Vivian Torres v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Vivian Torres
Defendant: Target, Target Corporation and Does Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09349
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE filed by Defendant Target Corporation. To Federal Court And Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal In State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Halm, David)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09349 ODW(JCx). (rn)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
October 30, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Target Corporation. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/14/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-4)(lh)
October 30, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Vivian Torres, upon Defendant Target Corporation served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/18/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2) (lh)
October 30, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, Target Corporation, filed by Plaintiff Vivian Torres. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/12/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Target re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Halm, David)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying Target Corporation. (Halm, David)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Target. (Halm, David)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV24423 Receipt No: 0973-24701214 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Target. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit ProofService, #3 Exhibit Certificate Mailing, #4 Exhibit Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses) (Attorney David G Halm added to party Target(pty:dft))(Halm, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vivian Torres v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target
Represented By: David G Halm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: David G Halm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Torres
Represented By: Alan A Ahdoot
Represented By: Christopher Bates Adamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?