Cynthia Rosenthal v. Wizard Moving and Storage
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA ROSENTHAL
Defendant: WIZARD MOVING AND STORAGE dba OZ MOVING & STORAGE and Wizard Moving and Storage
Case Number: 2:2019cv09636
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Wizard Moving and Storage. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Baucher, Carson)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wizard Moving and Storage, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Baucher, Carson)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
November 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS COURT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Wizard Moving and Storage amending Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Rosenthal. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/19/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 7 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 9 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
November 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS COURT COMPLAINT against Defendant Wizard Moving and Storage, filed by Plaintiff Cynthia Rosenthal. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/26/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant WIZARD MOVING AND STORAGE dba OZ MOVING & STORAGE. (Baucher, Carson)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego Superior Court, case number 19SMSC01925 Receipt No: 0973-24755626 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant WIZARD MOVING AND STORAGE dba OZ MOVING & STORAGE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Appendix, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Proof of Service) (Attorney Carson P Baucher added to party WIZARD MOVING AND STORAGE dba OZ MOVING & STORAGE(pty:dft))(Baucher, Carson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cynthia Rosenthal v. Wizard Moving and Storage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA ROSENTHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIZARD MOVING AND STORAGE dba OZ MOVING & STORAGE
Represented By: Carson P Baucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wizard Moving and Storage
Represented By: Carson P Baucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?