B.B.C. Rooter & Plumbing, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: B.B.C. Rooter & Plumbing, Inc.
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Does 1 through 15 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09547
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT SO THAT PLAINTIFF HAS ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE ANAMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Pursuant to the Parties' stipulation, and good cause appearing, the Court orders that Plaintiff may have up to and including December 31, 2019 within which to file an Amended Complaint, and the deadline for the filing of a response to Plaintiffs Complaint or Amended Complaint is extended to January 21, 2020. (bm)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 21, 2020 filed by defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time So That Plaintiff Has Additional Time to File an Amended Complaint)(Sullivan, Susan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk - Central District filed by plaintiff B.B.C. Rooter & Plumbing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Remand) (Mnatzaganian, Ivan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. answer now due 12/11/2019, filed by defendant Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc..(Sullivan, Susan)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89), #8 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #7 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Complaint - (Discovery) e-mailed to Veena Mitchell bounced due to 5.1.2 - Bad destination host. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09547 PSG(RAOx). (rn)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. answer now due 11/27/2019, filed by defendant Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc..(Sullivan, Susan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa)
November 6, 2019 COPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff B.B.C. Rooter & Plumbing, Inc., upon Defendant Liberty Insurance Company Inc. served on 10/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent of Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p.2) (esa)
November 6, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., filed by plaintiff B.B.C. Rooter & Plumbing, Inc. (filed in state court 10/4/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 4) (esa)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 served on November 6, 2019. (Sullivan, Susan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, identifying Ohio Security Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Liberty Mutual Group Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc.; and Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc.. (Sullivan, Susan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Sullivan, Susan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV35605 Receipt No: 0973-24738760 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Susan Koehler Sullivan added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.B.C. Rooter & Plumbing, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.B.C. Rooter & Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Ivan Mnatzaganian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan Koehler Sullivan
Represented By: Veena A Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 15 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?