Springcoin, Inc. et al v. Kathy A. Baran et al
Plaintiff: Springcoin, Inc. and Devika Pradhan
Defendant: DHS, Director Kathy BARAN, Secretary Kevin K McAleenan, USCIS, Director Ken Cuccinelli, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and Kathy Baran
Case Number: 2:2019cv09444
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #6 Non-Resident Attorney Jan H. Brown APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Springcoin, Inc. and Devika Pradhan, designating Bernard Wolfsdorf as local counsel. (yl)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09444 PA(RAOx). (rn)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Kathy Baran, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin K McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (bm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Devika Pradhan, Springcoin, Inc.. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: Summons Request should indicate at least one defendant in the "To:" section of the summons, followed by "see attached" if there is not enough room for all defendants to be listed. Summons Request should also indicate judge and magistrate judge's initials following the case number indicated in the Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (bm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Devika Pradhan, Springcoin, Inc.. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jan H. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Devika Pradhan, Springcoin, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24737310) filed by Plaintiffs Devika Pradhan, Springcoin, Inc.. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jan H. Brown. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Springcoin, Inc., dba Spring Labs; August Capital; Victory Park Capital; GreatPoint Ventures; Pritzker Group Venture Capital; Multicoin Capital; Wavemaker Genesis; and Jump Capital. (Wolfsdorf, Bernard)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24713893 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Springcoin, Inc., Devika Pradhan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Bernard P Wolfsdorf added to party Devika Pradhan(pty:pla), Attorney Bernard P Wolfsdorf added to party Springcoin, Inc.(pty:pla))(Wolfsdorf, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springcoin, Inc. et al v. Kathy A. Baran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kathy BARAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Baran
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springcoin, Inc.
Represented By: Bernard P Wolfsdorf
Represented By: Jan H Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devika Pradhan
Represented By: Bernard P Wolfsdorf
Represented By: Jan H Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?