Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. v. Reference Watch LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Courtney Ormond, Reference Watch LLC d/b/a/ La Californienne, Leszek Garwacki, Reference Watch LLC and Reference Watch LLC doing business as La Californienne
Case Number: 2:2019cv09796
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 35 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Stipulated Dismissal) (jp)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendants Courtney Ormond and Leszek Garwacki Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) #32 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.'s claims against Defendants Courtney Ormond and Leszek Garwacki are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs in this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
May 28, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATED JUDGMENT BY CONSENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge R. Gary Klausner. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, AS FOLLOWS: Final judgment is entered in favor of Rolex and against Defendant. Upon the entry of this Judgment, Defendant and its officers, agents, servants, employees, and those persons acting in concert or participation with Defendant shall be permanently enjoined. Each party shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs. (SEE JUDGMENT BY CONSENT FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
May 27, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Order for 1) Entry of Judgment and Permanent Injunction as to Defendant Reference Watch d/b/a/ La Californienne; and 2) Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Courtney Ormond and Leszek Garwacki filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Consent Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Dismissal Order)(Bellinger, Matthew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DENIES BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulated Judgment by Consent and Permanent Injunction #30 . DENIED without prejudice. The proposed judgment resolves only a portion of the parties or claims. (jp)
May 21, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Judgment as to Defendant Reference Watch LLC d/b/a La Californienne filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(Bellinger, Matthew)
May 21, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Correction of Docket Text re ECF No. 28 filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Bellinger, Matthew)
May 21, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Judgment as to Defendants Courtney Ormond and Leszek Garwacki filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment and Permanent Injunction)(Bellinger, Matthew)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court sets the following dates: Court Trial (Est. 4-5 days): 2/23/2021, at 9:00AM. Pretrial Conference: 2/8/2021 at 9:00 AM. Motion Cut-Off Date (last day to file): 12/8/2020. Discovery Cut-Off Date: 11/24/2020. Last day to amend the complaint or add parties is 7/21/2020. The parties have selected ADR. 3. (et)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than December 25, 2020. (sw)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 9:00 am; Jury Trial set for 2/23/2021 at 9:00 am. See Order for details. (sw)
May 18, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Selection of Trial Date filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Bellinger, Matthew)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Scheduling Conference, calendared for May 18, 2020 at 9:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar. The Jury Trial in your case will be set for February 9, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. or February 23, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel shall confer and file a Notice of Selection of Trial Date not later than 12:00 noon on Monday, May 18, 2020. If no such notice is filed, the Court will set the date. Scheduling and trial orders will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 11, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 Days, filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc... (Bellinger, Matthew)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for May 18, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/11/2020. (sw)
January 15, 2020 Filing 20 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Leszek Garwacki, Courtney Ormond, Reference Watch LLC, identifying Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.; Reference Watch LLC d/b/a La Californienne; Courtney Ormond; Lesek Garwacki. (Seror, Matthew)
January 15, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Leszek Garwacki, Courtney Ormond, Reference Watch LLC.(Attorney Matthew Lawrence Seror added to party Leszek Garwacki(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Lawrence Seror added to party Courtney Ormond(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Lawrence Seror added to party Reference Watch LLC(pty:dft))(Seror, Matthew)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Leszek Garwacki, Courtney Ormond, Reference Watch LLC.(Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Leszek Garwacki(pty:dft), Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Courtney Ormond(pty:dft), Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Reference Watch LLC(pty:dft))(Holbrow, Willmore)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #8 Non-Resident Attorney Adam W Sgro APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc., designating Matthew Scott Bellinger as local counsel. (et)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #7 Non-Resident Attorney Beth M Frenchman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc., designating Matthew Scott Bellinger as local counsel. (et)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #6 Non-Resident Attorney Brian W Brokate APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc., designating Matthew Scott Bellinger as local counsel. (et)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc., upon Defendant Leszek Garwacki served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Courtney Ormond served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Reference Watch LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon attorney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bellinger, Matthew)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-09796 RGK (JPRx). (esa)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Leszek Garwacki, Courtney Ormond and Reference Watch LLC. (jtil)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam W. Sgro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24790115) filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Bellinger, Matthew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Beth M. Frenchman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24790070) filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Bellinger, Matthew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian W. Brokate to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24790011) filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Bellinger, Matthew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Bellinger, Matthew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc., identifying Rolex Industries Inc., Plaintiff's parent company. (Bellinger, Matthew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Bellinger, Matthew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Bellinger, Matthew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24789807 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Attorney Matthew Scott Bellinger added to party Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.(pty:pla))(Bellinger, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc. v. Reference Watch LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Ormond
Represented By: Willmore F Holbrow, III
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Seror
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reference Watch LLC d/b/a/ La Californienne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leszek Garwacki
Represented By: Willmore F Holbrow, III
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Seror
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reference Watch LLC
Represented By: Willmore F Holbrow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reference Watch LLC doing business as La Californienne
Represented By: Willmore F Holbrow, III
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Seror
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolex Watch U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Bellinger
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Kennedy
Represented By: Beth M Frenchman
Represented By: Brian W Brokate
Represented By: Adam W Sgro
Represented By: Craig S Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?