Patrick W. Dennis et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: PATRICK W DENNIS, ROSA DENNIS and Patrick W. Dennis
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.), Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, CBS Corporation (f/k/a VIACOM, INC., successor by merger with CBS CORPORATION f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and as successor-in-interest to BF STURTEVANT), Crane Co., IMO Industries, Inc., AMTROL INC., Amtrol, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Does 1 through 400 Inclusive, Viad Corp, CBS Corporation, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation and Viacom Inc (sued as successor-by-meger to CBS Corporation fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation and also as successor-in-interest to BF Sturtevant)
Petitioner: VIAD CORP (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to GRISCOM RUSSELL COMPANY)
Case Number: 2:2019cv09343
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF PARTY NAME CHANGE OF DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, ET AL. filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 51 (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF EDWARD R HUGO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS FOSTER WHEELER LLC AND FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS APPLICATION FOR LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL TO BE EXCUSED FROM ATTENDING, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS FOSTER WHEELER LLC AND FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS APPLICATION FOR LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL TO BE EXCUSED FROM ATTENDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, #3 Affidavit CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Park, Charles)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING VIAD CORP.S APPLICATION FOR LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL TO BE EXCUSED FROM ATTENDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #48 by Judge George H. Wu: Peter B. Langbord, lead trial counsel is excused from attending the scheduling Conference. As such, Ovsanna Thomas, Esq., from Foley & Mansfield, PLLP, who is sufficiently familiar with and prepared to participate in this conference fully, may attend the scheduling conference on behalf of VIAD. (lc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 49 AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT AMTROL, INC., (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO H.A. THRUSH) TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Amtrol, Inc.. (Pantuch, Solomon)
December 19, 2019 Filing 48 APPLICATION for Order for Excusing Lead Trial Counsel from Attending Scheduling Conference set for January 13, 2020 filed by Defendant Viad Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Peter B. Langbord in Support of Defendant VIAD Corp.'s Application for Order Excusing Lead Trial Counsel from Attending Scheduling Conference, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting VIAD's Corp.'s Application for Lead Trial Counsel to be Excused from Attending Scheduling Conference) (Langbord, Peter)
December 18, 2019 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Crane Co. (Davis, Geoffrey)
December 18, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #11 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Crane Co. Crane Co..(Attorney Geoffrey M Davis added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft))(Davis, Geoffrey)
December 12, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #11 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant General Electric Company.(Cronin, Justin)
December 12, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Electric Company, identifying None. (Cronin, Justin)
December 12, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin F Cronin on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Attorney Justin F Cronin added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Cronin, Justin)
December 12, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D Jamison on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Attorney Kevin D Jamison added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Jamison, Kevin)
December 12, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D Jamison on behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation (Attorney Kevin D Jamison added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft))(Jamison, Kevin)
December 12, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CBS Corporation, identifying ViacomCBS, formerly known as CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, National Amusements, Inc.; and NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC. (Cronin, Justin)
December 12, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin F Cronin on behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation (Cronin, Justin)
December 12, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #11 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant CBS Corporation.(Attorney Justin F Cronin added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft))(Cronin, Justin)
December 9, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC, identifying IMO Industries and Colfax Corporation. (Powell, Glen)
December 9, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #11 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC.(Attorney Glen R Powell added to party Warren Pumps, LLC(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
December 9, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, identifying Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, Utica National Insurance Group, Resolute Management, Inc., Fireman's Fund and Liberty Mutual. (Powell, Glen)
December 9, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #11 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation.(Attorney Glen R Powell added to party Air and Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
December 5, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ovsanna Thomas counsel for Defendant Viad Corp. Adding Ovsanna Thomas as counsel of record for Defendant VIAD CORP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant VIAD Corp. (Attorney Ovsanna Thomas added to party Viad Corp(pty:dft))(Thomas, Ovsanna)
December 5, 2019 Filing 32 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Viad Corp, identifying No parent corporation. (Langbord, Peter)
December 5, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #11 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Viad Corp.(Attorney Peter B Langbord added to party Viad Corp(pty:dft))(Langbord, Peter)
December 4, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #11 filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc..(Bailey, Bobbie)
December 4, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc., identifying Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and Imo Holdings, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/3/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
December 3, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #26 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Amtrol, Inc..(Yuen, Nicole)
November 26, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicole Brown Yuen counsel for Defendant Amtrol, Inc.. Adding Nicole Yuen as counsel of record for Amtrol, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Amtrol, Inc.. (Attorney Nicole Brown Yuen added to party Amtrol, Inc.(pty:dft))(Yuen, Nicole)
November 26, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie)
November 26, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc..(Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bailey, Bobbie)
November 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Park, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1; L.R. 7.1-1) Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Park, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 20 DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC (Park, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles S Park counsel for Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC. Filed by DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC. (Park, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1; L.R. 7.1-1) filed by FOSTER WHEELER LLC Foster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION (Park, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #11 with JURY DEMAND filed by FOSTER WHEELER ENGERY CORPORATION Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Attorney Charles S Park added to party Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation(pty:dft))(Park, Charles)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #11 with JURY DEMAND filed by FOSTER WHEELER LLC Foster Wheeler LLC.(Attorney Charles S Park added to party Foster Wheeler LLC(pty:dft))(Park, Charles)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued Amended Complaint/Petition #11 as to Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (yl)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 First Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Rosa Dennis, Patrick W. Dennis, identifying Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, et al.. (Seitz, Andrew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #11 filed by Plaintiffs Rosa Dennis, Patrick W. Dennis. (Seitz, Andrew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, et al. All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Rosa Dennis, Patrick W. Dennis(Seitz, Andrew)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiffs' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, et al.. (Seitz, Andrew)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09343 GW(KSx). (rn)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Amtrol, Inc., CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Viad Corp. (ghap)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs PATRICK W DENNIS, ROSA DENNIS. (Seitz, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24700628 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs ROSA DENNIS, PATRICK W DENNIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party PATRICK W DENNIS(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party ROSA DENNIS(pty:pla))(Seitz, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick W. Dennis et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK W DENNIS
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA DENNIS
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Represented By: John M Caron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick W. Dennis
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Represented By: John M Caron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Charles S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Charles S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Justin F Cronin
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation (f/k/a VIACOM, INC., successor by merger with CBS CORPORATION f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and as successor-in-interest to BF STURTEVANT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Emily Kate Doty
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMTROL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrol, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Brown Yuen
Represented By: Khaled Taqi-Eddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 400 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp
Represented By: Peter B Langbord
Represented By: Ovsanna Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Justin F Cronin
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc (sued as successor-by-meger to CBS Corporation fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation and also as successor-in-interest to BF Sturtevant)
Represented By: Justin F Cronin
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VIAD CORP (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to GRISCOM RUSSELL COMPANY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?