Tigran Manucharyan v. AMICA Mutual Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Tigran Manucharyan
Defendant: AMICA Mutual Insurance Company and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv09668
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DE #9 ) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the Court grants Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case #9 , calendared for hearing on December 23, 2019, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 The November 18, 2019 Order to Show Cause #7 , is hereby discharged. Text Only Entry THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant AMICA Mutual Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/23/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tamaddon, Ray)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Maritess Tuazon re Order to Show Cause, #7 re Service of Complaint filed by Defendant AMICA Mutual Insurance Company. (Tamaddon, Ray)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order to Show Cause re: Notice of Removal by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant is hereby order to show cause in writing by Friday November 22, 2019 as to why this case should not be remanded for failure to follow the requirements for removal. (et)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
November 11, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants AMICA Mutual Insurance Company, Does, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Tigran Manucharyan. (filed in state court 3/15/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 8) (esa)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AMICA Mutual Insurance Company, identifying Plaintiff Tigran Manucharyan and Defendant Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Tamaddon, Ray)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AMICA Mutual Insurance Company. (Tamaddon, Ray)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV08902 Receipt No: 0973-24759854 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant AMICA Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Ray Tamaddon added to party AMICA Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Tamaddon, Ray)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tigran Manucharyan v. AMICA Mutual Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tigran Manucharyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMICA Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Ray Tamaddon
Represented By: Robert J Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?