Paul F. McCaul et al v. Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul F McCaul, Theresa A McCaul, Theresa A. McCaul and Paul F. McCaul
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv09716
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Avana A. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25061207) filed by Defendant Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrow, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scarlett M. Rajbanshi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25061075) filed by Defendant Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrow, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiffs Paul F. McCaul, Theresa A. McCaul re: Report #12 (Witkin, Gene)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiffs Paul F. McCaul, Theresa A. McCaul. (Witkin, Gene)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Demand for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Paul F. McCaul. (Witkin, Gene)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Witkin, Gene)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gene M Witkin counsel for Plaintiffs Paul F. McCaul, Theresa A. McCaul. Melissa R. Magee is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Paul McCaul. (Attorney Gene M Witkin added to party Paul F. McCaul(pty:pla), Attorney Gene M Witkin added to party Theresa A. McCaul(pty:pla))(Witkin, Gene)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on January 9, 2020. (gga)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc..(White, Paul)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., served on November 14, 2019. (White, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (ghap)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Notice of Removal, 2 Notice of Interested Parties are attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Paul F. McCaul, Theresa A. McCaul. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/7/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, case number 19TRCV00895 Receipt No: 0973-24769039 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney Paul S White added to party Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.(pty:dft))(White, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul F. McCaul et al v. Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul F McCaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A McCaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A. McCaul
Represented By: Melissa R Magee
Represented By: Gene M Witkin
Represented By: Timothy S Menter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul F. McCaul
Represented By: Melissa R Magee
Represented By: Gene M Witkin
Represented By: Timothy S Menter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Paul S White
Represented By: Avana A Anderson
Represented By: Scarlett M Rajbanshi
Represented By: David M Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?