Ziad El-Rifai v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Ziad El-Rifai
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv09773
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline To File Motion To Dismiss The Initial Complaint And To Set A Briefing Schedule On A Motion To Dismiss The First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Padgett, Cody)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #24 , #26 Non-Resident Attorney Derek A Linkous APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company, designating Justin H Sanders as local counsel. (jp)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #23 , #27 Non-Resident Attorney Stephanie A Douglas APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company, designating Justin H Sanders as local counsel. (jp)
December 20, 2019 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephanie A. Douglas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 12/18/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24967143) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, Justin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 12/18/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24967238) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, Justin)
December 18, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephanie A. Douglas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24967143) #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Derek J. Linkous to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24967238) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Caption incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing. Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
December 17, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Derek J. Linkous to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24967238) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, Justin)
December 17, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephanie A. Douglas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24967143) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, Justin)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Steven G. Calamusa APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ziad El-Rifai, designating Tarek H Zohdy as local counsel. (lom)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #16 #18 Non-Resident Attorney Joshua R Levine APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ziad El-Rifai, designating Tarek H Zohdy as local counsel. (lom)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #15 #17 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M Ostrow APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ziad El-Rifai, designating Ryan Stewart as local counsel. (lom)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven G. Calamusa to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24909630) filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zohdy, Tarek)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua R. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 12/5/2019, Receipt No. 26LVMIP1) filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zohdy, Tarek)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M. Ostrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 12/5/2019, Receipt No. 26LVJN0M) filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zohdy, Tarek)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua R. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24900055) filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zohdy, Tarek)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey M. Ostrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24898521) filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zohdy, Tarek)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ford Motor Company answer now due 1/10/2020, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Attorney Justin H Sanders added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Sanders, Justin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai, upon Defendant Ford Motor Company served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Weinmann, Steven)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-08773 JAK(Ex). (rn)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ford Motor Company. (ghap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeff Ostrow. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joshua Levine. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven G Calamusa. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai, (Weinmann, Steven)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai. (Weinmann, Steven)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai. (Weinmann, Steven)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24783785 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ziad El-Rifai. (Attorney Steven R Weinmann added to party Ziad El-Rifai (pty:pla))(Weinmann, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziad El-Rifai v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Justin H Sanders
Represented By: Stephanie A Douglas
Represented By: Derek J Linkous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ziad El-Rifai
Represented By: Steven R Weinmann
Represented By: Tarek H Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R Padgett
Represented By: Jeffrey M Ostrow
Represented By: Steven G Calamusa
Represented By: Joshua R Levine
Represented By: Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?