Pierce
Represented By: Christopher Grivakes
Represented By: Damion D D Robinson
Represented By: Thomas D. Warren
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Amy E Keller
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: James A. Ulwick
Represented By: Marcellus A McRae
Represented By: Christopher Moze Cowper
Represented By: James Arthur Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Marcellus A McRae
Represented By: Ashley E Johnson
Represented By: Alayna Monroe
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Ochsenbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Communications, L.P.
Represented By: Joshua D Lichtman
Represented By: Jason K. Fagelman
Represented By: Joshua D. Lichtman
Represented By: Philip A. Tarpley
Represented By: Tomas E. Alarcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sequential Technology International, LLC
Represented By: Angeli C Aragon
Represented By: Clint D Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CoWorx Staffing Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?