Stephen Lloyd Bates v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Lloyd Bates
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv09152
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Bastian
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
2 Judge: Patrick J Walsh
3 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order to Show Cause, #24 . The incorrect.pdf image was attached to docket entry 24. The correct.pdf image for docket entry 24 is attached hereto. (Attachments: #1 Order to Show Cause Dkt 24) (shb)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 [SEE DKT #25 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR FOR CORRECT IMAGE]. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Stanley Bastian. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, the parties are directed to show cause why the Court should not impose the following schedule for case specific discovery, specific dispositive motions, and case specific Daubert motions (if any): Within 14 days after entry of the Courts Scheduling Order, Rule 26(a) disclosures shall be exchanged by the Parties. Within 30 days after entry of the Courts Scheduling Order, Plaintiff will produce the completed Plaintiffs Fact Sheet and related information utilized in the In re: C.R. Bard, Inc. IVC Filter MDL. See order for further details. (shb) Modified on 12/17/2019 (shb).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#19-074) approved by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that the following cases be reassigned from the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Stanley A. Bastian for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09152 SAB(PJWx). (rn)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-01945 MWF(PJWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09152 MWF(PJWx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #14 Request to Substitute Attorney. Adil M. Khan is substituted in place of Richard B North, Jr for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. (mrgo)
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory D Rueb counsel for Plaintiff Stephen Lloyd Bates. Adding Gregory David Rueb as counsel of record for Stephen Lloyd Bates for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Stephen Lloyd Bates. (Attorney Gregory D Rueb added to party Stephen Lloyd Bates(pty:pla))(Rueb, Gregory)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Colette Jeanine McEldowney counsel for Plaintiff Stephen Lloyd Bates. Paul Lincoln Stoller is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Stephen Lloyd Bates. (McEldowney, Colette)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Colette Jeanine McEldowney counsel for Plaintiff Stephen Lloyd Bates. John A. Dalimonte is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Stephen Lloyd Bates. (McEldowney, Colette)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Colette Jeanine McEldowney counsel for Plaintiff Stephen Lloyd Bates. Adding Colette Jeanine McEldowney as counsel of record for Stephen Lloyd Bates for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Stephen Lloyd Bates. (Attorney Colette Jeanine McEldowney added to party Stephen Lloyd Bates(pty:pla))(McEldowney, Colette)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anna Yeung counsel for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Attorney Anna Yeung added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Anna Yeung added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Yeung, Anna)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Blakeley S Oranburg counsel for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Attorney Blakeley S Oranburg added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Blakeley S Oranburg added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Oranburg, Blakeley)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Richard B. North as counsel of record filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Khan, Adil)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, identifying Stephen Lloyd Bates, C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. and Becton, Dickinson and Company. (Khan, Adil)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adil M Khan counsel for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Adding Adil M. Khan as counsel of record for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Attorney Adil M Khan added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Adil M Khan added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Khan, Adil)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard B North, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul Lincoln Stoller. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John A Dalimonte. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/25/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Arizona
October 22, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Central District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-4519-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16277910 filed by Stephen Lloyd Bates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephen Lloyd Bates v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Adil M Khan
Represented By: Blakeley S Oranburg
Represented By: Anna Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Adil M Khan
Represented By: Blakeley S Oranburg
Represented By: Anna Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Lloyd Bates
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Colette Jeanine McEldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?