Luke Werkhoven et al v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Corby and Luke Werkhoven
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Corporation, DOES 1-30,, DOES 1-30 and Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09742
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) - by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) AND 12(B)(7) #9 previously scheduled for 01/16/2020 to 2/3/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS-TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU by Judge George H. Wu.This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE GEORGE H. WU, United States District Judge. The magistrate judges initials remain the same. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) AND 12(b)(7) #9 , filed on November 20, 2019, and set for December 23, 2019, is continued to January 16, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. (et)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details). (et)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09742 GW (FFMx). (esa)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ELECTROLUX MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) #9 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biernat, Rebecca)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(7) filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rebecca M. Biernat in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Rebecca M. Biernat) (Biernat, Rebecca)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John F. Walter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:19-cv-04250 JFW(FFMx) (rn)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE TO SUPERIOR COURT CLERK AND PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441(B) filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Biernat, Rebecca)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jtil)
November 13, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Luke Werkhoven and Tiffany Corby in Santa Barbara Superior Court on 3/20/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Corporation, identifying Electrolux North America, Inc.; Electrolux Holdings, Inc.; AB Electrolux. (Biernat, Rebecca)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Corporation. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-04250 (Biernat, Rebecca)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Corporation. (Biernat, Rebecca)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 19CV01472 Receipt No: 0973-24775181 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Attorney Rebecca Marie Biernat added to party Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Corporation(pty:dft))(Biernat, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luke Werkhoven et al v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Corby
Represented By: James L Hudgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Werkhoven
Represented By: James L Hudgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Biernat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-30,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Biernat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?