Lisa Corson v. Designguide, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 and DESIGNGUIDE, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv09646
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal) (shb)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than December 27, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Answer by the defendant(s) or plaintiff's request for entry of default. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, no oralargument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (shb)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address ishttp://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, upon Defendant Designguide, LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cogency Global Inc. c/o Julia Quindara - Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09646 DDP(GJSx). (rn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Designguide, LLC. (et)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, (Doniger, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24757524 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Lisa Corson(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Corson v. Designguide, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESIGNGUIDE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Frank Gregory Casella
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?