Magnacross LLC v. Monoprice, Inc.
Plaintiff: Magnacross LLC
Defendant: Monoprice,Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv09402
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Monoprice,Inc answer now due 1/23/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Monoprice,Inc.(Attorney Brian Christopher Claassen added to party Monoprice,Inc(pty:dft))(Claassen, Brian)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-09402 CAS (RAOx). (esa)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by plaintiff Magnacross LLC. The plaintiff does not consent. (Anderson, Kirk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE AND STATEMENT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court reviewed Plaintiffs proof of service and statement. (Docket # 14 and 15.) The previous order is DISCHARGED with no further consequence. re: Statement #15 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #14 . (vm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT Service filed by Plaintiff Magnacross LLC re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #7 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #14 . (Anderson, Kirk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Magnacross LLC, upon Defendant Monoprice,Inc served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bernard Luthi - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Anderson, Kirk)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS IN CIVIL ACTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing a statement (not to exceed 3 pages) plus proof of service of process by or before December 17, 2019. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Granting Non-Resident Attorney David R. Bennett APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Magnacross LLC, designating Kirk Anderson as local counsel. #11 finding as moot #9 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (vm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney David R. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Magnacross LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/7/2019, Receipt No. 26LC8US0) filed by plaintiff Magnacross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Admission, #2 Proposed Order) (McArthur, M)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David R. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Magnacross LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24741797) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David R. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Magnacross LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24741797) filed by Plaintiff Magnacross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Admission, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kirk J Anderson added to party Magnacross LLC(pty:pla)) (Anderson, Kirk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David R. Bennett. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Monoprice,Inc. (jtil)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Magnacross LLC. (McArthur, M)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Disclosure #3 filed by Plaintiff Magnacross LLC. (McArthur, M)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE of Corporate Disclosure filed by Movant Magnacross LLC (McArthur, M)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Magnacross LLC. (McArthur, M)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24708092 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Magnacross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney M Grant McArthur added to party Magnacross LLC(pty:bkmov))(McArthur, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnacross LLC v. Monoprice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monoprice,Inc
Represented By: Brian Christopher Claassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnacross LLC
Represented By: M Grant McArthur
Represented By: David R Bennett
Represented By: Kirk J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?