Great American Alliance Insurance Company v. Eva Care Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Great American Alliance Insurance Company
Defendant: Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield, LLC, San Bernardino Care Company, Inc., Greenfield Care Center of Fullerton, LLC, Ray Properties Kit Carson, Inc., Greenfield Care Center of Gardena, Inc., Fillmore Country Club, LLC, International Professional Staffing, LLC, Eva Care Physical Therapy Inc., Empress Care Center, LLC, Unistaff Registry, LLC, Montclair Manor Care Center, LLC and Eva Care Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv09131
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09131 ODW(JPRx). (rn)
November 20, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Empress Care Center, LLC, Eva Care Group, LLC, Eva Care Physical Therapy Inc., Fillmore Country Club, LLC, Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield, LLC, Greenfield Care Center of Fullerton, LLC, Greenfield Care Center of Gardena, Inc., International Professional Staffing, LLC, Montclair Manor Care Center, LLC, Ray Properties Kit Carson, Inc., San Bernardino Care Company, Inc., Unistaff Registry, LLC. (Hamassian, Maria)
November 20, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Empress Care Center, LLC, Eva Care Group, LLC, Eva Care Physical Therapy Inc., Fillmore Country Club, LLC, Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield, LLC, Greenfield Care Center of Fullerton, LLC, Greenfield Care Center of Gardena, Inc., International Professional Staffing, LLC, Montclair Manor Care Center, LLC, Ray Properties Kit Carson, Inc., San Bernardino Care Company, Inc., Unistaff Registry, LLC.(Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party Empress Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party Eva Care Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party Eva Care Physical Therapy Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party Fillmore Country Club, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party Greenfield Care Center of Fullerton, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party Greenfield Care Center of Gardena, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party International Professional Staffing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party Montclair Manor Care Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party Ray Properties Kit Carson, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party San Bernardino Care Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Ajemian added to party Unistaff Registry, LLC(pty:dft))(Ajemian, Maria)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant San Bernardino Care Company, Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant Greenfield Care Center of Gardena, Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant Montclair Manor Care Center, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant Greenfield Care Center of Fullerton, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant Empress Care Center, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant International Professional Staffing, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant Unistaff Registry, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant Fillmore Country Club, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant Ray Properties Kit Carson, Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Ray Properties Kit Carson, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant Eva Care Physical Therapy Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Eva Care Physical Therapy Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, upon Defendant Eva Care Group, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Eva Care Group, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schulte, Yvonne)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendants Empress Care Center, LLC, Eva Care Group, LLC, Eva Care Physical Therapy Inc., Fillmore Country Club, LLC, Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield, LLC, Greenfield Care Center of Fullerton, LLC, Greenfield Care Center of Gardena, Inc., International Professional Staffing, LLC, Montclair Manor Care Center, LLC, Ray Properties Kit Carson, Inc., San Bernardino Care Company, Inc., Unistaff Registry, LLC. (shb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company. (Schulte, Yvonne)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company, identifying Great American Alliance Insurance Company; Great American Insurance Company, which is parent corporation of Great American Alliance Insurance Company; and American Financial Group, Inc., which is parent corporation of Great American Insurance Company. (Schulte, Yvonne)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company. (Schulte, Yvonne)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24659543 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy to Ray Properties, #2 Exhibit B - Insurance Policy to Ray Properties - Renewed, #3 Exhibit C - Insurance Policy to Eva Care Group, #4 Exhibit D - Insurance Policy to Eva Care Group - Renewed, #5 Exhibit E - Insurance Policy to Eva Care Inc., #6 Exhibit F - Insurance Policy to Eva Care Inc. - Renewed, #7 Exhibit G - Collateral Agreement) (Attorney Yvonne M Schulte added to party Great American Alliance Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Schulte, Yvonne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Alliance Insurance Company v. Eva Care Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenfield Care Center of Fairfield, LLC
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino Care Company, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenfield Care Center of Fullerton, LLC
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Properties Kit Carson, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenfield Care Center of Gardena, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fillmore Country Club, LLC
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Professional Staffing, LLC
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Care Physical Therapy Inc.
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empress Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unistaff Registry, LLC
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montclair Manor Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Care Group, LLC
Represented By: Maria Hamassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Alliance Insurance Company
Represented By: Yvonne M Schulte
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Celebrezze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?