Ilan N. Rosen Janfaza et al v. Royal Palace Royal Girls Cabaret, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ilan N. Rosen Janfaza
Defendant: Anthony Omar Mudarris, Royal Palace Royal Girls Cabaret, LLC, 7180 Sunset Blvd., Inc., Marcelle Ezerzer, Synn Gentlemen's Club, Does 5-50, inclusive, Does 1-2, inclusive and Synn Gentlemens Club
Case Number: 2:2019cv09183
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson remanding case to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number BC659846. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Exhibit Certification and Notice of Interested Parties are attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
October 24, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery), plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 4 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Marcelle Ezerzer, filed by plaintiff Ilan N. Rosen Janfaza. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/23/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
October 24, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery), plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 3 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be 7180 Sunset Boul., Inc., filed by plaintiff Ilan N. Rosen Janfaza. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/23/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap) Modified on 10/29/2019 (ghap).
October 24, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants 7180 Sunset Blvd., Inc., Does(5-50, inclusive), Does(1-2, inclusive ), Marcelle Ezerzer, Anthony Omar Mudarris, Royal Palace Royal Girls Cabaret, LLC, Synn Gentlemens Club., filed by plaintiff Ilan N. Rosen Janfaza. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/2/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number BC659846 Receipt No: 0973-24667851 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Marcelle Ezerzer, 7180 Sunset Blvd., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Certification and Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney David Keith Dorenfeld added to party 7180 Sunset Blvd., Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney David Keith Dorenfeld added to party Marcelle Ezerzer(pty:dft))(Dorenfeld, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ilan N. Rosen Janfaza et al v. Royal Palace Royal Girls Cabaret, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilan N. Rosen Janfaza
Represented By: Mark R Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Omar Mudarris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Palace Royal Girls Cabaret, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7180 Sunset Blvd., Inc.
Represented By: David Keith Dorenfeld
Represented By: Mazyar Hassan Mazarei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelle Ezerzer
Represented By: David Keith Dorenfeld
Represented By: Mazyar Hassan Mazarei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synn Gentlemen's Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 5-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-2, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synn Gentlemens Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?