Mercedes Rosenberg et al v. Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Olga Von Hoyer, Andre Von Hoyer, Bennet G. Feldman and Mercedes Rosenberg
Defendant: Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09691
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for May 4, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/27/2020. (sw)
January 7, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Viking River Cruises, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Maldonado, #2 Exhibit A to Maldonado Decl - 2013 Passenger Ticket ContractEx. A 2013 Passenger Ticket Contract, #3 Exhibit B to Maldonado Decl - 2015 Passenger Ticket Contract, #4 Exhibit C to Maldonado Decl - 2016 Passenger Ticket Contract, #5 Exhibit D to Maldonado Decl - 2017 Passenger Ticket Contract, #6 Exhibit E to Maldonado Decl - 2018 Passenger Ticket Contract, #7 Exhibit F to Maldonado Decl - 2019 Passenger Ticket Contract, #8 Exhibit G to Maldonado Decl - Rosenberg Shipping Notification, #9 Exhibit H to Maldonado Decl - Von Hoyer Shipping Notification for 2017.5.26 cruise, #10 Exhibit I to Maldonado Decl - Von Hoyer Shipping Notification for 2018.3.30 cruise, #11 Exhibit J to Maldonado Decl - Email With Final E-Documents for Von Hoyer 2019.7.01, #12 Exhibit K to Maldonado Decl - 2013 Booking Contract, #13 Exhibit L to Maldonado Decl - 2018-19 Booking Contract, #14 Declaration of Alyssa E. Musante, #15 Exhibit 1 to Musante Decl - Dictionary Definition of Crew, #16 Exhibit 2 to Musante Decl - CD Cal Judicial Caseload Profile, #17 Proposed Order) (Etcheverry, Lance)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 , for the following reasons: Single-spaced text at pages 3 and 4 of the memorandum. (jp)
January 3, 2020 Filing 30 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 1/7/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #31 ] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Viking River Cruises, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Maldonado, #2 Exhibit A to Maldonado Decl. - 2013 Passenger Ticket Contract, #3 Exhibit B to Maldonado Decl. - 2015 Passenger Ticket Contract, #4 Exhibit C to Maldonado Decl. - 2016 Passenger Ticket Contract, #5 Exhibit D to Maldonado Decl. - 2017 Passenger Ticket Contract, #6 Exhibit E to Maldonado Decl. - 2018 Passenger Ticket Contract, #7 Exhibit F to Maldonado Decl. - 2019 Passenger Ticket Contract, #8 Exhibit G to Maldonado Decl. - Rosenberg Shipping Notification, #9 Exhibit H to Maldonado Decl. - Von Hoyer Shipping Notification for 2017.5.26 cruise, #10 Exhibit I to Maldonado Decl. - Von Hoyer Shipping Notification for 2018.3.30 cruise, #11 Exhibit J to Maldonado Decl. - Email With Final E-Documents for Von Hoyer 2019.7.01, #12 Exhibit K to Maldonado Decl. - 2013 Booking Contract, #13 Exhibit L to Maldonado Decl. - 2018-19 Booking Contract, #14 Declaration of Alyssa E. Musante, #15 Exhibit 1 to Musante Decl. - Dictionary Definition of Crew, #16 Exhibit 2 to Musante Decl. - CD Cal Judicial Caseload Profile, #17 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Etcheverry, Lance) Modified on 1/7/2020 (jp).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Jacob L Phillips APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mercedes Rosenberg,Bennet G. Feldman, Andre Von Hoyer and Olga Von Hoyer, designating Ray E Gallo as local counsel. (et)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Edmund A Normand APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mercedes Rosenberg,Bennet G. Feldman, Andre Von Hoyer and Olga Von Hoyer, designating Ray E Gallo as local counsel. (et)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney David M Shenkman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mercedes Rosenberg,Bennet G. Feldman, Andre Von Hoyer and Olga Von Hoyer, designating Ray E Gallo as local counsel. (et)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher J Lynch APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Mercedes Rosenberg,Bennet G. Feldman, Andre Von Hoyer and Olga Von Hoyer, designating Ray E Gallo as local counsel. (et)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
December 4, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alyssa E Musante counsel for Defendant Viking River Cruises, Inc.. Adding Alyssa E. Musante as counsel of record for Viking River Cruises, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Viking River Cruises, Inc.. (Attorney Alyssa E Musante added to party Viking River Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Musante, Alyssa)
December 4, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Viking River Cruises, Inc. answer now due 1/3/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Viking River Cruises, Inc..(Attorney Lance A Etcheverry added to party Viking River Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Etcheverry, Lance)
December 4, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Viking River Cruises, Inc., (Attorney Kevin James Minnick added to party Viking River Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Minnick, Kevin)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-9691 RGK (ASx). (esa)
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Shenkman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24818563) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher J. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24818445) #15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jacob L. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24818677) #18 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edmund A. Normand to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24818625) #17 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Shenkman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24818563) #16 served on 11/20/2019. (Gallo, Ray)
November 20, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jacob L. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24818677) filed by Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gallo, Ray)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edmund A. Normand to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24818625) filed by Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gallo, Ray)
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Shenkman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24818563) filed by Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gallo, Ray)
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher J. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24818445) filed by Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gallo, Ray)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of address by Ray E Gallo attorney for Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer. Changing attorneys address to 5901 W. Century Blvd., Suite 750, Los Angeles, CA 90045. Filed by Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer. (Gallo, Ray)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Olga Von Hoyer, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Bennet G. Feldman, upon Defendant Viking River Cruises, Inc. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, registered agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gallo, Ray)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09691 CAS(ASx). (rn)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David M Shenkman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jacob L Phillips. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edmund A Normand. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher J Lynch. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Viking River Cruises, Inc. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Ray E. Gallo re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Plaintiffs' Affidavit Regarding Venue for Consumers Legal Remedies Act Claim Pursuant to California Civil Code 1780(d) filed by Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer (Gallo, Ray)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer, (Gallo, Ray)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer. (Gallo, Ray)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Bennet G. Feldman, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Olga Von Hoyer. (Gallo, Ray)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24764582 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Olga Von Hoyer, Mercedes Rosenberg, Andre Von Hoyer, Bennet G. Feldman. (Attorney Ray E Gallo added to party Bennet G. Feldman(pty:pla), Attorney Ray E Gallo added to party Mercedes Rosenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Ray E Gallo added to party Andre Von Hoyer(pty:pla), Attorney Ray E Gallo added to party Olga Von Hoyer(pty:pla))(Gallo, Ray)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercedes Rosenberg et al v. Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Von Hoyer
Represented By: Ray E Gallo
Represented By: Edmund A Normand
Represented By: Jacob L Phillips
Represented By: David M Shenkman
Represented By: Christopher J Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Von Hoyer
Represented By: Ray E Gallo
Represented By: Edmund A Normand
Represented By: Jacob L Phillips
Represented By: David M Shenkman
Represented By: Christopher J Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennet G. Feldman
Represented By: Ray E Gallo
Represented By: Edmund A Normand
Represented By: Jacob L Phillips
Represented By: David M Shenkman
Represented By: Christopher J Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Rosenberg
Represented By: Ray E Gallo
Represented By: Edmund A Normand
Represented By: Jacob L Phillips
Represented By: David M Shenkman
Represented By: Christopher J Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa E Musante
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Kevin James Minnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?