PennyMac Loan Services, LLC v. Black Knight, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Black Knight, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09526
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0002
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case #25 and Motion to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida #26 , filed on 01/02/2020 and noticed for hearing on 03/09/2020 at 9:00 am, HAVE BEEN ADVANCED TO 02/10/2020 at 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for May 4, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020. (sw)
January 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #5 Declaration of Eric M. George in Support of Motion to Transfer, #6 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Transfer, #7 Exhibit D to the Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Transfer, #8 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer) (George, Eric)
January 2, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and to Strike Counts 3-5 Pursuant to Cal. Code. Civ. Pro. Section 425.16 filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #5 Declaration of Eric M. George in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #6 Supplement Request for Judicial in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit D to the Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #8 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (George, Eric)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney James H Mutchnik APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintifff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, designating Tammy Ann Tsoumas as local counsel. (et)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Russell E. Levine APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, designating Tammy A. Tsoumas as local counsel. (et)
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc. identifying Black Knight, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (George, Eric)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James H. Mutchnik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24956904) filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney (James H. Mutchnik) to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Tsoumas, Tammy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Russell E. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24956702) filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney (Russell E. Levine) to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Tsoumas, Tammy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party PennyMac Loan Services, LLC(pty:pla))(Tsoumas, Tammy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark C Holscher on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party PennyMac Loan Services, LLC(pty:pla))(Holscher, Mark)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carl Alan Roth on behalf of Defendant Black Knight, Inc. (Attorney Carl Alan Roth added to party Black Knight, Inc.(pty:dft))(Roth, Carl)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Lawrence Venezia counsel for Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. Adding Matthew L. Venezia as counsel of record for Black Knight, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew Lawrence Venezia added to party Black Knight, Inc.(pty:dft))(Venezia, Matthew)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan Ian Gleklen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Black Knight, Inc., designating David Eric Shapland as local counsel. (et)
December 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND BLACK NIGHT, INC.'S RESPONSE DATE TO JANUARY 6, 2020 #13 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (et)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Amended STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Black Knight, Inc. answer now due 1/6/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response)(George, Eric)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Black Knight, Inc. answer now due 1/1/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc..(George, Eric)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan I. Gleklen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Black Knight, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/25/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24845927) filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Shapland, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan I. Gleklen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Black Knight, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24845927) filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney David Eric Shapland added to party Black Knight, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Shapland, David)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Black Knight, Inc. answer now due 11/6/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response)(Attorney Eric M George added to party Black Knight, Inc.(pty:dft))(George, Eric)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Black Knight, Inc. (car)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, (Lee, Barry)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Lee, Barry)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Lee, Barry)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24733597 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Barry W Lee added to party PennyMac Loan Services, LLC(pty:pla))(Lee, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC v. Black Knight, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Knight, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Venezia
Represented By: Jonathan I Gleklen
Represented By: Carl Alan Roth
Represented By: Eric M George
Represented By: David Eric Shapland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Yasser M El-Gamal
Represented By: Richard E Gottlieb
Represented By: Barry W Lee
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Represented By: Russell E Levine
Represented By: James H Mutchnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?