Carrie Forbes Inc. v. Jeffrey Campbell LLC et al
Plaintiff: CARRIE FORBES INC., a California Corporation and Carrie Forbes Inc.
Defendant: JEFFREY CAMPBELL LLC, ABC INTERNET INC. d/b/a JEFFREY CAMPBELL and ABC Internet Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09751
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. ( Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (et)
January 8, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and, COUNTERCLAIM against Carrie Forbes Inc. filed by Defendants ABC Internet Inc., Jeffrey Campbell LLC.(Nielsen, Mark)
December 4, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carrie Forbes Inc., upon Defendant ABC Internet Inc. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cristina Rodriguez, person in charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Chang, Cyndie)
December 4, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carrie Forbes Inc., upon Defendant Jeffrey Campbell LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cristina Rodriguez, person in charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Chang, Cyndie)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09751 PA (JPRx). (mrgo)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ABC Internet Inc., Jeffrey Campbell LLC, identifying Carrie Forbes, Inc.; Jeffrey Campbell, LLC; and ABC Internet Inc. d/b/a Jeffrey Campbell. (Nielsen, Mark)
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ABC Internet Inc. answer now due 1/8/2020; Jeffrey Campbell LLC answer now due 1/8/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants ABC Internet Inc.; Jeffrey Campbell LLC.(Attorney Mark D Nielsen added to party ABC Internet Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D Nielsen added to party Jeffrey Campbell LLC(pty:dft))(Nielsen, Mark)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Carrie Forbes Inc.. (Chang, Cyndie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Jeffrey Campbell LLC. (lc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant ABC Internet Inc. (lc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #10 filed by Plaintiff Carrie Forbes Inc.. (Chang, Cyndie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #10 filed by Plaintiff Carrie Forbes Inc.. (Chang, Cyndie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff CARRIE FORBES INC., a California Corporation. (Chang, Cyndie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff CARRIE FORBES INC., a California Corporation. (Chang, Cyndie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff CARRIE FORBES INC., a California Corporation (Chang, Cyndie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff CARRIE FORBES INC., a California Corporation, (Chang, Cyndie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CARRIE FORBES INC., a California Corporation. (Chang, Cyndie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24777691 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff CARRIE FORBES INC., a California Corporation. (Attorney Cyndie M Chang added to party CARRIE FORBES INC., a California Corporation(pty:pla))(Chang, Cyndie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrie Forbes Inc. v. Jeffrey Campbell LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY CAMPBELL LLC
Represented By: Mark D Nielsen
Represented By: Daniel Miles Cislo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC INTERNET INC. d/b/a JEFFREY CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Internet Inc.
Represented By: Mark D Nielsen
Represented By: Daniel Miles Cislo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIE FORBES INC., a California Corporation
Represented By: Cyndie M Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Forbes Inc.
Represented By: Cyndie M Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?