R and R Express Logistics, Inc. v. All City Express, LLC
Plaintiff: R and R Express Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and All City Express, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv08988
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to All City Express, LLC a Georgia limited liability company (shb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against DEFENDANT All City Express, LLC filed by PLAINTIFF R and R Express Logistics, Inc.. (Jeffries, Kathleen)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff R and R Express Logistics, Inc., upon Defendant All City Express, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Bakhadyr Komilov, Registered Agent for All City Express, LLC. (Jeffries, Kathleen)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant All City Express, LLC. (esa)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (esa)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff R&R Express Logistics, Inc., (Jeffries, Kathleen)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff R&R Express Logistics, Inc.. (Jeffries, Kathleen)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff R&R Express Logistics, Inc.. (Jeffries, Kathleen)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24629255 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff R&R Express Logistics, Inc.. (Attorney Kathleen Collins Jeffries added to party R&R Express Logistics, Inc.(pty:pla))(Jeffries, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R and R Express Logistics, Inc. v. All City Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All City Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R and R Express Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Collins Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?