In Re: Shirley Foose McClure
Appellee: John Reitman and Barrett Litt
Appellant: Shirley Foose McClure
Case Number: 2:2019cv09760
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John F Walter
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:14-cv-07640 GW. Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09760 GW. Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellee John Reitman. Appellee's Certification of Interested Parties and Notice of Related cases under C.D. Cal. Rule 2.1 (8012) Re: Notice of Appeal [Bankr. Doc. No. 1706] of Bankruptcy Court Order [Bankr. Doc. No. 1689] Related Case(s): 2:14-cv-07640-GW; 2:15-cv-02745-GW; 2:15-cv-08324-GW; 2:16-cv-02836-GW; 2:17-cv-05460-GW; 2:17-cv-05462-GW; 2:18-cv-00698-GW; 2:19-cv-02810-GW; 2:19-cv-07780-GW (Dalberg, Jon)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge John F. Walter. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (lh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 11/07/2019. (lh)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order Sustaining Objections to First and Second Amended Schedule C (Doc. #1677, 1720) entered on 10/24/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Geraldine Mund, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 10/25/2019. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1:13-bk-10386-GM, Adversary number: None, BAP case number: CC-19-1273. Filed by Appellant Shirley Foose McClure. (Attachments: #1 BAP Docket) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Shirley Foose McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Reitman
Represented By: Jon Lincoln Dalberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barrett Litt
Represented By: George E Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Shirley Foose McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?