George Kruse et al v. Actuant Corporation et al
Plaintiff: George Kruse and Shigeko Kruse
Defendant: OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to GTE SYLVANIA successor-in-interest to PHILCO-FORD), HARCOSEMCO LLC (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to HARCO LLC f/k/a HARCO LABORATORIES, INCORPORATED), LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION d/b/a LOCKHEED MARTIN AERONAUTICS (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to MARTIN MARIETTA), NAVCOM DEFENSE ELECTRONICES LLC f/k/a NAVCOM DEFENSE ELECTRONICS INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to HOFFMAN ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, ROCKWELL COLLINS, INC. a subsidiary of UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION), UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION; UNISYS CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to SPERRY CORPORATION f/k/a SPERRY RAND, SPERRY VICKERS and SPERRY FLIGHT SYSTEMS DIVISIONS, and as succes, FORD MOTOR COMPANY (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to PHILCO CORPORATION a/k/a PHILCO-FORD), ACTUANT CORPORATION a/k/a ENERPAC TOOL GROUP for its Stewart Warner brand of products, Crane Co., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BENDIX AVIATION CORPORATION successor-in-interest to BENDIX RADIO CORPORATION, and as successor-in-interest to SPERRY F, KEARFOTT CORPORATION, a wholly-owned subsidiary of ASTRONAUTICS CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL ENTERPRISES INDUSTRIES, LLC, BAE SYSTEMS INC, and its BAE SYSTEMS SENSOR SYSTEMS GROUP (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to HAZELTINE CORPORATION), INTERNATIONAL ENTERPRISES, INC., HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY f/k/a THE HEWLETT PACKARD COMPANY, Motorola Solutions, Inc., AVCO CORPORATION, subsidiary of TEXTRON INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to CROSLEY CORPORATION), Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to RCA CORPORATION for its former subsidiary, GEC-MARCONI HAZELTINE as successor-in-interest to HAZELTINE CORPORATION), EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to HAZELTINE CORPORATION), ITT INC. f/k/a ITT CORPORATION f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC, formerly doing business as THE HEWLETT PACKARD COMPANY, VERIZON COMUNICATIONS INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to GTE CORPORTION successor-in-interest to PHICO-FORD CORPORATION, J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to THE CONSOLIDATED VULTEE AIRCRAFT CORPORATION a/k/a CONVAIR and as successor-in-interest to STROMBERG CARLSON), INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION a/k/a IBM, L3HARRIS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to HARRIS CORPORATION), THE BOEING COMPANY (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to McDONNELL DOUGLAS successor-by-merger to DOUGLAS AIRCRAFT and as successor-in-interest to ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. f/k/a NORTH, Actuant Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, The Boeing Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, OSRAM Sylvania Inc., J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Harcosemco LLC, Does 1-450 inclusive, Ford Motor Company, IBM, CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp. f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp., General Electric Company, Emerson Electric Co., BAE Systems, Inc., ITT Inc., Enerpac Tool Group, Verizon Communication Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Unisys Corporation, L3Harris Technologies, Inc., GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, erroneously sued and served as Verizon Communications Inc. and Osram Sylvania Inc., AVCO Corporation, Navcom Defense Electronics LLC, Agilent Technologies Inc., Kearfott Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Rockwell Collins, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Martin Marietta) doing business as Lockheed Martin Aeronautics, Agilent Technologies Inc. formerly doing business as The Hewlett Packard Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company formerly doing business as The Hewlett Packard Company, Navcom Defense Electronics Inc., ITT Corporation, ITT Industries, Inc., Viacom. Inc. and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv09540
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter on behalf of Defendant Emerson Electric Co. (Attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter added to party Emerson Electric Co.(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
September 9, 2020 Filing 211 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Connor Matthew Scott counsel for Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. Connor M. Scott will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Scott, Connor)
September 9, 2020 Filing 210 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sylvia Chiu counsel for Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. Sylvia Chiu will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Chiu, Sylvia)
September 9, 2020 Filing 209 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher W Wood counsel for Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. Christopher W. Wood will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Wood, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to Substitute attorney Ian Williamson in place of attorney Justin E. Garratt filed by defendant AVCO Corporation #206 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 207 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST to Substitute attorney Ian Williamson in place of attorney Justin E. Garratt #206 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Missing corresponding G-01 proposed order form...obtainable at courts website. As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 206 REQUEST to Substitute attorney Ian Williamson in place of attorney Justin E. Garratt filed by defendant AVCO Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of service) (Attorney Ian G Williamson added to party AVCO Corporation(pty:dft)) (Williamson, Ian)
July 28, 2020 Filing 205 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zorik Haruthunian counsel for Defendant Unisys Corporation. Adding Zorik Rick Haruthunian as counsel of record for Unisys Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Attorney Zorik Haruthunian added to party Unisys Corporation(pty:dft))(Haruthunian, Zorik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 204 NOTICE of Change of address by Ulla M Pajala attorney for Defendant Harcosemco LLC. Changing attorneys address to 1901 Harrison Street, Suite 1300, Oakland, CA 94612. Filed by Defendant Harcosemco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Pajala, Ulla)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND #140 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER RE DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE #199 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
April 28, 2020 Filing 201 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard A Muench, Jr counsel for Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. Filed by defendant HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY. (Muench, Richard)
April 28, 2020 Filing 200 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer M Porche counsel for Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. Filed by defendant HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY. (Attorney Jennifer M Porche added to party Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company(pty:dft))(Porche, Jennifer)
April 21, 2020 Filing 199 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc. filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Connor)
April 21, 2020 Filing 198 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #197 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Within the Notice, Filer seeks the vacating or the staying of any pre-trial and trial proceedings stayed due to death of plaintiff George Kruse. Therefore missing proposed order. As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 21, 2020 Filing 197 NOTICE of Death of Plaintiff George Kruse filed by Plaintiffs George Kruse, Shigeko Kruse. (Gamble, Tyson)
April 17, 2020 Filing 196 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Union Carbide Corporation filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Dismiss Union Carbide Corporation)(Bowlby, Stephanie)
March 18, 2020 Filing 195 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of of Federal Rule of Civ Proc 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Aspericueta, Erika)
March 16, 2020 Filing 194 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Harcosemco LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Arias, Cathy)
March 13, 2020 Filing 193 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of RULE 26(a)(1) filed by Plaintiffs George Kruse, Shigeko Kruse (Gamble, Tyson)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for Settlement Conference. (lc)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR ALL THE SPECIFIED DATES:Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2021 01:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 6/8/2021 09:00 AM; Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2020;Discovery cut-off 2/22/2021; Motions in Limine to be filed by 5/10/2021;Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/3/2021; Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/12/2021. (lc) Modified on 3/12/2020 (lc).
March 9, 2020 Filing 190 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 12 days, filed by Plaintiffs George Kruse, Shigeko Kruse.. (Gamble, Tyson)
March 5, 2020 Filing 189 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order on Motion to Withdraw Motion, #188 e-mailed to Conor Nideffer bounced due to No longer with firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT UNISYS CORPORATIONS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXCUSING LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FROM APPEARING AT THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #185 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Frank D. Pond, lead trial counsel for Defendant UNISYS CORPORATION, is excused from attending the status conference scheduled for March 16, 2020 and Michael A. Graham may appear in his place. (lc)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR UNION CARBIDE CORPORATIONS LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL TO BE EXCUSED FROM PERSONALLY ATTENDING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR GOOD CAUSE #186 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Stephen Nichols is excused from personally attending the March 16, 2020 Scheduling Conference. Stephanie Bowlby may attend the Scheduling Conference in his place. (lc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 186 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Excuse Lead Trial Consel at Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Bowlby ISO UCC'S Ex Parte to Excuse Lead Trial Consel at Scheduling Conference, #2 Declaration of Stephen Nichols ISO UCC'S Ex Parte to Excuse Lead Trial Consel at Scheduling Conference, #3 Proposed Order ISO UCC'S Ex Parte to Excuse Lead Trial Consel at Scheduling Conference) (Bowlby, Stephanie)
March 4, 2020 Filing 185 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw or Excuse Unisys Corporation's Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at the Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Unisys Corporation's Unopposed Application to Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at the Scheduling Conference, #2 Declaration of Patrick J. Glinka in Support of Defendant Unisys Corporation's Unopposed Application to Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at the Scheduling Conference, #3 Declaration of Frank D. Pond in Support of Defendant Unisys Corporation's Unopposed Application to Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at the Scheduling Conference, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Unisys Corporation's Unopposed Application for Order Excusing Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at the Scheduling Conference) (Glinka, Patrick)
March 3, 2020 Filing 184 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant General Dynamics Corporation (Bessette, Paul)
February 27, 2020 Filing 183 DECLARATION of Michael J. Pietrykowski re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court #180 filed by Defendant Navcom Defense Electronics LLC. (Mansourian, Vick)
February 25, 2020 Filing 182 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court has vacated and taken off calendar the hearing on the motion to remand. 178 . Accordingly, the Court DENIES as moot the application at #179 and Ex Parte Application at ECF No. #180 . (lc)
February 25, 2020 Filing 181 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Acuant APPLICATION to Withdraw Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at Hearing to Remand Case to State Court #179 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Filer erroneously set the request for 3/2/20 hearin 1:30 PM which does not appear on the pdf document, nor is one required.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 25, 2020 Filing 180 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Navcom Defense Electronics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Vick Mansourian, #3 Declaration of Michael Pietrykowski, #4 Proposed Order) (Mansourian, Vick)
February 25, 2020 Filing 179 APPLICATION to Withdraw Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at Hearing to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Actuant Corporation. Application set for hearing on 3/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Scadden, #2 Proposed Order) (Scadden, James)
February 24, 2020 Filing 178 The hearing on the MOTION TO REMAND #140 , scheduled for March 2, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 24, 2020 Filing 177 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #175 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Order. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 176 DISCLOSURE of Defendant Kearfott Corporation's Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Defendant Kearfott Corporation (Weiss, Eric)
February 21, 2020 Filing 175 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE VIA FILE & SERVE XPRESS filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah M. Parker, #2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Deborah)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER GRANTING LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATIONS MOTION TO EXCUSE LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FROM HEARING ON MOTION TO REMAND #171 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 173 Initial DISCLOSURE of Civil Procedure 26(a) filed by Defendant Actuant Corporation (Scadden, James)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.S APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXCUSING LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FROM ATTENDING HEARING TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT #169 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
February 19, 2020 Filing 171 Unopposed Request to Excuse Lead Trial Counsel From Appearing at Hearing for Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah M. Parker, #2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Deborah)
February 19, 2020 Filing 170 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of RULE 26(A)(1) filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc. (Scott, Connor)
February 19, 2020 Filing 169 APPLICATION to Withdraw , APPLICATION for Order for Excusing Lead Trial Counsel from Attending Hearing to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gary D. Sharp in support of Application for Order Excusing Lead Trial Counsel from Attending Hearing to Remand Case to State Court, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Emerson Electric Co.'s Application for Order Excusing Lead Trial Counsel From Attending Hearing to Remand Case to State Court) (Niemeyer, Trevis)
February 19, 2020 Filing 168 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation (Landis, Ryan)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCUSE LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL FROM APPEARING FOR THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT AND THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #160 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Lead trial counsel Richard A. Muench, Jr. is excused from appearing and Tucker W. Wade may appear on behalf of Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company at the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court on 9 March 2, 2020 and the Scheduling Conference on March 16, 2020. (lc)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO #159 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. THE PARTIES SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS. (lom)
February 14, 2020 Filing 165 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 RE: THE BOEING COMPANY filed by Plaintiffs George Kruse, Shigeko Kruse. (Barley, Lisa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 164 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 RE: GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION filed by Plaintiffs George Kruse, Shigeko Kruse. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATIONS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FEDERAL ENCLAVES)(Barley, Lisa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 163 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 RE: LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION filed by Plaintiffs George Kruse, Shigeko Kruse. (Barley, Lisa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 162 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 RE: ROCKWELL COLLINS, INC. AND AVCO CORPORATION filed by Plaintiffs George Kruse, Shigeko Kruse. (Barley, Lisa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 161 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 filed by Plaintiffs George Kruse, Shigeko Kruse. (Barley, Lisa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 160 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Requiring Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company's Lead Trial Counsel From Appearing at the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court and the Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company's Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court and the Scheduling Conference, #2 Declaration of Tucker W. Wade in Support of Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company's Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court and the Scheduling Conference, #3 Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel Richard A. Muench, Jr., in Support of Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company's Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court and the Scheduling Conference, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company's Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court and the Scheduling Conference) (Wade, Tucker)
February 13, 2020 Filing 159 STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Crane Co. filed by defendant Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Geoffrey)
February 13, 2020 Filing 158 Notice of Withdrawal of Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #153 filed by defendant Crane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey)
February 12, 2020 Filing 157 SEALED DOCUMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #156 filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2 to Declaration of Leatherman, #2 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Leatherman, #3 Exhibit 4-15 to Declaration of Leatherman, #4 Exhibit 16-19 to Declaration of Leatherman, #5 Exhibit 20-21 to Declaration of Leatherman, #6 Declaration Declaration of Richard K. Shimamoto, #7 Exhibit 1-3 to Declaration of Richard K. Shimamoto, #8 Exhibit 4-8 to Declaration of Richard K. Shimamoto, #9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Richard K. Shimamoto)(Young, Kristi)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY'S UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL #146 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following documents are ordered sealed. See order for further details. (lom)
February 10, 2020 Filing 155 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE of Federal Enclaves in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant General Dynamics Corporation. (Bessette, Paul)
February 10, 2020 Filing 154 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 filed by Defendant General Dynamics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bradford W. Heil)(Bessette, Paul)
February 10, 2020 Filing 153 WITHDRAWN, see docket entry no. 158 - OPPOSITION to related document re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 filed by Defendant Crane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) Modified on 2/14/2020 (lom).
February 10, 2020 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation. (Garratt, Justin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 151 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian T. Clark, #2 Exhibits 1 through 5 to Clark Declaration, #3 Declaration of Valentino Jimenez, #4 Exhibits A through F to Jimemez Declaration, #5 Exhibits G through L to Jimenez Declaration, #6 Exhibits M through Q to Jimenez Declaration)(Parker, Deborah)
February 10, 2020 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Garratt, Justin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF KRISTI L.K. YOUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND TO STATE COURT, #2 Exhibit EX AA, Part 2 to Young Declaration, #3 Exhibit EX AA, Part 3 to Young Declaration, #4 Exhibit EX AA, Part 4 to Young Declaration)(Young, Kristi)
February 10, 2020 Filing 148 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #140 Defendant UNISYS CORPORATION'S Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand to State Court filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Glinka, Patrick)
February 10, 2020 Filing 147 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Declaration of Nolan Leatherman and designated exhibits AND Declaration of Richard K. Shimamoto and designated exhibits under seal #146 filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Ex 1-2 to Declaration of Leatherman, #2 Unredacted Document Ex 4-15 to Declaration of Leatherman, #3 Unredacted Document Ex 16-19 to Declaration of Leatherman, #4 Unredacted Document Ex 20-21 to Declaration of Leatherman, #5 Unredacted Document DECLARATION OF RICHARD K. SHIMAMOTO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND, #6 Unredacted Document Ex 1-3 to Declaration of Shimamoto, #7 Unredacted Document Ex 4-8 to Declaration of Shimamoto, #8 Unredacted Document Ex 9 to Declaration of Shimamoto)(Young, Kristi)
February 10, 2020 Filing 146 APPLICATION to file document Declaration of Nolan Leatherman and designated exhibits AND Declaration of Richard K. Shimamoto and designated exhibits under seal filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF KRISTI L.K. YOUNG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANYS UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document Declaration of Nolan Leatherman, #4 Exhibit 1-2 to Declaration of Nolan Leatherman, #5 Exhibit 3-21 to Declaration of Nolan Leatherman, #6 Redacted Document Declaration of Richard K. Shimamoto, #7 Exhibit 1-9 to Declaration of Richard Shimamoto)(Young, Kristi)
February 7, 2020 Filing 145 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Trevis J Niemeyer counsel for Defendant Emerson Electric Co.. Adding Gary D. Sharp as counsel of record for Emerson Electric Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co.. (Niemeyer, Trevis)
February 4, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erika Rose Aspericueta on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attorney Erika Rose Aspericueta added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Aspericueta, Erika)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATIONS MOTION TO EXCUSE LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL #141 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Guy P. Glazier is excused from appearing andDeborah M. Parker may appear on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation at theScheduling Conference on March 16, 2020. (lc)
January 29, 2020 Filing 142 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas Michael Downey counsel for Defendant Harcosemco LLC. Adding Thomas Michael Downey as counsel of record for Harcosemco LLC (f/k/a Harco LLC and Harco Laboratories, Inc.) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Harcosemco LLC (f/k/a Harco LLC and Harco Laboratories, Inc.). (Attorney Thomas Michael Downey added to party Harcosemco LLC(pty:dft))(Downey, Thomas)
January 29, 2020 Filing 141 NOTICE of Unopposed Motion to Excuse Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing at Scheduling Conference filed by defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah M. Parker, #2 Declaration of Guy P. Glazier, #3 Proposed Order)(Parker, Deborah)
January 15, 2020 Filing 140 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs George Kruse, Shigeko Kruse. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Remand to State Court, #2 Declaration of Lisa M. Barley in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Remand to State Court, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Lisa M Barley added to party George Kruse(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa M Barley added to party Shigeko Kruse(pty:pla)) (Barley, Lisa)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION of attorney David T. Biderman in place and instead of Katherine C Elford for defendant Honeywell International Inc by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
January 15, 2020 Filing 138 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Honeywell International Miscellaneous Document #137 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request: Substitute Attorney(G-01). Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 14, 2020 Filing 137 REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elford, Katherine)
January 10, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/21/19 ( SEE DOCKET NO. 136) filed by defendant Agilent Technologies Inc.(lc) Modified on 1/13/2020 (lc).
January 10, 2020 Filing 136 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER filed by DEFENDANT Agilent Technologies Inc.. (Meyers, Lesa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 135 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Agilent Technologies Inc. (Meyers, Lesa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lesa M Meyers on behalf of Defendant Agilent Technologies Inc. (Attorney Lesa M Meyers added to party Agilent Technologies Inc.(pty:dft))(Meyers, Lesa)
January 8, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vick K Mansourian on behalf of Defendant Navcom Defense Electronics LLC (Attorney Vick K Mansourian added to party Navcom Defense Electronics LLC(pty:dft))(Mansourian, Vick)
January 8, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. Notice (Other) #131 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 7, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand filed in state court on 12/12/10 see attachment to docket no. 130 filed by defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company.(lc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, RULE 7.1 AND LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7.1-1 filed by Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Wade, Tucker)
January 7, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND POSTING OF JURY FEES filed by Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Wade, Tucker)
January 7, 2020 Filing 129 DECLARATION of LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Muench, Richard)
January 7, 2020 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tucker Worthington Wade on behalf of Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Wade, Tucker)
January 7, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tucker Worthington Wade on behalf of Defendant Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Attorney Tucker Worthington Wade added to party Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company(pty:dft))(Wade, Tucker)
January 7, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE:International Business Machines Corporation Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #125 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Amended Answer. Pdf document is an "AMENDED" answer, therefore the cited event is the appropriate event. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 125 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, AMENDED filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation.(Hartley, Edward)
January 3, 2020 Filing 124 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (cause or other), #95 filed by Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc.. (Rich, Robert)
December 27, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE OF PARTY NAME CHANGE OF DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, ET AL. filed by Defendant CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp. f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.. (Jamison, Kevin)
December 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal [ 121] and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Motorola Solutions Inc. the above captioned action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (lc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 121 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. filed by Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rich, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 120 DECLARATION OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. (Chiu, Sylvia)
December 19, 2019 CONFORMED FILED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT JURY DEMAND FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/19/19 (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 119) filed by defendant International Business Machines Corporation.(lc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Hartley, Edward)
December 19, 2019 Filing 118 DISCLOSURE of STATEMENT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. NO. 7.1 AND LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation (Hartley, Edward)
December 19, 2019 Filing 117 DECLARATION of LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNINING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Hartley, Edward)
December 19, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward E Hartley on behalf of Defendant International Business Machines Corporation (Attorney Edward E Hartley added to party International Business Machines Corporation(pty:dft))(Hartley, Edward)
December 19, 2019 Filing 115 COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, the Motion to Dismiss #95 will be heard before Judge Otis D. Wright, II on January 13, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 18, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT 11/25/19, SEE DOCKET NO. 114) filed by defendant GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, erroneously sued and served as Verizon Communications Inc. and Osram Sylvania Inc.(lc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, erroneously sued and served as Verizon Communications Inc. and Osram Sylvania Inc.. (Dutton, Holly)
December 18, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, erroneously sued and served as Verizon Communications Inc. and Osram Sylvania Inc., (Dutton, Holly)
December 18, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Holly Diane Unger Dutton on behalf of Defendant GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, erroneously sued and served as Verizon Communications Inc. and Osram Sylvania Inc. (Attorney Holly Diane Unger Dutton added to party GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, erroneously sued and served as Verizon Communications Inc. and Osram Sylvania Inc.(pty:dft))(Dutton, Holly)
December 18, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lawrence R Ramsey on behalf of Defendant GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, erroneously sued and served as Verizon Communications Inc. and Osram Sylvania Inc. (Attorney Lawrence R Ramsey added to party GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, erroneously sued and served as Verizon Communications Inc. and Osram Sylvania Inc.(pty:dft))(Ramsey, Lawrence)
December 13, 2019 Filing 110 Defendant Crane Co.'s CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Davis, Geoffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, for Personal Injury- Asbestos Demand for Jury Trial.(Attorney Geoffrey M Davis added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft))(Davis, Geoffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 108 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bo W Kim counsel for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. Adding Bo W. Kim as counsel of record for Honeywell International, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (Kim, Bo)
December 13, 2019 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc., identifying no parent company for Honeywell, and interested parties George Kruse and Shigeko Kruse. (Kim, Bo)
December 13, 2019 Filing 106 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc..(Attorney Bo W Kim added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kim, Bo)
December 13, 2019 Filing 104 COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, the Motion to Dismiss #95 set for January 13, 2010 at 1:30pm will be heard before Judge Otis D. Wright, II. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #92 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1):IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant International Enterprises Industries, LLC is hereby DISMISSED. (lc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Actuant Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #99 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #100 ,. The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Case was Reassigned 11/26/19 (docket no. 73); Correct case number to be used 2:19-cv-09540 ODW(RAOx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents Navcom Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #97 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #98 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Case was Reassigned 11/26/19 (docket no. 73); Correct case number to be used 2:19-cv-09540 ODW(RAOx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motorola's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #95 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #96 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Case was Reassigned 11/26/19 (docket no. 73); Correct case number to be used 2:19-cv-09540 ODW(RAOx); Hearing date and information set before Judge Walter instead of Judge Wright.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Actuant Corporation identifying Blackrock, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Scadden, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 99 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant Actuant Corporation.(Scadden, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Navcom Defense Electronics LLC (Pietrykowski, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 97 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant Navcom Defense Electronics LLC.(Pietrykowski, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc. identifying Blackrock, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Rich, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Richard Chon, #3 Affidavit of Paul Brzegowy, #4 Proposed Order) (Rich, Robert)
December 11, 2019 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., identifying Terra Millennium Corporation; Allianz Resolution Management; Allianz Reinsurance America, Inc.; Armour Risk Management, Inc.; and RiverStone Claims Management, LLC.. (Scott, Connor)
December 11, 2019 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc..(Scott, Connor)
December 11, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by PLAINTIFFS Shigeko Kruse, George Kruse pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to International Enterprises Industries, LLC. (Gamble, Tyson)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION AS TO AGAINST DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION ONLY #89 AND DEFENDANT FOR MOTOR CO. #90 . each party to bear its ow costs by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 90 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY)(Lannus, Paul)
December 5, 2019 Filing 89 Joint STIPULATION for Order TO DISMISS THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Third Cause of Action)(Bowlby, Stephanie)
December 5, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #84 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 4, 2019 Filing 87 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sylvia Chiu counsel for Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. Adding Sylvia Chiu as counsel of record for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Attorney Sylvia Chiu added to party J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chiu, Sylvia)
December 4, 2019 Filing 86 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher W Wood counsel for Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. Adding Christopher W. Wood as counsel of record for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher W Wood added to party J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wood, Christopher)
December 4, 2019 Filing 85 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc. answer now due 12/12/2019, filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc..(Scott, Connor)
December 4, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Connor Matthew Scott on behalf of Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc. (Attorney Connor Matthew Scott added to party J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.(pty:dft))(Scott, Connor)
December 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/20/19 (EFILED AS ONE DOCUMENT RE NOTICE, DOCKET NO. 79 ) filed by defendant Emerson Electric Co..(lc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 83 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co. (Niemeyer, Trevis)
December 3, 2019 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co., identifying Emerson Electric Co., et al.. (Niemeyer, Trevis)
December 3, 2019 Filing 81 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Trevis J Niemeyer counsel for Defendant Emerson Electric Co.. Adding Melanie L. Ameele as counsel of record for Emerson Electric Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co.. (Niemeyer, Trevis)
December 3, 2019 Filing 80 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Trevis J Niemeyer counsel for Defendant Emerson Electric Co.. Adding Trevis J. Niemeyer as counsel of record for Emerson Electric Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co.. (Attorney Trevis J Niemeyer added to party Emerson Electric Co.(pty:dft))(Niemeyer, Trevis)
December 3, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co.. (Niemeyer, Trevis)
December 2, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp. f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.. (Cronin, Justin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp. f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp., identifying National Amusements, inc.; and NAI Entertainment Holdings, LLC. (Cronin, Justin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Jamison filed by Defendant CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp. f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.. (Cronin, Justin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin F Cronin on behalf of Defendant CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp. f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp. (Attorney Justin F Cronin added to party CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp. f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.(pty:dft))(Cronin, Justin)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 3/16/20 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge John F. Walter. Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09540 ODW(RAOx). (rn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Harcosemco LLC, re Declaration #71 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #70 , Notice (Other) #69 , Notice of Appearance #68 served on November 25, 2019. (Pajala, Ulla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Ulla M. Pajala Lead Trial Counsel RE: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Harcosemco LLC. (Pajala, Ulla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Harcosemco LLC identifying TransDigm Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Pajala, Ulla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE filed by Defendant Harcosemco LLC. of Filing Prior State Court Answer to Complaint (Pajala, Ulla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ulla M Pajala on behalf of Defendant Harcosemco LLC (Attorney Ulla M Pajala added to party Harcosemco LLC(pty:dft))(Pajala, Ulla)
November 25, 2019 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Brent M. Karren ; DECLARATION OF LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. (Karren, Brent)
November 25, 2019 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Brent M. Karren ; Declaration of Lead Counsel re Compliance with Local Rules Governing E-Filing filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Karren, Brent)
November 22, 2019 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, for Personal Injury-Asbestos filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation.(Glinka, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. NOTICE OF JOINDER OF REMOVAL OF ACTION; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (Glinka, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. Glinka, #2 Exhibit A)(Glinka, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation.(Glinka, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation, identifying BlackRock, Inc.. (Glinka, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 60 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis D Pond counsel for Defendant Unisys Corporation. Adding Frank D. Pond as counsel of record for Unisys Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party Unisys Corporation(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
November 22, 2019 Filing 59 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dana L Burch counsel for Defendant Unisys Corporation. Adding Dana L. Burch as counsel of record for Unisys Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Attorney Dana L Burch added to party Unisys Corporation(pty:dft))(Burch, Dana)
November 22, 2019 Filing 58 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick J Glinka counsel for Defendant Unisys Corporation. Adding Patrick J. Glinka as counsel of record for Unisys Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Attorney Patrick J Glinka added to party Unisys Corporation(pty:dft))(Glinka, Patrick)
November 22, 2019 Filing 57 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael A Graham counsel for Defendant Unisys Corporation. Adding Michael A. Graham as counsel of record for Unisys Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Attorney Michael A Graham added to party Unisys Corporation(pty:dft))(Graham, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for January 6, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012.Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference.Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before December 23, 2019. (iv)
November 22, 2019 Filing 55 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #49 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #53 , Declaration #51 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #54 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #52 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #50 served on 11/19/2019. (Bowlby, Stephanie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 54 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephanie L Bowlby counsel for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. Adding RYAN S. LANDIS as counsel of record for Union Carbide Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Bowlby, Stephanie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephanie L Bowlby counsel for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. Adding STEPHEN M. NICHOLS as counsel of record for Union Carbide Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Bowlby, Stephanie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephanie L Bowlby counsel for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. Adding STEPHANIE L. BOWLBY as counsel of record for Union Carbide Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Bowlby, Stephanie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Stephen M. Nichols RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Bowlby, Stephanie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, identifying The Dow Chemical Company. (Bowlby, Stephanie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, FOR PERSONAL INJURY filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation.(Attorney Stephanie L Bowlby added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft))(Bowlby, Stephanie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation.(Attorney Justin E Garratt added to party AVCO Corporation(pty:dft))(Garratt, Justin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation identifying Textron Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Garratt, Justin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 46 JOINDER filed by Defendant AVCO Corporation joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Garratt, Justin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant BAE Systems, Inc. (Watson, Alan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant BAE Systems, Inc..(Attorney Alan J Watson added to party BAE Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Watson, Alan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 43 Defendant Kearfott Corporation's CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kearfott Corporation, identifying Kearfott Corporation. (Weiss, Eric)
November 22, 2019 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Eric P. Weiss as Lead Counsel re Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Kearfott Corporation. (Weiss, Eric)
November 22, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric P Weiss counsel for Defendant Kearfott Corporation. Mary C. Trinh is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kearfott Corporation. (Weiss, Eric)
November 22, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by DEFENDANT Kearfott Corporation.(Weiss, Eric)
November 21, 2019 CONFORMED FILED STAMPED COPY OF ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/5/19 SEE DOCKET NO, 31-1 filed by defendant ITT Inc.(lc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 39 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ford Motor Company answer now due 12/5/2019, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Attorney Paul Lannus added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Lannus, Paul)
November 21, 2019 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendant ITT Inc.. Adding Amy J. Talarico as counsel of record for ITT LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ITT LLC. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party ITT Inc.(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendant ITT Inc.. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for ITT LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ITT LLC. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party ITT Inc.(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
November 21, 2019 Filing 36 JOINDER filed by Defendant General Dynamics Corporation joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Bessette, Paul)
November 21, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc..(Attorney Justin E Garratt added to party Rockwell Collins, Inc.(pty:dft))(Garratt, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. identifying United Technologies Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Garratt, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ITT Inc. identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
November 21, 2019 Filing 32 JOINDER filed by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Garratt, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant ITT Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
November 21, 2019 Filing 30 JOINDER filed by Defendant Crane Co. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Davis, Geoffrey)
November 21, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant General Dynamics Corporation.(Bessette, Paul)
November 21, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul M Bessette counsel for Defendant General Dynamics Corporation. Adding P.M. Bessette as counsel of record for General Dynamics Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant General Dynamics Corporation. (Attorney Paul M Bessette added to party General Dynamics Corporation(pty:dft))(Bessette, Paul)
November 21, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant General Dynamics Corporation identifying General Dynamics Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Bessette, Paul)
November 21, 2019 Filing 26 JOINDER filed by Defendant General Dynamics Corporation joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Bessette, Paul)
November 21, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean Christopher McGah counsel for Defendant L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. Adding Sean C. McGah as counsel of record for L3 Harris Technologies, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant L3 Harris Technologies, Inc.. (Attorney Sean Christopher McGah added to party L3Harris Technologies, Inc. (pty:dft))(McGah, Sean)
November 21, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant L3Harris Technologies, Inc. identifying L3 Harris Technologies as Corporate Parent. (Karren, Brent)
November 21, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brent Marshall Karren counsel for Defendant L3Harris Technologies, Inc.. Adding Brent M. Karren as counsel of record for L3 Harris Technologies, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant L3 Harris Technologies, Inc.. (Karren, Brent)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant L3Harris Technologies, Inc..(Attorney Brent Marshall Karren added to party L3Harris Technologies, Inc. (pty:dft))(Karren, Brent)
November 21, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Parker, Deborah)
November 20, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Navcom Defense Electronics LLC answer now due 12/12/2019, filed by Defendant Navcom Defense Electronics LLC.(Attorney Michael J Pietrykowski added to party Navcom Defense Electronics LLC(pty:dft))(Pietrykowski, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Actuant Corporation answer now due 12/12/2019, filed by Defendant Actuant Corporation.(Attorney James G Scadden added to party Actuant Corporation(pty:dft))(Scadden, James)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #13 , Notice of Appearance #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Motorola Solutions, Inc. answer now due 12/12/2019, filed by Defendant Motorola Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Robert A Rich added to party Motorola Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rich, Robert)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristi Leigh Kasey Young on behalf of Defendant The Boeing Company (Attorney Kristi Leigh Kasey Young added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft))(Young, Kristi)
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant The Boeing Company (Karren, Brent)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Defendant The Boeing Company.(Karren, Brent)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brent Marshall Karren on behalf of Defendant The Boeing Company (Attorney Brent Marshall Karren added to party The Boeing Company(pty:dft))(Karren, Brent)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. Notice of Joinder to Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joinder to Removal, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1/2 to Joinder to Removal, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2/2 to Joinder to Removal)(Karren, Brent)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Honeywell International, Inc. answer now due 12/13/2019, filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc..(Attorney Katherine C Elford added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Elford, Katherine)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Guy P. Glazier LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL RE: COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES GOVERNING ELECTRONIC FILING filed by Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Glazier, Guy)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter.READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kearfott Corporation answer now due 11/15/2019, filed by defendant Kearfott Corporation.(Attorney Eric P Weiss added to party Kearfott Corporation(pty:dft))(Weiss, Eric)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09540 JFW(RAOx). (rn)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09540 RSWL(RAOx). (rn)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
November 6, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants AVCO Corporation, Actuant Corporation, Agilent Technologies Inc., BAE Systems, Inc., Crane Co., Does, Emerson Electric Co., Ford Motor Company, General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Company, Harcosemco LLC, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, Honeywell International, Inc., ITT Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, International Enterprises Industries, LLC, International Enterprises, Inc., J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Kearfott Corporation, L3Harris Technologies, Inc., Lockheed Martin Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Motorola Solutions, Inc., Navcom Defense Electronics LLC, OSRAM Sylvania Inc., Rockwell Collins, Inc., The Boeing Company, Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Unisys Corporation, Verizon Communication Inc. Filed by Plaintiffs Shigeko Kruse, George Kruse. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/17/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION d/b/a LOCKHEED MARTIN AERONAUTICS (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to MARTIN MARIETTA) (Glazier, Guy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION d/b/a LOCKHEED MARTIN AERONAUTICS (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to MARTIN MARIETTA). (Glazier, Guy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV37030 Receipt No: 0973-24737225 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION d/b/a LOCKHEED MARTIN AERONAUTICS (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to MARTIN MARIETTA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 State Court Docket) (Attorney Guy P Glazier added to party LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION d/b/a LOCKHEED MARTIN AERONAUTICS (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to MARTIN MARIETTA)(pty:dft))(Glazier, Guy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Kruse et al v. Actuant Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to GTE SYLVANIA successor-in-interest to PHILCO-FORD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARCOSEMCO LLC (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to HARCO LLC f/k/a HARCO LABORATORIES, INCORPORATED)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION d/b/a LOCKHEED MARTIN AERONAUTICS (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to MARTIN MARIETTA)
Represented By: Guy P Glazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVCOM DEFENSE ELECTRONICES LLC f/k/a NAVCOM DEFENSE ELECTRONICS INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to HOFFMAN ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL COLLINS, INC. a subsidiary of UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION; UNISYS CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to SPERRY CORPORATION f/k/a SPERRY RAND, SPERRY VICKERS and SPERRY FLIGHT SYSTEMS DIVISIONS, and as succes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to PHILCO CORPORATION a/k/a PHILCO-FORD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTUANT CORPORATION a/k/a ENERPAC TOOL GROUP for its Stewart Warner brand of products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BENDIX AVIATION CORPORATION successor-in-interest to BENDIX RADIO CORPORATION, and as successor-in-interest to SPERRY F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEARFOTT CORPORATION, a wholly-owned subsidiary of ASTRONAUTICS CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL ENTERPRISES INDUSTRIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE SYSTEMS INC, and its BAE SYSTEMS SENSOR SYSTEMS GROUP (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to HAZELTINE CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE COMPANY f/k/a THE HEWLETT PACKARD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO CORPORATION, subsidiary of TEXTRON INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to CROSLEY CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to RCA CORPORATION for its former subsidiary, GEC-MARCONI HAZELTINE as successor-in-interest to HAZELTINE CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to HAZELTINE CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT INC. f/k/a ITT CORPORATION f/k/a ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC, formerly doing business as THE HEWLETT PACKARD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON COMUNICATIONS INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to GTE CORPORTION successor-in-interest to PHICO-FORD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erika Rose Aspericueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to THE CONSOLIDATED VULTEE AIRCRAFT CORPORATION a/k/a CONVAIR and as successor-in-interest to STROMBERG CARLSON)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION a/k/a IBM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L3HARRIS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to HARRIS CORPORATION)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to McDONNELL DOUGLAS successor-by-merger to DOUGLAS AIRCRAFT and as successor-in-interest to ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. f/k/a NORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actuant Corporation
Represented By: James G Scadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Edward E Hartley
Represented By: Barry N Endick
Represented By: Robert M Hamblett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Kristi Leigh Kasey Young
Represented By: Brent Marshall Karren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Guy P Glazier
Represented By: Deborah Maria Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSRAM Sylvania Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W Wood
Represented By: Sylvia Chiu
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harcosemco LLC
Represented By: Ulla M Pajala
Represented By: Thomas Michael Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-450 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Paul Lannus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM
Represented By: Edward E Hartley
Represented By: Barry N Endick
Represented By: Robert M Hamblett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp., a Pennsylvania Corp. f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Represented By: Justin F Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.
Represented By: Trevis J Niemeyer
Represented By: Melanie L Ameele
Represented By: Elizabeth J Carpenter
Represented By: Gary D Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Alan J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enerpac Tool Group
Represented By: James G Scadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communication Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Represented By: Bo W Kim
Represented By: David T Biderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unisys Corporation
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Represented By: Patrick J Glinka
Represented By: Zorik Haruthunian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L3Harris Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Brent Marshall Karren
Represented By: Sean Christopher McGah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, erroneously sued and served as Verizon Communications Inc. and Osram Sylvania Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence R Ramsey
Represented By: Holly Diane Unger Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO Corporation
Represented By: Justin E Garratt
Represented By: Ian G Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navcom Defense Electronics LLC
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Represented By: Vick K Mansourian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agilent Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kearfott Corporation
Represented By: Eric P Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Represented By: Stephanie L Bowlby
Represented By: Ryan S Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Represented By: Justin E Garratt
Represented By: Lance D Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Amber Lee Kelly
Represented By: Paul M Bessette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Martin Marietta) doing business as Lockheed Martin Aeronautics
Represented By: Guy P Glazier
Represented By: Deborah Maria Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agilent Technologies Inc. formerly doing business as The Hewlett Packard Company
Represented By: Florence A McClain
Represented By: Lesa M Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company formerly doing business as The Hewlett Packard Company
Represented By: Tucker Worthington Wade
Represented By: Jennifer M Porche
Represented By: Richard A Muench, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navcom Defense Electronics Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Represented By: Vick K Mansourian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom. Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Represented By: Justin F Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Represented By: Justin F Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Kruse
Represented By: Stuart J Purdy
Represented By: Conor R Nideffer
Represented By: Lisa M Barley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shigeko Kruse
Represented By: Stuart J Purdy
Represented By: Conor R Nideffer
Represented By: Lisa M Barley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?