George Bridgette v. R.C. Johnson
Petitioner: George Bridgette
Respondent: R.C. Johnson
Case Number: 2:2019cv09514
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from George Bridgette on 12/19/19. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 . Receipt number LA199630. (jo)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-56433 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #8 as to Petitioner George Bridgette. (sbou)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Petitioner George Bridgette. (mat)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Certificate of Appealability by Petitioner George Bridgette. (mat)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Petitioner George Bridgette. Appeal of Judgment #5 Filed On: 11/19/19; Entered On: 11/20/19; Certificate of Appealability was ruled on 11/19/19, see item 7. (mat)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge S. James Otero (car) Modified on 11/20/2019 (car).
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Judge S. James Otero,:Under the Order Summarily Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Administratively Closing Case, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed. (lc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT by Judge S. James Otero, in favor of R.C. Johnson against George Bridgette Related to: Order Dismissing Case #4 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SUMMARILY DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE by Judge S. James Otero. (See document for details.) (sbou)
November 18, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 . Proposed Order Re Order Denying a Certificate of Appealability forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(bem)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge S. James Otero and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before a United States Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner George Bridgette. (car)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge S. James Otero and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner George Bridgette. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Bridgette v. R.C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R.C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Bridgette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?