Michael Rhambo v. Nghia Tang et al
Plaintiff: Michael Rhambo
Defendant: Nghia Tang and Stravroula Angelopoulos
Case Number: 2:2019cv09737
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 Text Only Entry: The Order to Show Cause #10 , is hereby discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Michael Rhamboto Order to Show Cause, #10 re Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than November 25, 2019. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (et)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Stravroula Angelopoulos, Nghia Tang. (esa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff MICHAEL RHAMBO, (Kim, Jason)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff MICHAEL RHAMBO, (Kim, Jason)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MICHAEL RHAMBO. (Kim, Jason)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff MICHAEL RHAMBO. (Kim, Jason)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24774257 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff MICHAEL RHAMBO. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party MICHAEL RHAMBO(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Rhambo v. Nghia Tang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nghia Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stravroula Angelopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rhambo
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?