John Caldwell v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: John Caldwell
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Petitioner: JOHN, on behalf of himself and all others similarl CALDWELL
Case Number: 2:2019cv09518
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff John Caldwell. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Grombacher, Kiley)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer now due 1/31/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Benedetto, Matthew)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew D Benedetto counsel for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Adding Matthew Benedetto as counsel of record for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Matthew D Benedetto added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Benedetto, Matthew)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details). (et)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff John Caldwell. upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Noah A. Levine. (Grombacher, Kiley)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (mrgo)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff John Caldwell. (McCune, Richard)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff JOHN, on behalf of himself and all others similarl CALDWELL. (McCune, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff JOHN, on behalf of himself and all others similarl CALDWELL, (McCune, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant JOHN, on behalf of himself and all others similarl CALDWELL. (McCune, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24732870 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff JOHN, on behalf of himself and all others similarl CALDWELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney Richard D McCune added to party JOHN, on behalf of himself and all others similarl CALDWELL(pty:bkmov))(McCune, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Caldwell v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN, on behalf of himself and all others similarl CALDWELL
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew D Benedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caldwell
Represented By: Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Represented By: Michele Marie Vercoski
Represented By: Richard D McCune
Represented By: Robert Neil Fisher
Represented By: Marcus J Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?