Pilot, Inc. v. Gooloo Technology LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pilot, Inc.
Defendant: Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., Ltd. and Gooloo Technology LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv09485
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Application of Non-Resident Attorney #18 , for the following reasons: Other: LR 83-2.1.3.4 -Local counsel does not maintain an office within district. (bm)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON SECOND AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #21 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: This Court, having considered Plaintiff Pilot, Inc.'s Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint, and for good cause shown: HEREBY ORDERS that Plaintiff's Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants Gooloo Technology LLC and Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., Ltd.'s new deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is January 21, 2020. (bm)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 21, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Pilot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holohan, Matthew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aaron P. Bradford to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pilot, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24889072) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 12/4/19. APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aaron P. Bradford to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pilot, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24889072) filed by Plaintiff Pilot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Holohan, Matthew) Modified on 12/16/2019 (bm).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer #17 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having considered Gooloo Technology LLC and Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce co., Ltd.'s (collectively, "Gooloo") Agreed Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint, and for good cause shown: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Gooloo's Agreed Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants Gooloo's new deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is December 20, 2019. (bm)
November 29, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant Gooloo Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Philip C. Swain in support of agreed motion for extension, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to declaration of Philip Swain)(Swain, Philip)
November 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Philip C Swain on behalf of Defendants Gooloo Technology LLC, Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., Ltd. (Attorney Philip C Swain added to party Gooloo Technology LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Philip C Swain added to party Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., Ltd.(pty:dft))(Swain, Philip)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09485 PSG(JEMx). (rn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Aaron P. Bradford on behalf of Plaintiff Pilot, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Certificates of good standing have been ordered and Mr. Bradford will complete his pro hac admission application and submit the certificates once they have been received from the Colorado and Arizona Courts. (lt)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pilot, Inc., upon Defendant Gooloo Technology LLC served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Katrese Scott on behalf of Resident Agents Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Holohan, Matthew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Aaron P Bradford. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., Ltd. (et)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Gooloo Technology LLC. (et)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Pilot, Inc.. (Holohan, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Pilot, Inc.. (Holohan, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pilot, Inc., identifying Pilot Holdings, Inc.. (Holohan, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Pilot, Inc.. (Holohan, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pilot, Inc.. (Holohan, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24724319 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Pilot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Pat. 9,525,297, #2 Exhibit B - US Pat. 10,046,653, #3 Exhibit C - Online Prod. Descriptions, #4 Exhibit D - Gooloo GP80 User's Manual, #5 Exhibit E - US Pat. 9,525,297 Pros History, #6 Exhibit F - US Pat. 10,046,653 Pros History) (Attorney Matthew Christian Holohan added to party Pilot, Inc.(pty:pla))(Holohan, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilot, Inc. v. Gooloo Technology LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Gooloo E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Philip C Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gooloo Technology LLC
Represented By: Philip C Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilot, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Christian Holohan
Represented By: Aaron P Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?