Prime Signatures LLC v. Solvaderm Skincare USA et al
Plaintiff: Prime Signatures LLC
Defendant: Admark, LLC, Solvaderm Skincare USA, Brendan O'Shea, PRIMARK, LLC, Wastena Holdings LLC and Does 1-10 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09475
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation Requesting Second Extension of Time to Respond to initial Complaint #16 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant Admark, LLC, Brendan O'Shea, PRIMARK, LLC, Wastena Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sohi, Jayson)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to PRIMARK, LLC answer now due 12/29/2019; Admark, LLC answer now due 12/29/2019; Brendan O'Shea answer now due 12/29/2019; Wastena Holdings LLC answer now due 12/29/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants PRIMARK, LLC; Admark, LLC; Brendan O'Shea; Wastena Holdings LLC.(Attorney Jayson Singh Sohi added to party Admark, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jayson Singh Sohi added to party Brendan O'Shea(pty:dft), Attorney Jayson Singh Sohi added to party PRIMARK, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jayson Singh Sohi added to party Wastena Holdings LLC(pty:dft))(Sohi, Jayson)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Prime Signatures LLC, upon Defendant Wastena Holdings LLC served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tracey Padilla, President of American Corporate Enterprises, Inc., Registered Agent for Service of Process for Defendant Wastena Holdings LLC in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Afrasiabi, Peter)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Prime Signatures LLC, upon Defendant Admark, LLC served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tracey Padilla, President of American Corporate Enterprises, Inc., Registered Agent for Service of Process for Defendant Admark, LLC in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Afrasiabi, Peter)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant PRIMARK, LLC. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Wastena Holdings LLC. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Admark, LLC. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Brendan O'Shea. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Solvaderm Skincare USA. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Prime Signatures LLC, identifying Plaintiff Prime Signatures LLC. (Afrasiabi, Peter)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Prime Signatures LLC. (Afrasiabi, Peter)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Prime Signatures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Brendan O'Shea, #2 Summons to Admark, LLC, #3 Summons to Westena Holdings LLC, #4 Summons to Primark, LLC)(Afrasiabi, Peter)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24721469 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Prime Signatures LLC. (Attorney Peter R Afrasiabi added to party Prime Signatures LLC(pty:pla))(Afrasiabi, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Signatures LLC v. Solvaderm Skincare USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admark, LLC
Represented By: Jayson Singh Sohi
Represented By: Daniel C Cotman
Represented By: Obi Ian Iloputaife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvaderm Skincare USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan O'Shea
Represented By: Jayson Singh Sohi
Represented By: Daniel C Cotman
Represented By: Obi Ian Iloputaife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIMARK, LLC
Represented By: Jayson Singh Sohi
Represented By: Daniel C Cotman
Represented By: Obi Ian Iloputaife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wastena Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jayson Singh Sohi
Represented By: Daniel C Cotman
Represented By: Obi Ian Iloputaife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Signatures LLC
Represented By: Peter R Afrasiabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?