Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc. v. Los Toros Restaurants, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.
Defendant: Los Toros Restaurants, LLC, Juan Olivarez Alvarez, Evaristo Figueroa and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09546
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than January 9, 2020 why this action shouldnot be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date:Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendants- Juan Olivarez Alvarez and Evaristo Figueroa. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence.Answer by the defendant(s). The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
January 2, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc., upon Defendant Evaristo Figueroa served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Evaristo Figueroa in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dickinson, Glenn)
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc., upon Defendant Juan Olivarez Alvarez served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Juan Olivarez Alvarez in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dickinson, Glenn)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Glenn J. Dickinson First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Los Toros Restaurants, LLC #13 in Response to Court's OSC re Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.. (Dickinson, Glenn)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Los Toros Restaurants, LLC (lc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Glenn J. Dickinson in Support of First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Los Toros Restaurants, LLC #13 filed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.. (Dickinson, Glenn)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Los Toros Restaurants, LLC filed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.. (Dickinson, Glenn)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than December 9, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date:Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendant- Los Toros Restaurants, LLC. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. Answer by the defendant(s). The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc., upon Defendant Los Toros Restaurants, LLC served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon George Cruz /-Manager and Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dickinson, Glenn)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions on Mondays, Criminal at 10:00 a.m. and Civil at 1:30 p.m. See order for details. (shb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Juan Olivarez Alvarez, Evaristo Figueroa, Los Toros Restaurants, LLC. (car)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.. (Dickinson, Glenn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.. (Dickinson, Glenn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc., (Dickinson, Glenn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.. (Dickinson, Glenn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.. (Dickinson, Glenn)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24738639 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.. (Attorney Glenn J Dickinson added to party Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.(pty:pla))(Dickinson, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc. v. Los Toros Restaurants, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Toros Restaurants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Olivarez Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evaristo Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Toros Mexican Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn J Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?