James Laukat et al v. ABB, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Misun Laukat and James Laukat
Defendant: DCo LLC, f/k/a and individually as successor in interest to Dana Companies LLC, Victor Corporation, Victor Gaskets and Victor Manufacturing and Gasket Company, OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC f/k/a CSK Auto, Inc. individually and as successor in interest to Grand Auto, Inc. and Kragen Auto Parts, SPX Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Bear Automotive Service Equipment Company, SVD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., The Nash Engineering Company, Advance Auto Parts Inc, IMO Industries, Inc., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Steam Turbine Company and Delaval, Inc., Borgwarner Morse TEC LLC as successor by merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, a subsidiary of AMPCO-Pittsburgh Corporation, individually and as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Fnc., individually and successor in interest to Buffalo Forge, Crane Co., American Honda Motor Co., Inc, International Business Machines Corporation, Edelbrock, LLC, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Blackmer Pump Company, Western Auto Supply Company, M. Slayen & Associates, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, individually and as successor in interest to Terry Steam Turbine Company, FMC Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Northern Pump Company f/k/a Northern Fire Apparatus Company, Chicago Pump Company, Peerless Pump Company and Barrett Equipment, General Electric Company, Foster Wheeler, LLC, as successor in interest to Foster Wheeler Corporation and Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, ABB, Inc., et al. individually and as successor in interest to ITE Imperial Co. f/k/a ITE Circuit Breaker Co. and Bulldog Electric, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Gardner Denver, Inc. f/k/a Gardner Denver Machinery, Inc., CBS Corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation as successor in interest to BF Sturtevant, SAIC USA, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company, Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Allen-Bradley Company, Raytheon Company, Metalclad Insulation LLC f/k/a Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, BMW of North America, LLC, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company, Hennessy Industries, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to AMMCO Tools, Inc., CLA-VAL Co., a division of Griswold Industries, SOCO West, Inc. f/k/a Brenntag West, Inc. f/k/a SOCO-Lynch Corporation successor in interest to Western Chemical & Manufacturing. Co., Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company, SAIC Motor Corporation Limited, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company, Elliott Company aka Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc., Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc., Gould Electronics, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to ITE Imperial Co. f/k/a ITE Circuit Breaker Co. and Bulldog Electric, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Byron Jackson Pump Co., Unisys Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc. fka Square D Company, Fryer-Knowles, Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd., J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., Siemens Industry, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to ITE Imperial Co. f/k/a ITE Circuit Breaker Co. and Bulldog Electric, Inc., Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, as successor to Felt Products MFG. Co. and Beck Arnley Holdings LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, f/k/a Warren Pumps, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Quimby Pump Company, OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc. f/k/a CSK Auto, Inc. Individually and as successor in interest to Grand Auto, Inc. and Kragen Auto Parts, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Autozone West, Inc, individually and as successor in interest to Chief Auto Parts, Inc. and a/k/a Autozone, Inc., Pneumo Abex Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Abex Corporation, as successor in interest to American Brakeblok Corporation and as successor in interest to American Brake Shoe C, ITT LLC, f/k/a ITT Corporation, f/k/a ITT Industries, Inc.; individually and as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett Company, Foster Engineering Company and Kennedy Valve Company, Eaton Corporation, individually and as successor to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., Grinnell LLC, dba Grinnell Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, a/k/a and individually and as successor in interest to Napa Auto Parts, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company, R. Slayen, Inc., Flowserve US Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Edward Valve, Inc., Sears, Roebuck and Co., The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of California, Foster Wheeler, LLC, ABB, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC, Grinnell LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Autozone West, Inc., Flowserve US Inc., Elliott Company, Siemens Industry, Inc., SAIC USA, Inc., OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, SPX Corporation, Gould Electronics, Inc., Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Genuine Parts Company, ITT LLC, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California, Does 1 through 400, inclusive, Rockwell Automation, Inc., DCo LLC, OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, CLA-VAL Co., M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Hennessy Industries, Inc., The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, BW IP, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, FMC Corporation, SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., SOCO West, Inc., BMW of North America, LLC, J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, Eaton Corporation, SAIC Motor Corporation Limited, CBS Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc. and Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Petitioner: National Steel and Shipbuilding Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv09436
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
2 Judge: John W Holcomb
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS by Judge John W. Holcomb #524 . Pursuant to stipulation, all claims against the remaining defendants CRANE CO., FMC CORPORATION, individually and as successor in interest to NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY f/k/a NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY, CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY, PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY and BARRETT EQUIPMENT COMPANY are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear own costs, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl) Modified on 2/17/2022 (yl).
February 16, 2022 Filing 524 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) filed by Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sandoval, Leonard)
February 16, 2022 Filing 523 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Plaintiffs Misun Laukat, James Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sandoval, Leonard)
February 10, 2022 Filing 522 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order,,,, Add and Terminate Parties,,, #521 , Stipulation to Dismiss Case #518 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #520 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #517 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #519 e-mailed to lrajazi@behblaw.com bounced due to '550 5.4.317 Message expired, cannot connect to remote server(451 5.7.3 STARTTLS is required to send mail)'. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS by Judge John W. Holcomb. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: All claims against the remaining defendants ELLIOTT COMPANY aka ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC., GARDNER DENVER, INC. f/k/a GARDNER DENVER MACHINERY, INC., GOULDS PUMPS, INC., GRINNELL LLC, dba GRINNELL CORPORATION, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE COMPANY and DELAVAL, INC., ITT LLC, f/k/a ITT CORPORATION, f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., individually and as successor-in-interest to BELL & GOSSETT COMPANY, FOSTER ENGINEERING COMPANY and KENNENDY VALVE COMPANY, and SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. fka SQUARE D COMPANY, are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (See document for further details) (yl)
February 3, 2022 Filing 520 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Keith M Ameele counsel for Defendant BW IP, Inc.. Keith M. Ameele will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries. (Ameele, Keith)
February 3, 2022 Filing 519 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant All Plaintiffs filed by defendant Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Khare, Viiu)
February 2, 2022 Filing 518 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) filed by Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sandoval, Leonard)
February 1, 2022 Filing 517 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edward E Hartley counsel for Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. Edward E. Hartley will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Barry N. Endick is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 BNE - G123 Withdrawal)(Hartley, Edward)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 516 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: In view of the closure of the Court's Calendar on February 25, 2022, the Court hereby CONTINUES the Final Pretrial Conference from February 25, 2022, to March 4, 2022, at 1:00 p.m., via video conference. Furthermore, on its own motion, the Court hereby SETS a Status Conference on February 18, 2022, at 11:00 a.m., via video conference. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcomb's Procedures and Schedules page on the Court's website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under "Zoom Webinar Hearings." IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2021 Filing 515 MINUTES OF VIDEO HEARING RE: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge John W. Holcomb. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court hereby EXTENDS the trial schedule as follows: (1) the deadline for hearing on Motions In Limine is set for February 18, 2022, at 9:00 a.m.; (2) the Final Pretrial Conference is set for February 25, 2022, at 11:00 a.m.; and (3) the Jury Trial is CONTINUED from November 15, 2021 to March 14, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
October 27, 2021 Filing 514 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scadden, James)
July 1, 2021 Filing 513 NOTICE NOTICE OF DEATH OF PLAINTIFF, JAMES LAUKAT filed by Plaintiff James Laukat. (Sandoval, Leonard)
June 2, 2021 Filing 512 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Holly Chang Beal counsel for Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. A. Scott Goldberg will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as Successor to Felt Products Manufacturing Company. (Beal, Holly)
June 2, 2021 Filing 511 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Holly Chang Beal counsel for Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. Holly C. Beal will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as Successor to Felt Products Manufacturing Company. (Beal, Holly)
June 2, 2021 Filing 510 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Holly Chang Beal counsel for Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. Matthew S. Brady will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust as Successor to Felt Products Manufacturing Company. (Beal, Holly)
May 28, 2021 Filing 509 MINUTES OF VIDEO HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STIPULATION [ECF No. 506] held before Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court CONTINUES the Final Pretrial Conference from July 30, 2021, to October 29, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., and the Jury Trial from August 16, 2021, to November 15, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. 2. The Court DISMISSES the following Defendants without prejudice: CBS Corporation; CLA-VAL Co.; Foster Wheeler, LLC; General Electric Company; Ingersoll-Rand Company; Raytheon Company; SOCO West, Inc.; and Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (yl)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 508 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Status Conference set for May 28, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., is ADVANCED to 9:00 a.m., via video conference. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcomb's Procedures and Schedules page on the Court's website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under "Zoom Webinar Hearings." IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 507 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has received the parties' "Joint Stipulation to Vacate Trial and Trial Related Deadlines" [ECF No. #506 ]. In view of the Stipulation, the Court hereby sets a Status Conference on Friday, May 28, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., via video conference. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcomb's Procedures and Schedules page on the Court's website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under "Zoom Webinar Hearings." IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 19, 2021 Filing 506 STIPULATION to Vacate VACATE TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES PER PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION filed by Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES)(Sandoval, Leonard)
May 3, 2021 Filing 505 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company.(Duffy, Joseph)
March 30, 2021 Filing 504 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sylvia Chiu counsel for Defendants Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. Sylvia Chiu will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Sylvia Chiu is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC and The Pep Boys Manny, Moe & Jack of California. (Chiu, Sylvia)
March 29, 2021 Filing 503 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher W Wood counsel for Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. Christopher W. Wood will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Christopher W. Wood is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Wood, Christopher)
March 29, 2021 Filing 502 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradford J DeJardin counsel for Defendants Metalclad Insulation LLC, The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. Bradford J. DeJardin will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Bradford J. DeJardin is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Metalclad Insulation LLC and The Pep Boys -- Manny, Moe & Jack of California. (DeJardin, Bradford)
March 29, 2021 Filing 501 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Connor Matthew Scott counsel for Defendants Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. Connor M. Scott will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Connor M. Scott is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC and The Pep Boys Manny, Moe & Jack of California. (Scott, Connor)
March 29, 2021 Filing 500 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Frederic W Norris counsel for Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. Frederic W. Norris will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Frederic W. Norris is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation. (Norris, Frederic)
March 26, 2021 Filing 499 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant International Business Machines Corporation filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Stipulation to Dismiss IBM)(Hartley, Edward)
March 24, 2021 Filing 498 NOTICE of Partial Resolution with Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Plaintiff James Laukat. (Sandoval, Leonard)
March 24, 2021 Filing 497 NOTICE Taking Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Off Calendar filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Lannus, Paul)
February 25, 2021 Filing 496 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chiu, Sylvia)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC. #493 by Judge John W. Holco. Plaintiffs' entire Complaint only as against Defendant, Rockwell Automation, Inc., including all claims and causes of action alleged therein, is hereby dismissed without prejudice; and Plaintiffs and Rockwell bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (See document for further details) (yl)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER RE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY by Judge John W. Holcomb #492 Based on the Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY entered into by Plaintiffs JAMES LAUKAT and MISUN LAUKAT, and Defendant BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY, each party shall bear their own fees and costs in connection with the above-captioned action. IT IS SO ORDERED. ( Blackmer Pump Company terminated). (yl)
February 18, 2021 Filing 493 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Golodnitska, Valeria)
February 17, 2021 Filing 492 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Blackmer Pump Company filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, James)
January 27, 2021 Filing 491 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Randall K Bernard counsel for Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. Randall K. Bernard will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. (Bernard, Randall)
January 26, 2021 Filing 490 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dana L Burch counsel for Defendant Unisys Corporation. Dana L. Burch will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Dana L. Burch is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Burch, Dana)
January 22, 2021 Filing 489 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan S Landis counsel for Defendant DCo LLC. Ryan S. Landis will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DCo LLC. (Landis, Ryan)
January 13, 2021 Filing 488 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant ABB, Inc. filed by Defendant ABB, Inc..(Attorney Nicolas P Martin added to party ABB, Inc.(pty:dft))(Martin, Nicolas)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb #484 The pre-trial calendar will incorporate the following deadlines: Conduct settlement proceedings is June 21,2021; pre-trial conference is set for 7/30/21 at 11:00 a.m.; the trial is set for 8/16/21 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for further details) (yl)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 486 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (REFER TO ORDER FOR DETAILS) (iva)
January 10, 2021 Filing 485 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Taline R Gettas counsel for Defendant BW IP, Inc.. Taline R. Gettas; Aida Ashouri; Suzanna L. Minasian will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries. (Gettas, Taline)
January 8, 2021 Filing 484 Joint STIPULATION for Trial on July 6, 2021 James Laukat, Misun Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF LEONARD SANDOVAL IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER, #2 Proposed Order RE: JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER)(Sandoval, Leonard)
January 8, 2021 Filing 483 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PUNITIVE DAMAGES #470 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)(Lankford, Paul)
January 7, 2021 Filing 482 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Flowserve US Inc. filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brosamle, Anthony)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BOR-GWARNER #479 CORPORATION by Judge John W. Holcomb. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The Parties have until February 26, 2021, within which to file either (a) a Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiffs claims against Defendant pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure; or (b) a status report regarding the progress of their settlement efforts. All pending court dates pertaining to Defendant, and Defendant only, are vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
January 5, 2021 Filing 479 Joint STIPULATION for Settlement Between Plaintiffs And BorgWarner Morse Tec LLC as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC.Dismissal papers due by 2/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chiu, Sylvia)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY-OWNED SUBSIDIARIES IMPROPERLY NAMED AND SERVED AS BW/IP, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO.S DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John W. Holcomb #475 (yl)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER GRANTING WARREN PUMPS, LLC'S DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John W. Holcomb #474 . It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC, under Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with each party to bear his, her, or its own fees and costs. The pending Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC is DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED Warren Pumps, LLC (fka Warren Pumps, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Quimby Pump Company ) terminated. (yl)
December 31, 2020 Filing 477 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PUNITIVE DAMAGES #470 filed by Plaintiff James Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration of Tyler Stock, #3 Exhibit, #4 Evidence Objections, #5 Proposed Order)(Stock, Tyler)
December 30, 2020 Filing 475 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant BW IP, Inc. filed by Defendant BW IP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gettas, Taline)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER GRANTING NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY'S DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John W. Holcomb #472 . Pursuant to the stipulation between Plaintiffs and Nash Engineering Company, filed on December 28, 2020, it is hereby ordered that James and Misun Laukat's action is dismissed without prejudice as to Nash Engineering Company, each party to bear their own fees and costs, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
December 29, 2020 Filing 474 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Warren Pumps, LLC filed by defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Warren Pumps, LLC)(Powell, Glen)
December 28, 2020 Filing 473 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging [Proposed] Order Granting Nash Engineering Company's Dismissal Without Prejudice re Stipulation to Dismiss Case, #472 (McKleroy, B)
December 28, 2020 Filing 472 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Nash Engiineering Company filed by Defendant The Nash Engineering Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Nash Engineering Company's Dismissal Without Prejudice)(McKleroy, B)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 471 AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO BECK ARNLEY HOLDINGS LLC by Judge John W. Holcomb #444 . It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendant FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS FEDERALMOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO BECK ARNLEY HOLDINGS LLC is hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. This Order does not affect Plaintiffs claims and cause of action against any other defendant in this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
December 23, 2020 Filing 470 WITHDRAWN AND TAKEN OFF CALENDAR, see docket entry no. 497 - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PUNITIVE DAMAGES filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/22/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES, #2 Memorandum STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF PAUL V. LANKFORD IN SUPPORT OF FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES, #4 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEFFREY R. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #5 Declaration DECLARATION OF FIONNA S. MOWAT, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #6 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES, #7 PROOF OF SERVICE) (Lankford, Paul) Modified on 3/24/2021 (lom).
December 23, 2020 Filing 469 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form,, #467 by Clerk of Court. ***AMENDED TO REFLECT CORRECT HEARING DATE*** The document is accepted as filed. Counsel is directed to use the correct event when filing a motion in the future. Please refer to the Notice of Deficiency (Dkt. 464) for information on the correct event to use. Defendant Nash Engineering Company's Motion (Dkt. 455) is set for January 22, 2021, at 9:00 a.m., as noticed on the pleadings. (iva)
December 23, 2020 Filing 468 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #465 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel is directed to use the correct event when filing a motion in the future. Please refer to the Notice of Deficiency (Dkt. 465) for information on the correct event to use. Defendant ABB Inc.'s Motion (Dkt. 458) is set for January 22, 2021, at 9:00 a.m., as noticed on the pleadings. (iva)
December 23, 2020 Filing 467 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #464 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel is directed to use the correct event when filing a motion in the future. Please refer to the Notice of Deficiency (Dkt. 464) for information on the correct event to use. Defendant Nash Engineering Company's Motion (Dkt. 455) is set for January 22, 2020, at 9:00 a.m., as noticed on the pleadings. (iva)
December 23, 2020 Filing 466 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. filed by Defendant SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Milbrodt, Jeremy)
December 23, 2020 Filing 465 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment #458 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests-Summary Judgment. Noticed motion hearing date is not indicated in docket entry text. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
December 23, 2020 Filing 464 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment #455 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests-Summary Judgment. Docket entry text does not reflect noticed hearing date of 1/22/2021 at 9:00 am. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
December 23, 2020 Filing 463 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/22/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Declaration of Glen R. Powell, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Proposed Order) (Powell, Glen)
December 22, 2020 Filing 460 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Nash Engineering Company, re Notice (Other),,, #455 served on 12/21/2020. (McKleroy, B)
December 22, 2020 Filing 459 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant ABB, Inc., served on 12/22/20. (Martin, Nicolas)
December 22, 2020 Filing 458 NOTICE Defendant ABB Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant ABB, Inc.. Defendant ABB Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant ABB Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Supplement Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law In Support of Defendant ABB Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration Declaration of Nicholas R. Lane In Support of Defendant ABB Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)(Martin, Nicolas) Modified on 12/23/2020 (iva).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPROVAL FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Judge John W. Holcomb, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel #452 : The Court hereby approves and GRANTS the request of Foley and Mansfield, PLLP for approval to withdraw as attorney of record in this case for Defendant TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC., A Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Debtor ("Triple A"). Triple A has retained the following new counsel, who is a member in good standing of the Bar of this Court: Christine L. Hawkins (SBN 233502), Hawkins Parnell and Young, LLP, 1 Post St. Suite 2400, San Francisco, CA 94104, telephone: (415) 766-3200, chawkins@hpylaw.com. (bm)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. A CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY DEBTOR PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(A)(1) AND (2) by Judge John W. Holcomb, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #447 : PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. All claims against Defendant TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. A CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY DEBTOR is hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). (bm)
December 21, 2020 Filing 457 MINUTES OF VIDEO HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge John W. Holcomb: Counsel state their appearances. The Court confers with counsel regarding the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. ("Stipulation") [ECF No. 447]. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court will grant the parties' Stipulation, as well as the Request for Approval for Withdrawal of Counsel [ECF No. 452]. Separate orders shall issue. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (bm)
December 21, 2020 Filing 456 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Edelbrock, LLC filed by Defendant Edelbrock, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Galfayan, Arpi)
December 21, 2020 Filing 455 NOTICE Defendant Nash Engineering Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication filed by Defendant The Nash Engineering Company. Defendant Nash Engineering Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Nash Engineering Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication, #2 Supplement Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendant Nash Engineering Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication, #3 Declaration Declaration of Gayle L. Ketchie In Support of Defendant Nash Engineering Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in The Alternative, Summary Adjudication)(McKleroy, B) Modified on 12/23/2020 (iva).
December 21, 2020 Filing 454 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #452 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Attorney. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 21, 2020 Filing 453 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Randall K Bernard on behalf of Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. (Bernard, Randall)
December 18, 2020 Filing 452 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Arturo E Sandoval counsel for Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. Arturo E. Sandoval is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sandoval, Arturo)
December 18, 2020 Filing 451 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant BW IP, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/22/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Gettas, Taline)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court hereby sets a hearing on Monday, December 21, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., via video conference, on the "Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., A Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Debtor" [ECF No. #447 ] filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. Only counsel for (1) Plaintiffs; and (2) Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., need appear at this video hearing. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk shall provide counsel with video conference instructions prior to the scheduled hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, OF DEFENDANT UNISYS CORPORATION by Judge John W. Holcomb. Pursuant to Rule 41 of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and based upon the Joint Stipulation for an Order of Dismissal of Defendant UNISYS CORPORATION (UNISYS), it is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed as to UNISYS, without prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. Unisys Corporation terminated. (See document for further details) (yl)
December 15, 2020 Filing 448 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Unisys Corporation filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gittler, Marissa)
December 15, 2020 Filing 447 STIPULATION to Dismiss DEFENDANT Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. filed by Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. A CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY DEBTOR PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(A)(1) AND (2))(Attorney Randall K Bernard added to party Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bernard, Randall)
December 14, 2020 Filing 446 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Taline R Gettas counsel for Defendant BW IP, Inc.. Adding Taline R. Gettas as counsel of record for BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries. (Attorney Taline R Gettas added to party BW IP, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gettas, Taline)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PARTY DEFENDANT by Judge John W. Holcomb. Pursuant to the Notice of Dismissal of Action filed by the parties to this action, it is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed, without prejudice as to defendant O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC f/k/a CSK AUTO, INC. individually and as successor in interest to GRAND AUTO, INC. and KRAGENAUTO PARTS. Each party to bear its own costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
December 11, 2020 Filing 444 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust filed by Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beal, Holly)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE HEARING DATE by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Initial Expert Disclosure deadline is January 12, 2021; The Supplemental and Rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadline is February 1, 2021; The Expert Discovery Cut-Off is February 8, 2021; (See document for further details) (yl)
December 9, 2020 Filing 442 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc. filed by Defendant OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Edward R. Hugo added to party OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hugo, Edward)
December 9, 2020 Filing 441 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC filed by Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hugo, Edward)
December 8, 2020 Filing 440 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Expert Disclosure from December 22, 2020 to January 12, 2021; Supplemental and Rebuttal Expert Disclosure from January 11, 2021 to February 1, 2021; Expert Discovery from January 18, 2021 to February 8, 2021; Motions in Limine to be filed and served in compliance with Local Rule 6-1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lannus, Paul)
December 8, 2020 Filing 439 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #434 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party, #430 , Stipulation to Continue, #428 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, #438 , Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #432 , Order, Add and Terminate Parties #437 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #436 , Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #435 , Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #431 , Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail, 429 , Stipulation to Dismiss Party #433 e-mailed to Charlie Chaya Nelson Keever cnelsonkeever@foxrothschild.com bounced due to No such e-mail address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 7, 2020 Filing 438 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form, #436 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The document is hereby stricken. Counsel may file a Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), or seek an order under Rule 41(a)(2), whichever may apply. (iva)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb, Granting Stipulation for Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Gould Electronics Inc. #430 . Each party shall bear their own fees and costs in connection with the above captioned action. (twdb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 436 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #432 . The following error(s) was/were found: An Answer was filed by the defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. Therefore, a Stipulation to Dismiss should be filed. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
December 3, 2020 Filing 434 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Susan W Gilefsky counsel for Defendant DCo LLC. Susan W. Gilefsky will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DCo LLC. (Gilefsky, Susan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 433 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Siemens Industry, Inc. filed by defendant Siemens Industry, Inc..(Powell, Glen)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINES TO EXCHANGE EXPERT DISCLOSURE by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Initial Expert Disclosure is moved from December 22, 2020 to January 12, 2021 as to BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC; and The Rebuttal Expert Disclosure is moved from January 11, 2021 to February 1, 2021 as to BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC. The Expert Discovery Cut-Off is moved from January 18, 2021 to February 8, 2021 as to BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
December 2, 2020 Filing 432 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOCUMENT NO. 438] NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baltes, Daniel) Modified on 12/7/2020 (iva).
December 2, 2020 Filing 431 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baltes, Daniel)
December 2, 2020 Filing 430 STIPULATION to Dismiss DEFENDANT Gould Electronics, Inc. filed by DEFENDANT Gould Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.)(Jackson, Daniel)
December 2, 2020 Filing 429 Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation to Continue, #428 e-mailed to Elizabeth Conn bounced due to No longer at firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 1, 2020 Filing 428 STIPULATION to Continue Expert Disclosure; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure; Expert Discovery Cut-Off from Expert Disclosure December 22, 2020; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure January 11, 2021; Expert Discovery Cut-Off January 18, 2021 to Expert Disclosure January 12, 2021; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure February 1, 2021; Expert Discovery Cut-Off February 8, 2021 filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chiu, Sylvia)
November 20, 2020 Filing 427 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment, #416 filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Kujawski, Ryan)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #416 ), is ordered CONTINUED from December 11, 2020 to Friday, December 18, 2020, at 9:00 a.m., via video conference. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk shall provide counsel with video conference instructions prior to the scheduled hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2020 Filing 425 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz counsel for Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Patrick J. Foley will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Patrick J. Foley is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Stoltz, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2020 Filing 424 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz counsel for Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Galen B. Wang will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Galen B. Wang is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Stoltz, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2020 Filing 423 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz counsel for Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Jeffrey B. Stoltz will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Jeffrey B. Stoltz is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Stoltz, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2020 Filing 422 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine D Calareso counsel for Defendant Aurora Pump Company. Christine D. Calareso, Luis A. Barba, Rebecca A. Bellow will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Calareso, Christine)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT AURORA PUMP COMPANY by Judge John W. Holcomb #418 Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and based upon the Stipulation for an Order Dismissing Action Without Prejudice of Defendant AURORA PUMP COMPANY, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant AURORA PUMP COMPANY is hereby dismissed without prejudice. In view of Auroras dismissal as a party defendant in this action, Auroras pending motion for summary judgment [Dkt. No. 415] is DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. Aurora Pump Company terminated. (yl)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO BECK ARNLEY HOLDINGS LLC by Judge John W. Holcomb. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and based upon the Stipulation for an Order Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO BECK ARNLEY HOLDINGS LLC, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendant WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY is hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
November 17, 2020 Filing 419 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Supplemental) filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC identifying Enstar Holdings (US) LLC as Corporate Parent. (Chiu, Sylvia)
November 16, 2020 Filing 418 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Aurora Pump Company filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barba, Luis)
November 16, 2020 Filing 417 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust filed by Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST)(Beal, Holly)
November 9, 2020 Filing 416 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation Eaton Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Declaration of Ryan C. Kujawski with Exhibits, #4 Proposed Order) (Kujawski, Ryan)
November 3, 2020 Filing 415 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/4/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration of Rebecca A. Bellow, #3 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebecca Anne Bellow added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft)) (Bellow, Rebecca)
October 29, 2020 Filing 414 NOTICE of Change of address by Bobbie Rae Bailey attorney for Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 550 S. Hope Street, Suite 1850, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 413 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY #409 by Judge John W. Holcomb. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. All claims against Defendant THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY by Judge John W. Holcomb. it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED ANDDECREED that Defendant WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY is herebydismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. (yl)
October 14, 2020 Filing 410 NOTICE filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. Notice of Partial Resolution of Matter (Brosamle, Anthony)
October 6, 2020 Filing 409 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoltz, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2020 Filing 408 This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 1, 2020 Filing 407 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Western Auto Supply Company filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Dismiss Western Auto Supply Company)(Burch, Dana)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-117) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09436 JWH-Ex. (rrp)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OFCALIFORNIA ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE #404 by Judge Cormac J. Carney (lc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 404 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California filed by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chiu, Sylvia)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY #402 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant Genuine Parts Company is hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. (iv)
September 2, 2020 Filing 402 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Genuine Parts Company filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haruthunian, Zorik)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER STRIKING STIPULATION #399 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The document is stricken for the following reason: Defense counsel signature is missing; see Notice of Deficiency #400 . (cw)
September 2, 2020 Filing 400 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party #399 . The following error(s) was/were found: A signature is missing on page 2 of 3. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 399 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Genuine Parts Company filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haruthunian, Zorik) Modified on 9/2/2020 (cw).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Joint Stipulation Regarding Modified Scheduling Order #397 . NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. ( Trial continued to 3/2/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney., Pretrial Conference continued to 2/22/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney.) (twdb)
August 27, 2020 Filing 397 STIPULATION to Reschedule Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Plaintiff James Laukat, Misun Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Leonard Sandoval, #2 Proposed Order)(Sandoval, Leonard)
August 21, 2020 Filing 396 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Misun Laukat, James Laukat pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (Sandoval, Leonard)
August 21, 2020 Filing 395 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Misun Laukat, James Laukat pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Bayerische Motoren Werke AG. (Sandoval, Leonard)
August 21, 2020 Filing 394 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa P Gruen counsel for Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. Lisa P. Gruen will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Lisa P. Gruen is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Gruen, Lisa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 393 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Henry Louis Whitehead counsel for Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. Henry L. Whitehead is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Whitehead, Henry)
August 11, 2020 Filing 392 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul M Bessette counsel for Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. Amber Lee Kelly will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Amber Lee Kelly is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 391 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #388 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123 not signed. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 7, 2020 Filing 390 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul M Bessette counsel for Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. P.M. Bessette will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul)
August 7, 2020 Filing 389 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney J James Li counsel for Defendant SAIC USA, Inc.. J. James Li will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant SAIC USA, Inc.. (Li, J)
August 7, 2020 Filing 388 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew M Pierz counsel for Defendant SAIC USA, Inc.. Andrew Pierz will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant SAIC USA, INC.. (Pierz, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 387 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William L Coggshall counsel for Defendant Autozone West, Inc.. William L. Coggshall will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant AutoZone West, LLC, erroneously sued herein as AutoZone West, Inc.. (Coggshall, William)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party without Prejudice #374 . National Steel and Shipbuilding Company terminated. (twdb)
August 4, 2020 Filing 385 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Angela M Hampton counsel for Defendant Hennessy Industries, Inc.. Angela Hampton will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Hennessy Industries LLC. (Hampton, Angela)
August 4, 2020 Filing 384 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert C Rodriguez counsel for Defendant Hennessy Industries, Inc.. Robert Rodriguez will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC. (Rodriguez, Robert)
August 4, 2020 Filing 383 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ian G Williamson counsel for Defendant Hennessy Industries, Inc.. Ian G. Williamson will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC. (Williamson, Ian)
August 3, 2020 Filing 382 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. Ira D. Goldberg will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations LLC. (Bergstrom, Emily)
August 3, 2020 Filing 381 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. Alex P. Catalona is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations LLC. (Bergstrom, Emily)
August 3, 2020 Filing 380 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. P. Mark Mahoney will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations LLC. (Bergstrom, Emily)
August 3, 2020 Filing 379 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. Emily D. Bergstrom will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations LLC. (Bergstrom, Emily)
August 3, 2020 Filing 378 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. Mark S. Kannett will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations LLC. (Attorney Emily D Bergstrom added to party Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC(pty:dft))(Bergstrom, Emily)
August 3, 2020 Filing 377 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. Ira D. Goldberg will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
August 3, 2020 Filing 376 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. Alex P. Catalona will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
August 3, 2020 Filing 375 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. P. Mark Mahoney will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
August 3, 2020 Filing 374 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company)(Bessette, Paul)
July 31, 2020 Filing 373 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. Emily D. Bergstrom will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 372 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. Mark S. Kannett will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 371 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant R. Slayen, Inc.. Ira D. Goldberg will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant R. Slayen Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 370 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant R. Slayen, Inc.. Mark S. Kannett will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant R. Slayen Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 369 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant R. Slayen, Inc.. P. Mark Mahoney will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant R. Slayen Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
July 31, 2020 Filing 368 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant R. Slayen, Inc.. Emily D. Bergstrom will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant R. Slayen Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 AMENDED ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Honda Motor Company, Inc. and Honda Motor Company, LTD #365 . Honda Motor Company, Ltd. terminated. (twdb)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant R. Slayen, Inc. Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) and (2) #363 . Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs, if any. R. Slayen, Inc. terminated. (twdb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 365 Amended STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Order Granting Dimissal)(Everett, Seymour)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) and (2) #362 . M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. terminated. GOOD CAUSE APPEARING THEREFORE, Defendant M. SLAYEN AND ASSOCIATES, INC. is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from the above referenced case. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs, if any. (twdb)
July 23, 2020 Filing 363 First STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant R. Slayen, Inc. filed by Defendant R. Slayen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bergstrom, Emily)
July 23, 2020 Filing 362 First STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bergstrom, Emily)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT AUTOZONE WEST, LLC #359 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. All claims against Defendant AUTOZONE WEST, LLC., are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Ci. P. 41(a)(2). IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS TIRE OPERATIONS, LLC PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a) (1) AND (2) #358 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS TIRE OPERATIONS, LLC is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from the above-referenced case. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs, if any. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
July 22, 2020 Filing 359 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Autozone West, Inc. filed by defendant Autozone West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coggshall, William)
July 22, 2020 Filing 358 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Catalona, Alexander)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER DISMISSING DCO LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE #348 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS SO ORDERED THAT the Complaint of Plaintiffs JAMES LAUKAT and MISUN LAUKATA as to Defendant DCo LLC, f/k/a and individually as successor in interest to DANA COMPANIES, LLC erroneously sued herein as DANA COMPANIES LLC, VICTOR CORPORATION, VICTOR GASKETS and VICTOR MANUFACTURING AND GASKET COMPANY is dismissed without prejudice. (lom)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC #347 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. All claims against Defendant PNEUMO ABEX LLC are hereby dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), with each party to bear its own costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER REGARDING AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE #346 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiffs' Complaint, in the above-entitled action, may be and is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. only for a mutual waiver of costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. #344 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED thatDefendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. (lom)
July 21, 2020 Filing 353 ODER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, LLC #345 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS SO ORDERED. All claims against Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC are hereby dismissed without prejudice, eachparty to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FRYER-KNOWLES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION'S DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE #343 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiffs JAMES LAUKAT and MISUN LAUKAT, ("Plaintiffs") action is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc. a California corporation only, each party to bear its own costs, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (lom)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE #342 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiffs' Complaint, in the above-entitled action, may be and is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. only for a mutual waiver of costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS METALCLAD INSULATION LLC ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE #341 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiffs' Complaint, in the above-entitled action, may be and is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to METALCLAD INSULATION LLC only for a mutual waiver of costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Bosch Automotive Service Solutions Inc. #340 . SPX Corporation (individually and as successor in interest to Bear Automotive Service Equipment Company ) terminated. (twdb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 348 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant DCo LLC filed by Defendant DCo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order DISMISSING DCO LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE)(Gilefsky, Susan)
July 21, 2020 Filing 347 STIPULATION to Dismiss Pneumo Abex LLC Pneumo Abex Corporation filed by Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bernhardt, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 346 Amended STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc. filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chiu, Sylvia)
July 21, 2020 Filing 345 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Hennessy Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 344 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc filed by defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Everett, Seymour)
July 20, 2020 Filing 343 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc. filed by defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bishop, Charles)
July 20, 2020 Filing 342 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc. filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chiu, Sylvia)
July 20, 2020 Filing 341 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chiu, Sylvia)
July 20, 2020 Filing 340 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant SPX Corporation filed by Defendant SPX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scadden, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 339 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Cormac J. Carney. Effective July 13, 2020, Judge Cormac J. Carney will be located in the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 9B, on the 9th floor, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9B of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Judge Carneys Courtroom Deputy Clerk, may be reached at CJC_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. The location for filing civil and/or criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing is at the Clerks Office, Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. Documents under this exemption may also be filed in the Los Angeles or Riverside courthouses. Please refer to Judge Carneys Procedures and Schedules Page on the Courts website **UPDATED AS OF JULY 9, 2020** for updated procedures regarding mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 1, 2020 Filing 338 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine Diaz Reynolds counsel for Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. Elizabeth V. McNulty will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Elizabeth V. McNulty is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive plc. (Reynolds, Christine)
July 1, 2020 Filing 337 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine Diaz Reynolds counsel for Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. Christine Reynolds will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Christine Reynolds is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive plc. (Reynolds, Christine)
July 1, 2020 Filing 336 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Steven E. Meyer will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Steven E. Meyer is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stoltz, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 335 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Marla T. Almazan will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Marla T. Almazan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stoltz, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 334 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Galen B. Wang will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Galen B. Wang is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Stoltz, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 333 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Jeffrey S. Stoltz will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Jeffrey S. Stoltz is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DBMW of North America, LLC. (Stoltz, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2020 Filing 332 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Connor Matthew Scott counsel for Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. Adding Connor M. Scott as counsel of record for BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation. (Attorney Connor Matthew Scott added to party Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC(pty:dft))(Scott, Connor)
June 12, 2020 Filing 331 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sylvia Chiu counsel for Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. Adding Sylvia Chiu as counsel of record for BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation. (Attorney Sylvia Chiu added to party Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC(pty:dft))(Chiu, Sylvia)
June 11, 2020 Filing 330 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Castillo counsel for Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. Robert Castillo will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Robert Castillo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. (Attorney Robert Castillo added to party Blackmer Pump Company(pty:dft))(Castillo, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney granting #324 Request to Substitute Attorney: The Court hereby orders that the request of: BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, Defendant, to substitute Frederic W. Norris, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Jerry C. Popovich. The clerk is hereby ordered to terminate Notices of Electronic Filing for the withdrawing attorney(s) in this case. (bm)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC #327 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. All claims against Defendant BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). (iv)
June 2, 2020 Filing 327 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant BMW of North America, LLC filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoltz, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE #325 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: The captioned matter is hereby dismissed without prejudice with respect to defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, with all parties to bear their own attorneys fees and costs. In the event Plaintiff obtains new evidence that shows Jaguar LandRover North America, LLC has liability for Triumph Motor Company automobiles or component parts, the undersigned counsel on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC will accept service electronically of the previously served complaint and appear within 15 days of service. (lc)
May 29, 2020 Filing 325 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gruen, Lisa)
May 29, 2020 Filing 324 Corrected REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Frederic W. Norris in place of attorney Jerry C. Popovich, Matthew S. Brady and Holly Chang Beal filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Norris, Frederic)
May 28, 2020 Filing 323 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Substitution #322 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
May 26, 2020 Filing 322 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Frederic W. Norris in place of attorney Jerry C. Popovich filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. (Attorney Frederic W Norris added to party Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC(pty:dft)) (Norris, Frederic)
May 8, 2020 Filing 321 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #319 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 8, 2020 Filing 320 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #318 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 8, 2020 Filing 319 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney D. Scott Shaffer on behalf of Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Attorney D. Scott Shaffer added to party Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Shaffer, D. Scott)
May 6, 2020 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
May 4, 2020 Filing 317 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #316 . The following error(s) was/were found: Blank document In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 1, 2020 Filing 316 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey counsel for Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. Emily Kate Doty is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bobbie R. Bailey. (Bailey, Bobbie)
April 28, 2020 Filing 315 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Graham on behalf of Defendant Unisys Corporation (Attorney Michael A Graham added to party Unisys Corporation(pty:dft))(Graham, Michael)
April 28, 2020 Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant Unisys Corporation (Pond, Francis)
April 27, 2020 Filing 313 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mihir Desai, I counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Adding Mihir Desai as counsel of record for Western Auto Supply Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attorney Mihir Desai, I added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Desai, Mihir)
April 23, 2020 Filing 312 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance #311 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #310 e-mailed to Andrew M Pierz at pierza@lilaw.us bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 21, 2020 Filing 311 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dana L Burch on behalf of Defendant Unisys Corporation (Burch, Dana)
April 20, 2020 Filing 310 Defendant Unisys Corporation's Notice of Interested Parties/Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation, identifying BlackRock, Inc.. (Gittler, Marissa)
April 20, 2020 Filing 309 AMENDED ANSWER Defendant Unisys Corporation's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Damages; Demand for Jury Trial to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Gittler, Marissa)
April 20, 2020 Filing 308 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Unisys Corporation answer now due 4/20/2020, filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation.(Gittler, Marissa)
April 20, 2020 Filing 307 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Marissa K Gittler on behalf of Defendant Unisys Corporation (Attorney Marissa K Gittler added to party Unisys Corporation(pty:dft))(Gittler, Marissa)
April 15, 2020 Filing 306 JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT JAGUAR LAND ROVER AUTOMOTIVE PLC by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court hereby ORDERS that: 1. Plaintiffs shall take nothing on their complaint against Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. 2. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC and against Plaintiffs. Related to: Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #305 . (lom)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JAGUAR LAND ROVER AUTOMOTIVE PLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #300 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' request for a continuance pursuant to Rule 56(d) is DENIED, and Jaguar PLC's motion for summary judgment #300 is GRANTED. (lom)
April 6, 2020 Filing 304 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Complaint as to JLRAplc #300 filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence in Opposition to JLRA MSJ, #2 Declaration)(Reynolds, Christine)
April 1, 2020 Filing 303 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Leonard Sandoval counsel for Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat. Michael T. Reid is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Leonard Sandoval. (Sandoval, Leonard)
April 1, 2020 Filing 302 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Leonard Sandoval counsel for Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat. Adding Leonard Sandoval as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Leonard Sandoval. (Attorney Leonard Sandoval added to party James Laukat(pty:pla), Attorney Leonard Sandoval added to party Misun Laukat(pty:pla))(Sandoval, Leonard)
March 30, 2020 Filing 301 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Complaint as to JLRAplc #300 filed by Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Genuine Disputes, #2 Declaration of Josiah Parker)(Attorney Josiah W Parker added to party James Laukat(pty:pla), Attorney Josiah W Parker added to party Misun Laukat(pty:pla))(Parker, Josiah)
March 20, 2020 Filing 300 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Entire Complaint as to JLRAplc filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/20/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo of points and authorities, #2 Appendix Statement of uncontroverted facts, #3 Declaration Dec of Kenneth Benjamin, #4 Proposed Order) (Reynolds, Christine)
March 20, 2020 Filing 299 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC.(Reynolds, Christine)
March 18, 2020 Filing 298 DISCLOSURE Initial filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Conn, Elizabeth)
March 18, 2020 Filing 297 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, identifying Tata Motors, Ltd.. (Conn, Elizabeth)
March 18, 2020 Filing 296 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Attorney Elizabeth Marie Conn added to party Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Conn, Elizabeth)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME FOR JAGUAR LAND ROVER AUTOMOTIVE plc TO FILE ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #293 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that JLRAplc's last day to file its Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint is extended from March 13, 2020 to March 20,2020. (et)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER DEEMING PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PROPERLY AMENDED TO INCLUDE RAYTHEON CORPORATION AND UNISYS CORPORATIO by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to properly serve RAYTHEON CORPORATION and UNISYS CORPORATION with Plaintiffs' FirstAmended Complaint re #292 . (et)
March 12, 2020 Filing 293 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC answer now due 3/20/2020, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reynolds, Christine)
March 11, 2020 Filing 292 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Amended Complaint #149 (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Request for an Order Deeming Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Properly Amended to Include Raytheon Corporation and Unisys Corporation, #2 Proposed Order Deeming Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Properly Amended to Include Raytheon Corporation and Unisys Corporation)(Reid, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert H Baronian on behalf of Defendant Edelbrock, LLC (Attorney Robert H Baronian added to party Edelbrock, LLC(pty:dft))(Baronian, Robert)
March 10, 2020 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert H Baronian on behalf of Defendant SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Attorney Robert H Baronian added to party SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.(pty:dft))(Baronian, Robert)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Based on those representations and having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), the Court now ORDERS as follows: A pretrial conference will be held on Monday, February 8, 2021 at 3:00 PM. The case is set for a jury trial, Tuesday, February 23, 2021 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR JAGUAR LAND ROVER AUTOMOTIVE plc TO FILE ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #284 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. JLRAplc's last day to file its Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is extended from March 5, 2020 to March 13, 2020. (iv)
March 6, 2020 Filing 287 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney B Gardiner McKleroy counsel for Defendant The Nash Engineering Company. Adding B. Gardiner McKleroy as counsel of record for Nash Engineering Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Nash Engineering Company. (McKleroy, B)
March 6, 2020 Filing 286 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #281 , Notice (Other) #276 , Status Conference - optional html form, #282 , Notice of Appearance #277 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #283 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #284 , Notice of Appearance #280 , Notice of Appearance #279 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #285 , Notice of Appearance #278 e-mailed to Robert Castillo bounced due to The email address you entered couldn't be found. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 5, 2020 Filing 284 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC answer now due 3/13/2020, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reynolds, Christine)
March 5, 2020 Filing 283 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #276 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
March 5, 2020 Filing 281 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ira D Goldberg counsel for Defendants Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., R. Slayen, Inc.. Adding Ira D. Goldberg as counsel of record for M. Slayen & Associates, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, R. Slayen, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant M. Slayen & Associates, Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, R.Slayen, Inc.. (Attorney Ira D Goldberg added to party Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ira D Goldberg added to party M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ira D Goldberg added to party R. Slayen, Inc.(pty:dft))(Goldberg, Ira)
March 4, 2020 Filing 285 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #277 , Notice of Appearance #278 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document attached to docket entry no 277 and 278 are duplicates. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
March 4, 2020 Filing 282 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Cormac J. Carney. Status Conference held. The Court and counsel confer regarding various case management issues. Counsel who have not previously appeared in the case shall file their Notice of Appearance forthwith. Counsel who have not formally appeared shall not be permitted to participate in further hearings before this court. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (et)
March 4, 2020 Filing 280 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Glen R Powell on behalf of Defendant SPX Corporation (Attorney Glen R Powell added to party SPX Corporation(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
March 4, 2020 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Glen R Powell on behalf of Defendant Siemens Industry, Inc. (Attorney Glen R Powell added to party Siemens Industry, Inc.(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
March 4, 2020 Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Angela M Hampton on behalf of Defendant Autozone West, Inc. (Attorney Angela M Hampton added to party Autozone West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hampton, Angela)
March 4, 2020 Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William L Coggshall on behalf of Defendant Autozone West, Inc. (Coggshall, William)
March 4, 2020 Filing 276 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Baltes, Daniel)
March 2, 2020 Filing 275 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #274 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #272 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #271 , Order,, Add and Terminate Parties, #270 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #273 e-mailed to Bina Ghanaat bounced due to '5.4.1 Recipient address rejectedhanaat. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 27, 2020 Filing 274 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick J Glinka counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Adding Patrick J. Glinka as counsel of record for Western Auto Supply Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Attorney Patrick J Glinka added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Glinka, Patrick)
February 27, 2020 Filing 273 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick J Glinka counsel for Defendant Genuine Parts Company. Adding Patrick J. Glinka as counsel of record for Genuine Parts Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Attorney Patrick J Glinka added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Glinka, Patrick)
February 27, 2020 Filing 272 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dana L Burch counsel for Defendant Genuine Parts Company. Ethan L. Flinders is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Burch, Dana)
February 27, 2020 Filing 271 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dana L Burch counsel for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. Eric D. Sentlinger is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Burch, Dana)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ADVANCE AUTO PARTS, INC. #267 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. All claims against Defendant ADVANCE AUTO PARTS, INC. are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear own costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). (iv)
February 20, 2020 Filing 269 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 20-25 days, filed by Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat.. (Reid, Michael)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT JAGUAR LAND ROVER AUTOMOTIVE PLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR QUASH SERVICE #257 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Jaguar International's motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, quash service is DENIED. (iv)
February 20, 2020 Filing 267 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Advance Auto Parts Inc filed by Plaintiffs Misun Laukat, James Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reid, Michael)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS SAIC USA, INC. & SAIC MOTOR CORPORATION LIMITED AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Cormac J. Carney. All claims against Defendant SAIC USA, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear own costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). All claims against Defendant SAIC Motor Corporation Limited, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear own costs, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). Defendant SAIC USA, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions #259 , and Defendant SAIC Motor Corporation Limited's Motion to Dismiss #261 , are both DENIED AS MOOT. (iv)
February 19, 2020 Filing 265 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants SAIC Motor Corporation Limited, SAIC USA, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Misun Laukat, James Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reid, Michael)
February 14, 2020 Filing 264 REPLY Amended Reply First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative motion to quash service of summons #257 filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. (Reynolds, Christine)
February 14, 2020 Filing 263 REPLY Reply First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative motion to quash service of summons #257 filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. (Reynolds, Christine)
February 10, 2020 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative motion to quash service of summons #257 filed by Plaintiff James Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler Stock, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Exhibit D-L)(Stock, Tyler)
January 30, 2020 Filing 261 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defandant SAIC Motor Corporation Limited filed by Defendant SAIC USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration He Decl ISO Mtn to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Li, J)
January 30, 2020 Filing 260 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant SAIC USA, Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs and their Counsel pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 #259 Re Rule 11 Notice Requirement served on 01/03/2020. (Li, J)
January 30, 2020 Filing 259 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs and their Counsel pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Defendant SAIC USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Li Decl ISO Rule 11 Mtn, #2 Declaration He Decl ISO Rule 11 Mtn, #3 Proposed Order) (Li, J)
January 24, 2020 Filing 258 NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. (Reynolds, Christine)
January 24, 2020 Filing 257 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative motion to quash service of summons filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Christine Diaz Reynolds added to party Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC(pty:dft)) (Reynolds, Christine)
January 23, 2020 Filing 256 Initial DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant SPX Corporation (Scadden, James)
January 23, 2020 Filing 255 Initial DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Siemens Industry, Inc. (Pietrykowski, Michael)
January 22, 2020 Filing 254 Initial DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation (Scadden, James)
January 22, 2020 Filing 253 Initial DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC (Scadden, James)
January 22, 2020 Filing 252 INITIAL DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 26(A)(1) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC (Beal, Holly)
January 21, 2020 Filing 251 INITIAL DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(a)(1)(A) filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation (Hartley, Edward)
January 21, 2020 Filing 250 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company (Bessette, Paul)
January 21, 2020 Filing 249 SUPPLEMENTAL LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES OF DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, (Beal, Holly)
January 21, 2020 Filing 248 INITIAL DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 26(A)(1) filed by Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust (Beal, Holly)
January 21, 2020 Filing 247 INITIAL DISCLOSURE Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Flinders, Ethan)
January 21, 2020 Filing 246 INITIAL DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. (Sandoval, Arturo)
January 21, 2020 Filing 245 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of of FRCP Rule 26A filed by Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc. (Bishop, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Filing 244 iNITIAL DISCLOSURE FRCP 26(a)(1)(A) filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc (Cayton, Jonathan)
January 21, 2020 Filing 243 DISCLOSURE of Initial Disclosure Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(A)(1) Defendant Nash Engineering Company's Initial Disclosure Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(A)(1) filed by Defendant The Nash Engineering Company (McKleroy, B)
January 21, 2020 Filing 242 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of FRCP Rule 26A filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company (Cunningham, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 241 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation (Ebrahamian, Salin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 240 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Rule 26A filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation (Kujawski, Ryan)
January 21, 2020 Filing 239 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Pursuant to Federal Rule CIV. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company (Barba, Luis)
January 21, 2020 Filing 238 DISCLOSURE of Pursuant to Federal Rule CIV. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Catalona, Alexander)
January 21, 2020 Filing 237 INITIAL DISCLOSURE Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Advance Auto Parts Inc (Sentlinger, Eric)
January 21, 2020 Filing 236 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Sentlinger, Eric)
January 21, 2020 Filing 235 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of RULE 26(A)(1) filed by Defendant DCo LLC (Landis, Ryan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 234 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #226 , Notice (Other) #224 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 16, 2020 Filing 233 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff James Laukat filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Hartley, Edward)
January 15, 2020 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexander Paul Catalona on behalf of Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Catalona, Alexander)
January 10, 2020 Filing 231 NOTICE OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LAUKAT filed by DEFENDANT National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul)
January 10, 2020 Filing 230 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc..(Bishop, Charles)
January 9, 2020 Filing 229 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant R. Slayen, Inc..(Bergstrom, Emily)
January 9, 2020 Filing 228 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #225 . The following error(s) was/were found: Answer is a duplicate of Answer filed 1/8/2020 Dkt. 222. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
January 8, 2020 Filing 227 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant R. Slayen, Inc., (Bergstrom, Emily)
January 8, 2020 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Defendant R. Slayen, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
January 8, 2020 Filing 225 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant R. Slayen, Inc..(Attorney Emily D Bergstrom added to party R. Slayen, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bergstrom, Emily)
January 8, 2020 Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. (Bergstrom, Emily)
January 8, 2020 Filing 223 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., identifying M. Slayen and Associates. (Bergstrom, Emily)
January 8, 2020 Filing 222 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc..(Attorney Emily D Bergstrom added to party M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bergstrom, Emily)
January 6, 2020 Filing 221 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alex P. Catalona in place of attorney Mark S. Kannett #181 , REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alex P. Catalona in place of attorney Mark S. Kannett #182 by Clerk. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by January 10, 2020. (lom)
January 6, 2020 Filing 219 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent Granting Substitution #181 , #182 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect Form. Counsel should adhere to form G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE COURT'S ISSUANCE OF A SCHEDULING ORDER #169 AND DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO PARTICIPATE IN A STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' ex parte application to advance the scheduling order. The parties are ORDERED to appear before the Court for a case management conference on Wednesday, March 4, 2020, at 3:00 PM. The parties are further DIRECTED to propose a reasonable schedule for discovery, law and motion, settlement, and trial in their Rule 26(f) report. (iv)
January 3, 2020 Filing 218 Defendant Nash Engineering Company's Certificate of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Nash Engineering Company, (McKleroy, B)
January 3, 2020 Filing 217 AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Hartley, Edward)
January 3, 2020 Filing 216 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC.(Hugo, Edward)
January 3, 2020 Filing 215 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SPX Corporation identifying Robert Bosch LLC, a Delaware limited liability company as Corporate Parent. (Scadden, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 214 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant SPX Corporation.(Attorney James G Scadden added to party SPX Corporation(pty:dft))(Scadden, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 213 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Edelbrock, LLC.(Galfayan, Arpi)
January 3, 2020 Filing 212 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant SYD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc..(Galfayan, Arpi)
January 2, 2020 Filing 211 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation.(Kujawski, Ryan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 210 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co, Inc. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.(Cayton, Jonathan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 209 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Hennessy Industries, Inc..(Rodriguez, Robert)
December 27, 2019 Filing 208 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Elliott Company.(Duffy, Joseph)
December 27, 2019 Filing 207 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company.(Duffy, Joseph)
December 27, 2019 Filing 206 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Grinnell LLC.(Duffy, Joseph)
December 27, 2019 Filing 205 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Duffy, Joseph)
December 27, 2019 Filing 204 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant ITT LLC.(Duffy, Joseph)
December 27, 2019 Filing 203 NOTICE DEFENDANT GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.S NOTICE OF RE-FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by DEFENDANT Gould Electronics, Inc.. (Jackson, Daniel)
December 27, 2019 Filing 202 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Gould Electronics, Inc., identifying GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.. (Jackson, Daniel)
December 27, 2019 Filing 201 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Mark Jackson counsel for Defendant Gould Electronics, Inc.. Adding D. MARK JACKSON as counsel of record for GOULD ELECTRONICS INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.. (Jackson, Daniel)
December 27, 2019 Filing 200 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Gould Electronics, Inc..(Attorney Daniel Mark Jackson added to party Gould Electronics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jackson, Daniel)
December 27, 2019 Filing 199 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 [F/K/A Square D Company] filed by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc..(Whitehead, Henry)
December 27, 2019 Filing 198 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant SAIC USA, Inc..(Li, J)
December 27, 2019 Filing 197 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC.(Brady, Matthew)
December 27, 2019 Filing 196 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant FMC Corporation.(Gittler, Marissa)
December 27, 2019 Filing 195 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Bessette, Paul)
December 27, 2019 Filing 194 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant BW IP, Inc..(Ashouri, Aida)
December 27, 2019 Filing 193 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company.(Cunningham, James)
December 27, 2019 Filing 192 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Advance Auto Parts Inc.(Sentlinger, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 191 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc..(Brosamle, Anthony)
December 27, 2019 Filing 190 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Damages filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company.(Foley, Patrick)
December 27, 2019 Filing 189 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc..(Golodnitska, Valeria)
December 27, 2019 Filing 188 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant DCo LLC.(Landis, Ryan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 187 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 BMW of North America, LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Damages filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.(Meyer, Steven)
December 27, 2019 Filing 186 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California.(Scott, Connor)
December 27, 2019 Filing 185 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company.(Sentlinger, Eric)
December 27, 2019 Filing 184 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc..(Scott, Connor)
December 27, 2019 Filing 183 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC.(Scott, Connor)
December 27, 2019 Filing 182 STRICKEN, see docket entry no 221 - REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alex P. Catalona in place of attorney Mark S. Kannett filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.. (Attorney Alexander Paul Catalona added to party M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Catalona, Alexander) Modified on 1/7/2020 (lom).
December 27, 2019 Filing 181 STRICKEN, see docket entry no 221 - REQUEST to Substitute attorney Alex P. Catalona in place of attorney Mark S. Kannett filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Catalona, Alexander) Modified on 1/7/2020 (lom).
December 27, 2019 Filing 180 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company.(Flinders, Ethan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 179 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendangt Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Bernhardt, Robert)
December 26, 2019 Filing 178 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc..(Bailey, Bobbie)
December 26, 2019 Filing 177 JOINDER filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company joining in Objection/Opposition (Motion related),, #172 . (Barba, Luis)
December 26, 2019 Filing 176 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: denying #168 . The Court has read and considered all documents filed in support of and in oppositon to "Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Complete the Deposition of James Laukat, etc.", filed 12/24/19. The Application is denied. (sp)
December 26, 2019 Filing 175 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES filed by Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc..(Sandoval, Arturo)
December 25, 2019 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Plaintiffs Deposition EX PARTE APPLICATION to LEAVE TO COMPLETE THE DEPOSITION OF JAMES LAUKAT #168 with Proof of Service filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Kujawski, Ryan)
December 25, 2019 Filing 173 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Plaintiffs Deposition EX PARTE APPLICATION to LEAVE TO COMPLETE THE DEPOSITION OF JAMES LAUKAT #168 filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Kujawski, Ryan)
December 25, 2019 Filing 172 DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO COMPLETE THE DEPOSITION OF JAMES LAUKAT REGARDLESS OF THE RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE STATUS Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Plaintiffs Deposition EX PARTE APPLICATION to LEAVE TO COMPLETE THE DEPOSITION OF JAMES LAUKAT #168 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF BINA GHANAAT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO COMPLETE THE DEPOSITION OF JAMES LAUKAT REGARDLESS OF THE RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE STATUS)(Ghanaat, Bina)
December 25, 2019 Filing 171 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Ghanaat, Bina)
December 25, 2019 Filing 170 DEFENDANT DCO LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE FOR LEAVE TO COMPLETE THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LAUKAT REGARDLESS OF THE RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Plaintiffs Deposition EX PARTE APPLICATION to LEAVE TO COMPLETE THE DEPOSITION OF JAMES LAUKAT #168 filed by Defendant DCo LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ryan Landis)(Gilefsky, Susan)
December 24, 2019 Filing 169 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Issuance of a Scheduling Order Pursuant to Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 16(b) , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Scheduling Order Pursuant to Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 16(b) filed by Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Reid, #2 Proposed Order) (Reid, Michael)
December 24, 2019 Filing 168 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Plaintiffs Deposition , EX PARTE APPLICATION to LEAVE TO COMPLETE THE DEPOSITION OF JAMES LAUKAT filed by Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Reid, #2 Proposed Order) (Reid, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #130 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 23, 2019 Filing 166 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 and Demand For Jury Trial filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company.(Barba, Luis)
December 20, 2019 Filing 165 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Crane Co., (Davis, Geoffrey)
December 20, 2019 Filing 164 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 filed by Defendant Crane Co..(Attorney Geoffrey M Davis added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft))(Davis, Geoffrey)
December 20, 2019 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) Defendant Nash Engineering Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant The Nash Engineering Company.(Attorney B Gardiner McKleroy added to party The Nash Engineering Company(pty:dft))(McKleroy, B)
December 19, 2019 Filing 162 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation.(Hartley, Edward)
December 19, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #160 , Answer to Complaint #159 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number reads CV 19-9436-CAS-E, but should read CV 19-9436-CJC-E. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
December 17, 2019 Filing 160 Notice of Certification/ CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, identifying FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING COMPANY erroneously sued as FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO BECK ARNLEY HOLDINGS LLC. (Brady, Matthew)
December 17, 2019 Filing 159 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #149 for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust.(Brady, Matthew)
December 17, 2019 Filing 158 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Holly Chang Beal counsel for Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. Adding Holly C. Beal as counsel of record for Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Attorney Holly Chang Beal added to party Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust(pty:dft))(Beal, Holly)
December 17, 2019 Filing 157 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Quan Tran, Tran counsel for Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. Adding Cindy Q. Tran as counsel of record for Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Attorney Cindy Quan Tran, Tran added to party Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust(pty:dft))(Tran, Cindy)
December 17, 2019 Filing 156 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Stephen Brady counsel for Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. Adding Matthew S. Brady as counsel of record for Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Attorney Matthew Stephen Brady added to party Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust(pty:dft))(Brady, Matthew)
December 17, 2019 Filing 155 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Quan Tran, Tran counsel for Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. Adding Cindy Q. Tran as counsel of record for BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation. (Attorney Cindy Quan Tran, Tran added to party Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC(pty:dft))(Tran, Cindy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on March 5, 2020. (gga)
December 16, 2019 Filing 153 Local Rule 7.1-1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, (Brady, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 152 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) Notice of Filing State Court Answer by Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation to Plaintiff's Complaint for Personal Injury; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC.(Brady, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 151 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Holly Chang Beal counsel for Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. Adding Holly C. Beal as counsel of record for BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation. (Attorney Holly Chang Beal added to party Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC(pty:dft))(Beal, Holly)
December 16, 2019 Filing 150 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Stephen Brady counsel for Defendant Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. Adding Matthew S. Brady as counsel of record for BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation. (Attorney Matthew Stephen Brady added to party Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC(pty:dft))(Brady, Matthew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 149 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Misun Laukat, James Laukat. (iv)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT #120 AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REMAND #121 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiffs' ex parte application to amend is GRANTED. The Clerk is ORDERED TO FILE the First Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit C to Plaintiffs' ex parte application for leave to amend. The FAC is DEEMED FILED as of the date of this Order. Plaintiffs' ex parte application to remand is DENIED. (iv)
December 13, 2019 Filing 147 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company, (Attorney Luis Alfonso Barba added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft))(Barba, Luis)
December 11, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Eaton Corporation (FILED IN STATE COURT 11/4/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT ATO NOTICE #143 .) (iv)
December 11, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Warren Pumps (FILED IN STATE COURT 10/29/2019) SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE #140 .) (iv)
December 11, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (FILED IN STATE COURT 10/29/2019) SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE #138 .) (iv)
December 11, 2019 Filing 146 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Viiu Spangler Khare counsel for Defendant Eaton Corporation. Adding Viiu Spangler Khare as counsel of record for Eaton Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Attorney Viiu Spangler Khare added to party Eaton Corporation(pty:dft))(Khare, Viiu)
December 11, 2019 Filing 145 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation identifying Eaton Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Kujawski, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 144 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation.. (Kujawski, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Re-filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Kujawski, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 142 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation, identifying Federal Insurance Company and Northwestern Pacific Indemnity Company, United States Fire Insurance Company; Great American Insurance Company; Granite States Insurance Company. (Attorney Ryan Kujawski added to party Eaton Corporation(pty:dft))(Kujawski, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC, identifying IMO Industries and Colfax Corporation. (Attorney Glen R Powell added to party Warren Pumps, LLC(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
December 11, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE OF REFILING ANSWER TO COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer & Demand for Jury Trial)(Powell, Glen)
December 11, 2019 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, identifying Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, Utica National Insurance Group, Resolute Management, Inc., Fireman's Fund and Liberty Mutual. (Attorney Glen R Powell added to party Air and Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
December 11, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE OF REFILING ANSWER filed by defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer & Demand for Jury Trial)(Powell, Glen)
December 10, 2019 Filing 137 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William L Coggshall counsel for Defendant Autozone West, Inc.. Adding William L. Coggshall as counsel of record for AutoZone West, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant AutoZone West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Attorney William L Coggshall added to party Autozone West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Coggshall, William)
December 9, 2019 Filing 136 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hugo, Edward)
December 9, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, identifying O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hugo, Edward)
December 9, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R Hugo on behalf of Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hugo, Edward)
December 9, 2019 Filing 133 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Attorney Edward R Hugo added to party OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Hugo, Edward)
December 8, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul)
December 5, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #118 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice>Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
December 4, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance of Luis A. Barba filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Barba, Luis)
November 26, 2019 Filing 129 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery) #120 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #121 filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul)
November 26, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #123 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 25, 2019 Filing 127 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DCo LLC, (Landis, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE of Re-filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant DCo LLC. (Landis, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan S Landis on behalf of Defendant DCo LLC (Landis, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE filed by Defendant DCo LLC. Notice of Re-filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Landis, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE filed by Defendant DCo LLC. Notice of Appearance (Landis, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 122 Defendant DCO LLC's CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DCo LLC, identifying Dana Corporation, DCo LLC, Dana Companies, LLC, Enstar Holdings(US) LLC, Enstar USA, Inc.. (Attorney Ryan S Landis added to party DCo LLC(pty:dft))(Landis, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 121 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler Stock, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Stock, Tyler)
November 25, 2019 Filing 120 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Plaintiffs James Laukat, Misun Laukat. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler Stock, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Tyler Robert Stock added to party James Laukat(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Robert Stock added to party Misun Laukat(pty:pla)) (Stock, Tyler)
November 25, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE filed by Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC., A Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Debtors NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Sandoval, Arturo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE filed by Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES OF DEFENDANT TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC., A CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY DEBTOR PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 (Sandoval, Arturo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 117 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Arturo E Sandoval counsel for Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. Adding Arturo E. Sandoval as counsel of record for TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC., for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.,. (Attorney Arturo E Sandoval added to party Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sandoval, Arturo)
November 22, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. of Filing State Court Answer (Barba, Luis)
November 22, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Meyer, Steven)
November 22, 2019 Filing 114 DECLARATION of Steven L. Meyer Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rule Governing Electronic Filing, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Meyer, Steven)
November 22, 2019 Filing 113 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Meyer, Steven)
November 22, 2019 Filing 112 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven E Meyer counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Adding Steven E. Meyer as counsel of record for BMW of North America, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attorney Steven E Meyer added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Meyer, Steven)
November 22, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE Notice of Filing State Court Answer; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Foley, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, identifying The Vanguard Group. (Foley, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 109 DECLARATION of Patrick J. Foley Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing, filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Foley, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 108 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick James Foley counsel for Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Adding Patrick J. Foley as counsel of record for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Foley, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 107 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick James Foley counsel for Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Adding Patrick James Foley as counsel of record for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attorney Patrick James Foley added to party The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company(pty:dft))(Foley, Patrick)
November 21, 2019 Filing 106 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Seymour B Everett, III counsel for Defendant Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. Adding Seymour B. Everett, III as counsel of record for American Honda Motor Co., Inc,. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attorney Seymour B Everett, III added to party Honda Motor Company, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Everett, Seymour)
November 21, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney J James Li on behalf of Defendant SAIC USA, Inc. (Attorney J James Li added to party SAIC USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Li, J)
November 21, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Re-Filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant SAIC USA, Inc.. (Li, J)
November 21, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, identifying Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. (Catalona, Alexander)
November 21, 2019 Filing 102 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander Paul Catalona counsel for Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. Filed by Defendant Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Attorney Alexander Paul Catalona added to party Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC(pty:dft))(Catalona, Alexander)
November 21, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Filing of Answer In California Superior Court filed by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Catalona, Alexander)
November 21, 2019 Filing 100 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan William Cayton counsel for Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Adding Jonathan W. Cayton as counsel of record for AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.. (Attorney Jonathan William Cayton added to party American Honda Motor Co., Inc(pty:dft))(Cayton, Jonathan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 99 DISCLOSURE of STATEMENT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. NO. 7.1 AND LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation (Hartley, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Filing 98 DECLARATION of LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNINING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Hartley, Edward)
November 21, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Hartley, Edward)
November 20, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Cayton, Jonathan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc identifying Honda Motor Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Cayton, Jonathan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES IMPROPERLY NAMED AND SERVED AS BW/IP, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO.'S NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Defendant BW IP, Inc.. (Ashouri, Aida)
November 20, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BW IP, Inc., identifying Flowserve Corporation. (Ashouri, Aida)
November 20, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Aida Ashouri on behalf of Defendant BW IP, Inc. (Attorney Aida Ashouri added to party BW IP, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ashouri, Aida)
November 19, 2019 Filing 91 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edward E Hartley counsel for Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. Adding Edward E. Hartley as counsel of record for INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION. (Attorney Edward E Hartley added to party International Business Machines Corporation(pty:dft))(Hartley, Edward)
November 19, 2019 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc., identifying American Employers, Affiliated FM, Allstate, London Market Companies, Lloyds Underwriters. (Whitehead, Henry)
November 19, 2019 Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. identifying Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Schneider Electric SE as Corporate Parent. (Whitehead, Henry)
November 19, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Whitehead, Henry)
November 19, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Henry Louis Whitehead on behalf of Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Attorney Henry Louis Whitehead added to party Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Whitehead, Henry)
November 15, 2019 Filing 86 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Angela M Hampton counsel for Defendant Hennessy Industries, Inc.. Adding Angela Hampton as counsel of record for Hennessy Industries LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Angela Hampton. (Attorney Angela M Hampton added to party Hennessy Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hampton, Angela)
November 15, 2019 Filing 85 Amended NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Salin Ebrahamian on behalf of Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation (Ebrahamian, Salin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company, identifying Dover Corporation. (Cunningham, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James P Cunningham on behalf of Defendant Blackmer Pump Company (Attorney James P Cunningham added to party Blackmer Pump Company(pty:dft))(Cunningham, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE Notice of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Damages filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. (Cunningham, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc., (Bishop, Charles)
November 14, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE DEFENDANT FRYER-KNOWLES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Endorsed State Court Answer)(Bishop, Charles)
November 14, 2019 Filing 79 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Charles S Bishop on behalf of Defendant Fryer-Knowles, Inc. (Attorney Charles S Bishop added to party Fryer-Knowles, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bishop, Charles)
November 14, 2019 Filing 78 DISCLOSURE of Corporate information filed by Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation (Ebrahamian, Salin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Ebrahamian, Salin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Salin Ebrahamian on behalf of Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation (Attorney Salin Ebrahamian added to party Pneumo Abex Corporation(pty:dft))(Ebrahamian, Salin)
November 13, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (10/16/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #67 .) (iv)
November 13, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Elliott Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT (10/16/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #65 .) (iv)
November 13, 2019 Filing 75 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendants Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, ITT LLC. Adding Amy J. Talarico as counsel of record for Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps LLC, Grinnell LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, ITT LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps LLC, Grinnell LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, ITT LLC. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Elliott Company(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Goulds Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Grinnell LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party ITT LLC(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ITT LLC identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant ITT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Grinnell LLC identifying Tyco International plc as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Grinnell LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company (Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification as to Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elliott Company identifying Ebara Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Elliott Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 64 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendants Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, ITT LLC. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps LLC, Grinnell LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company; ITT LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps LLC, Grinnell LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, ITT LLC. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Elliott Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Goulds Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Grinnell LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party ITT LLC(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 63 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Connor Matthew Scott counsel for Defendants J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. Adding Connor M. Scott as counsel of record for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.; Metalclad Insulation LLC; The Pep Boys--Manny, Moe & Jack Of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.; Metalclad Insulation LLC; The Pep Boys--Manny, Moe & Jack Of California. (Attorney Connor Matthew Scott added to party J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Connor Matthew Scott added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Connor Matthew Scott added to party The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California(pty:dft))(Scott, Connor)
November 13, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)
November 13, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant Advance Auto Parts Inc (Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party Advance Auto Parts Inc(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (10/30/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #41 .) (iv)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT (October 30, 2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE #35 .) (iv)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Advance Auto Parts Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (10/30/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE #29 .) (iv)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT 10/31/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #43 .) (iv)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. (FILED IN STATE COURT 10/31/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #45 .) (iv)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (11/4/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #48 .).(iv)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (FILED IN STATE COURT (11/4/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE #57 .) (iv)
November 12, 2019 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 AND LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Lannus, Paul)
November 12, 2019 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Lannus, Paul)
November 12, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Paul Lannus on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Paul Lannus added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Lannus, Paul)
November 12, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FMC's State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit FMC's State Court Demand for Jury Trial and Estimate of Length of Trial)(Gittler, Marissa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 7.1 and Civil Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendant FMC Corporation (Gittler, Marissa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marissa K Gittler counsel for Defendant FMC Corporation. Adding Timothy C. Pieper as counsel of record for FMC Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Gittler, Marissa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 54 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marissa K Gittler counsel for Defendant FMC Corporation. Adding Marissa K. Gittler as counsel of record for FMC Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Attorney Marissa K Gittler added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Gittler, Marissa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis D Pond counsel for Defendant FMC Corporation. Adding Frank D. Pond as counsel of record for FMC Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
November 12, 2019 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicole Elisabet Gage counsel for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Adding Nicole E. Gage as counsel of record for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attorney Nicole Elisabet Gage added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gage, Nicole)
November 12, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hennessy Industries, Inc., identifying Hennessy Industries LLC. (Rodriguez, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Adding Anthony D. Brosamle as counsel of record for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
November 12, 2019 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT /CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Golodnitska, Valeria)
November 12, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY (Golodnitska, Valeria)
November 12, 2019 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Valeria Golodnitska counsel for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Adding Valeria Golodnitska as counsel of record for Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attorney Valeria Golodnitska added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:dft))(Golodnitska, Valeria)
November 12, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California, identifying THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA (Pep Boys) states that there is no corporation that owns ten-percent or more of its stock.. (Chiu, Sylvia)
November 12, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint filed by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A To Defendant The Pep Boys--Manny, Moe & Jack Of California's Notice Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint)(Chiu, Sylvia)
November 12, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC, identifying ENTRX LLC (Holding Company); Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group); Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group); Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group); Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group); Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group); First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group); Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group); Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group); Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate); Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group); National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group); American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group); Transport Insurance Company; American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group).. (Chiu, Sylvia)
November 12, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A To Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC's Notice Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint)(Chiu, Sylvia)
November 12, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., identifying Terra Millennium Corporation (Corporate Parent); Firemans Fund Insurance Co./Allianz/Enstar; Resolute Management; and RiverStone.. (Chiu, Sylvia)
November 12, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A To Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.'s Notice Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint)(Chiu, Sylvia)
November 12, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Graham on behalf of Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Attorney Michael A Graham added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Graham, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sylvia Chiu counsel for Defendants J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California. Adding Sylvia Chiu as counsel of record for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.; Metalclad Insulation LLC; The Pep Boys--Manny, Moe & Jack Of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.; Metalclad Insulation LLC; The Pep Boys--Manny, Moe & Jack Of California. (Attorney Sylvia Chiu added to party J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sylvia Chiu added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sylvia Chiu added to party The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California(pty:dft))(Chiu, Sylvia)
November 12, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
November 12, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dana L Burch on behalf of Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Burch, Dana)
November 12, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company, (Attorney Dana L Burch added to party Western Auto Supply Company(pty:dft))(Burch, Dana)
November 12, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Burch, Dana)
November 12, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher W Wood counsel for Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. Adding Christopher W. Wood as counsel of record for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher W Wood added to party J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wood, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant Advance Auto Parts Inc (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party Advance Auto Parts Inc(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
November 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Graham on behalf of Defendant Advance Auto Parts Inc (Attorney Michael A Graham added to party Advance Auto Parts Inc(pty:dft))(Graham, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dana L Burch on behalf of Defendant Advance Auto Parts Inc (Burch, Dana)
November 12, 2019 Filing 30 Certificate/ NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Advance Auto Parts Inc, (Attorney Dana L Burch added to party Advance Auto Parts Inc(pty:dft))(Burch, Dana)
November 12, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Advance Auto Parts Inc. (Burch, Dana)
November 12, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company, (Flinders, Ethan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Flinders, Ethan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ethan L Flinders on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Ethan L Flinders added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Flinders, Ethan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dana L Burch on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Dana L Burch added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Burch, Dana)
November 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
November 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Graham on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Michael A Graham added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Graham, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery), #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Appearance and Certification of Interested Parties should be filed as separate docket entries and not as attachments to the Answer. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company (FILED IN STATE COURT 10/31/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE #27 .) (iv)
November 8, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Edelbrock, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT 10/18/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #17 .) (iv)
November 8, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant SVD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT 10/18/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #15 .) (iv)
November 8, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT 11/8/2019) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #19 .) (iv)
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. Adding Anthony D. Brosamle as counsel of record for Flowserve US Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. (Brosamle, Anthony)
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc., (Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party Flowserve US Inc.(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. Notice of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brosamle, Anthony)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Edelbrock, LLC (Galfayan, Arpi)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Edelbrock, LLC. (Galfayan, Arpi)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SVD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant SVD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bailey, Bobbie)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company.(Bessette, Paul)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2;19-cv-09436 CJC(Ex). (rn)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ian G Williamson counsel for Defendant Hennessy Industries, Inc.. Adding Ian G. Williamson as counsel of record for Hennessy Industries, LLC erroneously sued as Hennessy Industries, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC. (Attorney Ian G Williamson added to party Hennessy Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Williamson, Ian)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert C Rodriguez counsel for Defendant Hennessy Industries, Inc.. Adding Robert C. Rodriguez as counsel of record for Hennessy Industries LLC erroneously sued as Hennessy Industries Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hennessy Industries LLC. (Attorney Robert C Rodriguez added to party Hennessy Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rodriguez, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
November 1, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Misun Laukat, James Laukat. Filed in State Court on 9/24/2019 Submitted with Exhibit A Page 23 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Declaration #5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #6 served on 11/1/19. (Bessette, Paul)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul M Bessette counsel for Movant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. Adding Paul M. Bessette as counsel of record for National Steel and Shipbuilding Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Roger B. Horne, Jr. re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Movant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company, identifying National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company identifying National Steel and Shipbuilding Company as Corporate Parent. (Bessette, Paul)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Bessette, Paul)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV33853 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 11/01/2019, receipt number 097324712910), filed by Defendant National Steel and Shipbuilding Company. (Attorney Paul M Bessette added to party National Steel and Shipbuilding Company(pty:bkmov))(Bessette, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Laukat et al v. ABB, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCo LLC, f/k/a and individually as successor in interest to Dana Companies LLC, Victor Corporation, Victor Gaskets and Victor Manufacturing and Gasket Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC f/k/a CSK Auto, Inc. individually and as successor in interest to Grand Auto, Inc. and Kragen Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Bear Automotive Service Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SVD Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: B Gardiner McKleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Auto Parts Inc
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Represented By: Eric D Sentlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc., sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Steam Turbine Company and Delaval, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse TEC LLC as successor by merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Represented By: Paul Lannus
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, a subsidiary of AMPCO-Pittsburgh Corporation, individually and as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Fnc., individually and successor in interest to Buffalo Forge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc
Represented By: Seymour B Everett, III
Represented By: Jonathan William Cayton
Represented By: Samantha E Dorey
Represented By: Jonathan W Cayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Edward E Hartley
Represented By: Barry N Endick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edelbrock, LLC
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Represented By: Mark S Kannett
Represented By: Shahrad Milanfar
Represented By: Alexander Paul Catalona
Represented By: Ira D Goldberg
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Represented By: Emily D. Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: James P Cunningham
Represented By: Robert Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Represented By: Eric D Sentlinger
Represented By: Patrick J Glinka
Represented By: Mihir Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company, individually and as successor in interest to Terry Steam Turbine Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Northern Pump Company f/k/a Northern Fire Apparatus Company, Chicago Pump Company, Peerless Pump Company and Barrett Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, as successor in interest to Foster Wheeler Corporation and Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc., et al. individually and as successor in interest to ITE Imperial Co. f/k/a ITE Circuit Breaker Co. and Bulldog Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Bellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc. f/k/a Gardner Denver Machinery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation as successor in interest to BF Sturtevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAIC USA, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Allen-Bradley Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC f/k/a Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to AMMCO Tools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL Co., a division of Griswold Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCO West, Inc. f/k/a Brenntag West, Inc. f/k/a SOCO-Lynch Corporation successor in interest to Western Chemical & Manufacturing. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAIC Motor Corporation Limited, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company aka Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to ITE Imperial Co. f/k/a ITE Circuit Breaker Co. and Bulldog Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Byron Jackson Pump Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unisys Corporation
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Marissa K Gittler
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc. fka Square D Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Seymour B Everett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to ITE Imperial Co. f/k/a ITE Circuit Breaker Co. and Bulldog Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, as successor to Felt Products MFG. Co. and Beck Arnley Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC, f/k/a Warren Pumps, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Quimby Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc. f/k/a CSK Auto, Inc. Individually and as successor in interest to Grand Auto, Inc. and Kragen Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone West, Inc, individually and as successor in interest to Chief Auto Parts, Inc. and a/k/a Autozone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Abex Corporation, as successor in interest to American Brakeblok Corporation and as successor in interest to American Brake Shoe C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC, f/k/a ITT Corporation, f/k/a ITT Industries, Inc.; individually and as successor-in-interest to Bell & Gossett Company, Foster Engineering Company and Kennedy Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation, individually and as successor to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC, dba Grinnell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company, a/k/a and individually and as successor in interest to Napa Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Arturo E Sandoval
Represented By: Christine L Hawkins
Represented By: Douglas G Wah
Represented By: Randall K Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC, individually and as successor in interest to Triumph Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Slayen, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Mark Mahoney
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Represented By: Ira D Goldberg
Represented By: Emily D. Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Edward Valve, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC
Represented By: Christine Diaz Reynolds
Represented By: Elizabeth V McNulty
Represented By: Elizabeth V. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Dirk Bernhardt
Represented By: Heather L Weakley
Represented By: Salin Ebrahamian
Represented By: William H Armstrong
Represented By: Robert Dirk Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone West, Inc.
Represented By: William L Coggshall
Represented By: Angela M Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Robert Hudson Castillo
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Represented By: Robert Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAIC USA, Inc.
Represented By: J James Li
Represented By: Andrew M Pierz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Alex G Taheri
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Daniel R Baltes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Mark Jackson
Represented By: Leila Rajazi
Represented By: Marte J Bassi
Represented By: Leila N. Rajazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By: Lisa P Gruen
Represented By: Alexandra Bethany Ascione
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Conn
Represented By: Lisa P. Gruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Represented By: Ethan L Flinders
Represented By: Patrick J Glinka
Represented By: Zorik Haruthunian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Louis Whitehead
Represented By: Charlie Chaya Nelson Keever
Represented By: D Scott Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe and Jack of California
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Sylvia Chiu
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 400, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Valeria Golodnitska
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCo LLC
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Represented By: Susan W Gilefsky
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: Ryan S Landis
Represented By: Stephen M. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Baltes
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Jerry C Popovich
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Brady
Represented By: Holly Chang Beal
Represented By: Cindy Quan Tran
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Sylvia Chiu
Represented By: Frederic W Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Paul Catalona
Represented By: Patrick Mark Mahoney
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Represented By: Ira D Goldberg
Represented By: Emily D. Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C Rodriguez
Represented By: Angela M Hampton
Represented By: Ian G Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Galen Bo Chuan Wang
Represented By: Patrick James Foley
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW IP, Inc.
Represented By: Aida Ashouri
Represented By: Keith M Ameele
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Represented By: Taline R Gettas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Sylvia Chiu
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Marissa K Gittler
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo