Luis Manuel Robledo v. Crafco, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Luis Manuel Robledo
Defendant: Crafco, Inc. and Does 1 to 20, inclusive
Not Yet Classified: Ergon
Case Number: 2:2019cv09171
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets the following: Discovery cut-off 7/6/2020. Motions due by 9/3/2020. Last date to conduct Mediation is 6/26/2020. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 6/29/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT REPORT of JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Luis Manuel Robledo. (Millard, Mark)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/5/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09171 GW(MAAx). (rn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
October 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Crafco, Inc.(filed in state court 10/23/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 22)(esa)
October 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Crafco, Inc., Does, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Luis Manuel Robledo. (filed in state court 9/11/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 5) (esa)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Crafco, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on October 24, 2019. (Owens, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Crafco, Inc., identifying Luis Manuel Robledo, Crafco, Inc. and Ergon. (Owens, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Crafco, Inc.. (Owens, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV32257 Receipt No: 0973-24665860 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Crafco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joseph Owens in Support of Notice of Removal) (Attorney Joseph C Owens added to party Crafco, Inc.(pty:dft))(Owens, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Manuel Robledo v. Crafco, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Ergon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Manuel Robledo
Represented By: Joseph G Younes
Represented By: Bryan C Payne
Represented By: Raphael Dara Javid
Represented By: Mark Evans Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crafco, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C Owens
Represented By: Dana Alden Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?