Brandy Gonzalez et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brandy Gonzalez and Jorge Gonzalez
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon LLC and Ethicon Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv09342
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 67 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. Settlement is reached as to Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. The Court sets an order to show cause re settlement hearing as to Defendant Boston for February 27, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Hearing will be vacated provided a stipulation to dismiss is filed by February 25, 2020. The Court sets the following as to remaining Defendants: Discovery cut-off 7/17/2020. Motions due by 9/17/2020. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 10/27/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo)
December 5, 2019 Filing 66 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.. (Firstenberg, Karen)
December 5, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karen Michelle Firstenberg on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation (Attorney Karen Michelle Firstenberg added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft))(Firstenberg, Karen)
December 2, 2019 Filing 64 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan Steven Lazar counsel for Plaintiffs Brandy Gonzalez, Jorge Gonzalez. Adding Karen I. Gold as counsel of record for Brandy Gonzalez & Jorge Gonzalez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Brandy Gonzalez & Jorge Gonzalez. (Lazar, Alan)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #61 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David B Thomas; Philip J Combs and Susan M Robinson terminated; granting #61 REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David B Thomas; Philip J Combs and Susan M Robinson terminated (yl)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: GRANTING #60 Request to Substitute Attorney Attorney Mollie F Benedict, Joshua J. Wes and Nicholas V. Janizeh in place and GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF Attorneys William Gage, Christy D. Jones and Kari L. Sutherland. (shb)
November 19, 2019 Filing 61 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY David B. Thomas, Phillip J. Combs and Susan M. Robinson of Thomas Combs and Spann PLLC as counsel of record , REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Benedict, Mollie)
November 19, 2019 Filing 60 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY William M. Gage, Christy D. Jones and Kari L. Sutherland of Butler Snow LLP as counsel of record , REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Benedict, Mollie)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/5/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
November 6, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #53 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel G01. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
November 6, 2019 Filing 56 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh counsel for Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Adding Nicholas V. Janizeh as counsel of record for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson. (Attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh added to party Ethicon Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh added to party Ethicon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft))(Janizeh, Nicholas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua J Wes counsel for Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Adding Joshua J. Wes as counsel of record for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson. (Attorney Joshua J Wes added to party Ethicon Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua J Wes added to party Ethicon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua J Wes added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft))(Wes, Joshua)
November 6, 2019 Filing 54 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict counsel for Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Adding Mollie F. Benedict as counsel of record for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson. (Attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict added to party Ethicon Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict added to party Ethicon LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mollie Fleming Benedict added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft))(Benedict, Mollie)
November 5, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christina A Humphrey counsel for Plaintiff Brandy Gonzalez. Christina A. Humphrey is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney Christina A. Humphrey. (Humphrey, Christina)
November 5, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kari L. Sutherland. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Susan M. Robinson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Philip J. Combs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David B. Thomas. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christy D. Jones. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 30, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
October 30, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:13-cv-04844, from USDC Southern District of West Virginia. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-09342 GW (Ex). (jtil)
October 30, 2019 Filing 44 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from West Virginia Southern
October 29, 2019 Filing 43 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 ECF 4826 - Motion and Memorandum to Exclude Testimony of Stephen F. Badylak - Part 1, #2 ECF 4826 - Motion and Memorandum to Exclude Testimony of Stephen F. Badylak - Part 2, #3 ECF 4976 - Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Stephen F. Badylak - Part 1, #4 ECF 5033 - Reply to Memorandum in Opposition, #5 ECF 6041 - Memorandum Opinion and Order, #6 ECF 6984 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion, #7 ECF 4827 - Motion to Exclude Testimony of Steven Spiegelberg, #8 ECF 4969 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony, #9 ECF 5031 - Reply to Memorandum in Opposition, #10 ECF 6049 - Memoraudum Opinion and Order, #11 ECF 7004 - Motionto Exclude Testimony of Stephen Spiegelberg, #12 ECF 7088 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testinony of Stephen Spiegelberg, #13 ECF 4825 - Motion to Exclude Steven Little, #14 ECF 4825 - Exhibit 1, #15 ECF 4825 - Exhibit 2, Part 1, #16 ECF 4825 - Exhibit 2, Part 2, #17 ECF 4825, Exhibit 3, #18 ECF 4825, Exhibit 4, #19 ECF 4825, Exhibit 5, #20 ECF 4979 - Opposition to Motion to Exclude Steven Little - Part 1, #21 ECF 4979 - Opposition to Motion to Exclude Steven Little - Part 2, #22 ECF 5034 - Reply to Memorandum in Opposition, #23 ECF 6044 - Memorandum Opinion and Order, #24 ECF 6995 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Motion and Reply, #25 ECF 1009 - Motion and Memorandum to Exclude Testimony of Ricardo Caraballo, #26 ECF 4831 - Motion to Exclude Testimony of Ricardo Craballo, #27 ECF 4832 - Motion to Exclude Testimony of Ricardo Caraballo, #28 ECF 4973 - Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Ricardo Caraballo, #29 ECF 4974 - Memorandum in Opposition, #30 ECF 5029 - Reply to Memorandum in Opposition, #31 ECF 5030 - Reply to Memorandum in Opposition, #32 ECF 6042 - Memorandum Opinion and Order, #33 ECF 7000 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Motion and Reply Briefing, #34 ECF 7001 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Motion and Reply Briefing, #35 ECF 4828 - Motion to Exclude Opinions of Jennifer Anger, #36 ECF 4970 - Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #37 ECF 6040 - Memorandum Opinion and Order, #38 ECF 7003 - Motion to Limit Opinions of Jennifer Anger, #39 ECF 7069 - Memorandum in Opposition, #40 ECF 7173 - Reply to Memorandum in Opposition)(Lazar, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 42 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (238) First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit (239) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit (241) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit (261) First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit (262) Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit (263) Amended Short Form Complaint, #7 Exhibit (264) Master Answer and Jury Demand to First Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit (266) Master Answer and Jury Demand to First Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit (265) Master Answer and Jury Demand to First Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit (200) BSC's Master Answer to Complaint, #11 Exhibit (197) Master Long Form Complaint, #12 Exhibit (198) Short Form Complaint, #13 Exhibit (199) Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit (5235) PTO - #280, #15 Exhibit (6021) PTO - $303)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/30/2019 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 10/30/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/29/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/16/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) (Modified on 4/30/2019 to remove terminated party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Brandy Gonzalez, Jorge Gonzalez (Lazar, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Boston Scientific Corporation (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 37 JOINT VENUE RECOMMENDATION by Brandy Gonzalez, Jorge Gonzalez, Boston Scientific Corporation (Lazar, Alan) (Modified on 4/11/2019 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (sak) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER The conferences scheduled for April 4 and 5, 2019, in the cases on Exhibits A and B are CANCELLED; the court ORDERS that by 4/15/2019, the parties file a joint document in each of the cases on Exhibits A and B identifying the proper remand or transfer court for each case on Exhibits A and B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases on Exhibits A and B) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER The Order entered on 1/7/2019 is amended to change the date of the previously scheduled status conferences; directing that the individual plaintiffs whose cases are listed on Exhibits A and B and their counsel and counsel for Boston Scientific Corporation attend a status conference with the court as follows: 1. on Thursday, 4/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. for the cases listed on Exhibit A; and 2. on Friday, 4/5/2019 at 9:30 a.m. for the cases listed on Exhibit B; any plaintiff who fails to comply with this Order may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/25/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER directing that individual plaintiffs whose cases are listed on Exhibits A and B and their counsel and Mike Tanenbaum, counsel for Boston Scientific Corporation, as well as leadership plaintiffs' counsel, Henry Garrard and Tom Cartmell, attend a settlement conference with the court as follows: 1. On 3/13/2019, beginning at 9:00 a.m. for the cases listed on Exhibit A; and 2. On 3/14/2019, beginning at 10:00 a.m. for the cases listed on Exhibit B; any plaintiff who fails to comply with this Order may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/7/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibits A and B) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY by Brandy Gonzalez, Jorge Gonzalez to Defendant's #30 Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and Exclude Defendants Expert Witnesses Pursuant to Rule 37(C). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alan S. Lazar in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Alan S. Lazar, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Alan S. Lazar, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Alan S. Lazar, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Alan S. Lazar)(Lazar, Alan) (Modified on 11/12/2018 to correct link to #24 response in opposition)(rmc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Boston Scientific Corporation in opposition to #29 MOTION by Brandy Gonzalez, Jorge Gonzalez to Strike and Exclude Defendant's Expert Witnesses Pursuant to Rule 37(C). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION by Brandy Gonzalez, Jorge Gonzalez to Strike and Exclude Defendant's Expert Witnesses Pursuant to Rule 37(C). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alan S. Lazar in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Strike and Exclude Defendants Expert Witnesses, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Alan S. Lazar, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Alan S. Lazar, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Alan S. Lazar, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and Exclude Defendant's Expert Witnesses)(Lazar, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jorge Gonzalez for Response & Objections to Amended Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum. (Lazar, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brandy Gonzalez for Response & Objections to Amended Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum. (Lazar, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Jorge Gonzalez on August 31, 2018 at 12 p.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE TO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Brandy Gonzalez on August 31, 2018 at 9 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brandy Gonzalez, Jorge Gonzalez for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Lazar, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Jorge Gonzalez on September 07, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Brandy Gonzalez on September 07, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (pma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brandy Gonzalez for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admission. (Lazar, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Ebrahom Duel on 4/26/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 16, 2017 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Brandy Gonzalez. (Lazar, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Brandy Gonzalez. (Lazar, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
January 24, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 26, 2016 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 5/25/2016. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 5/23/2016, answer due 7/22/2016. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 26, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 24, 2016 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #8 Amended Short Form Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (skh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
May 23, 2016 Filing 8 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Brandy Gonzalez, Jorge Gonzalez against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachment: #1 Summons to Amended Short Form Complaint)(Lazar, Alan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
January 4, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
December 16, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
April 19, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
March 12, 2013 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
March 12, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 40 (Plaintiff Fact Sheet) entered on 03/06/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Plaintiff Fact Sheet) (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2274005. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cwm) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandy Gonzalez et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Jon A Strongman
Represented By: James H Keale
Represented By: Michael A Tanenbaum
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Karen Michelle Firstenberg
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Represented By: Philip J Combs
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Joshua J Wes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: Joshua J Wes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Represented By: Philip J Combs
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Joshua J Wes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Gonzalez
Represented By: Craig S Pynes
Represented By: Christina A Humphrey
Represented By: Alan Steven Lazar
Represented By: Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus J Bradley
Represented By: Karen I Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Gonzalez
Represented By: Craig S Pynes
Represented By: Christina A Humphrey
Represented By: Alan Steven Lazar
Represented By: Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Represented By: Marcus J Bradley
Represented By: Karen I Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?