Hrayr Sargsyan v. William Barr et al
Plaintiff: Hrayr Sargsyan
Defendant: Secretary Kevin McAleenan, Lee Francis Cissna, USCIS and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv09344
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lee Francis Cissna answer now due 1/30/2020; Kevin McAleenan answer now due 1/30/2020; William Barr answer now due 1/30/2020; USCIS answer now due 1/30/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Lee Francis Cissna; Kevin McAleenan; William Barr; USCIS.(Brar, Amarveer)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amarveer S Brar on behalf of Defendants William Barr, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin McAleenan, USCIS (Attorney Amarveer S Brar added to party William Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Amarveer S Brar added to party Lee Francis Cissna(pty:dft), Attorney Amarveer S Brar added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Amarveer S Brar added to party USCIS(pty:dft))(Brar, Amarveer)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09344 RGK(GJSx). (rn)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hrayr Sargsyan, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Service of Process Agent. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Service of Process Agent. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Service of Process Agent. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #7 . Document number 7 due to clerical error. The docket clerk issued a 21 DAY Summons in error onto the new action. (ghap)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants William Barr, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin McAleenan, USCIS. (ghap)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 10/31/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 9] 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants William Barr, Lee Francis Cissna, Kevin McAleenan, USCIS. (ghap) Modified on 10/31/2019 (ghap). Modified on 10/31/2019 (ghap).
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hrayr Sargsyan. (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hrayr Sargsyan, (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hrayr Sargsyan. (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24700759 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Hrayr Sargsyan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice of Intent to Deny, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Final Decision, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Dismissal of Motion to Reconsider, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Email Correspondence) (Attorney Sassoun A Nalbandian added to party Hrayr Sargsyan(pty:pla))(Nalbandian, Sassoun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hrayr Sargsyan v. William Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Amarveer S Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: Amarveer S Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Amarveer S Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Amarveer S Brar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hrayr Sargsyan
Represented By: Sassoun A Nalbandian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?