Bruce Hulse v. Ascion, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Hulse
Defendant: Ascion, LLC and Does 1-20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09287
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING NOTICE/IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE; and #9 MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing and initial status conference previously scheduled for 01/06/2020 at 1:30 p.m. are vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY Reply First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Plaintiff Bruce Hulse. (Hamideh, Bassil)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST of Darin T. Beffa to Withdraw as Attorney filed by defendant Ascion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beffa, Darin)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 Defendant Ascion, LLC dba Reverie's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Ascion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robert Cloud In Support of Defendant Ascion, LLC, dba Reverie's Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert Cloud, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Robert Cloud)(Zaki, Andrew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Zaki counsel for Defendant Ascion, LLC. Adding Andrew Zaki as counsel of record for Ascion, LLC dba Reverie for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ascion, LLC dba Reverie. (Attorney Andrew Zaki added to party Ascion, LLC(pty:dft))(Zaki, Andrew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 12/16/2019 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 1/6/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Bruce Hulse. Motion set for hearing on 1/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bassil Hamideh, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order) (Hamideh, Bassil)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 12/16/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Ascion, LLC, served on 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court)(Beffa, Darin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
October 29, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Ascion, LLC. (filed in state court 8/9/2019, submitted as document 1, attachment 7)(esa)
October 29, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Bruce Hulse, upon Defendant Ascion, LLC served on 6/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elizabeth Hill, Admin Assistant, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 8/7/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 6) (esa)
October 29, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Ascion, LLC, Does, Jury Demand., filed by plaintiff Bruce Hulse. (filed in state court 4/25/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Ascion, LLC, (Beffa, Darin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ascion, LLC. (Beffa, Darin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court, Los Angeles County, case number 19STCV14488 Receipt No: 0973-24688992 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Ascion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Notice of Case Management Conference, #6 Proof of Service of Summons, #7 Answer, #8 Case Management Statement, #9 Case Management Statement, #10 Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, #11 Minute Order) (Attorney Darin T Beffa added to party Ascion, LLC(pty:dft))(Beffa, Darin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce Hulse v. Ascion, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascion, LLC
Represented By: Darin T Beffa
Represented By: Andrew Zaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Hulse
Represented By: Bassil A Hamideh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?