Jose Misael Chavez Ortega et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Jose Misael Chavez Ortega and Janeth Chavez Alba
Defendant: Associate Director Donald Neufeld, Consul General John Tavenner, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Consulate General of Ciudad Juarez, Secretary Michael R Pompei, Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Michael R. Pompei, John Tavenner, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Donald Neufeld
Case Number: 2:2019cv09875
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 47 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Consulate General of Ciudad Juarez, The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser in Washington, DC. (jp)
December 23, 2019 Filing 46 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Department of State, The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser in Washington, DC. (jp)
December 23, 2019 Filing 45 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant John Tavenner, Consul General of Ciudad Juarez, The Executive Office. (jp)
December 21, 2019 Filing 44 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
December 21, 2019 Filing 43 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
December 21, 2019 Filing 42 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
December 2, 2019 Filing 41 60 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 40 60 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Department of State. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 39 60 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 38 60 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Consulate General of Ciudad Juarez. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 37 60 DAYS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Civil Process Clerk - United States Attorney's Office. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 36 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Michael R. Pompei. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 35 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kevin K. McAleenan. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 34 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 33 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant John Tavenner. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 32 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Donald Neufeld. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 31 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Attorney General of the United States - U.S. Department of Justice. (jp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 30 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Attorney General of the Unites - U.S. Department of Justice. (jp)
November 29, 2019 Filing 29 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 26 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 25 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 29, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Requests #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Kapur, Gita)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega, (Kapur, Gita)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24803662 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Janeth Chavez Alba, Jose Misael Chavez Ortega. (Attorney Gita Beri Kapur added to party Janeth Chavez Alba(pty:pla), Attorney Gita Beri Kapur added to party Jose Misael Chavez Ortega(pty:pla))(Kapur, Gita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Misael Chavez Ortega et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Director Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consul General John Tavenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Consulate General of Ciudad Juarez
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Michael R Pompei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompei
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tavenner
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Misael Chavez Ortega
Represented By: Gita Beri Kapur
Represented By: Geoffrey Michael Pogue
Represented By: Patrick Shum
Represented By: Nayiri Betty Emirzian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janeth Chavez Alba
Represented By: Gita Beri Kapur
Represented By: Geoffrey Michael Pogue
Represented By: Patrick Shum
Represented By: Nayiri Betty Emirzian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?